Paige, Derrick v. Korostensky, Michael et al
Plaintiff: Derrick Dion Paige
Defendant: Dr. Michael Korostensky and CCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2025cv00092
Filed: February 7, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Anita Marie Boor
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying plaintiff's #7 request to re-assess the $ 161.96 initial partial filing fee. Initial partial filing fee due 4/7/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew R. Wiseman on 3/14/2025. (jef),(ps)
March 12, 2025 Filing 7 Letter regarding initial partial filing fee by Plaintiff Derrick Dion Paige. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (lam),(ps) Modified on 3/14/2025 (jef).
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $161.96 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 3/26/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew R. Wiseman on 03/05/2025. (acd),(ps)
March 3, 2025 Filing 5 Motion to Amend #1 Complaint to add UW Health Care by Plaintiff Derrick Dion Paige. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jls),(ps)
March 3, 2025 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Derrick Dion Paige. (jls),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2025: #1 IPP Calculation) (acd).
February 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Trust Fund Account Statement due 3/3/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew R. Wiseman on 2/7/2025. (jef),(ps)
February 7, 2025 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Derrick Dion Paige. (jef),(ps)
February 7, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Korostensky, filed by Derrick Dion Paige. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paige, Derrick v. Korostensky, Michael et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Dion Paige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Michael Korostensky
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?