SJB Trucking, LLC
Debtor: SJB Trucking, LLC
U.S. Trustee: US Trustee
Trustee: Joli A Lofstedt
Case Number: 2:2024bk20218
Filed: June 7, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Cathleen D Parker
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Nonresident Attorney William J. Schumacher (Related Doc #30) (tsm)
August 2, 2024 Filing 33 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#31 Minutes of Proceedings (Order)). No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/02/2024. (Admin.)
July 31, 2024 Filing 32 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [07/31/2024 10:00:24 AM]. File Size [ 2285 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:09:41 ]. (admin).
July 31, 2024 Filing 31 Minutes of Proceeding: Order (related document(s):#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (dcsl)
July 30, 2024 Filing 30 Motion to Appear pro hac vice for William J. Schumacher. . Filed on behalf of Falcon Equipment Finance, division of Falcon National Bank by Timothy L. Woznick. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Woznick, Timothy)
July 30, 2024 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Timothy L. Woznick. Filed by on behalf of Falcon Equipment Finance, division of Falcon National Bank (Woznick, Timothy)
July 24, 2024 Filing 28 Status Report Under 11 U.S.C. section 1188(c). Filed by SJB Trucking, LLC (Stith, Clark)
July 23, 2024 Filing 27 Monthly Financial Report. Filed by SJB Trucking, LLC (Stith, Clark)
July 22, 2024 Filing 26 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 06/31/2024. Filed by SJB Trucking, LLC (Stith, Clark)
July 20, 2024 Filing 25 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#22 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/20/2024. (Admin.)
July 19, 2024 Filing 24 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#21 Order on Generic Motion). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/19/2024. (Admin.)
July 19, 2024 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Patrick T. Holscher. Filed by on behalf of PACCAR Financial Corp. (Holscher, Patrick)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Requiring Compliance (related document(s):#10 Order Scheduling Hearing). Compliance due by 7/25/2024. (caf)
July 18, 2024 341 Meeting Concluded - Debtor(s) appeared on scheduled or continued 11 U.S.C. 341 Meeting of Creditors date and Meeting was Concluded on same date. . Filed by US Trustee (Morse, Daniel)
July 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Approving Post-Petition Retainer for Subchapter V Trustee (Related Doc #17) (dxj)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Granting Application to Employ Attorney (Related Doc #3) (tsm)
June 25, 2024 Filing 19 Certificate of Service (related document(s):#18 Notice). Filed by Joli A Lofstedt (Lofstedt, Joli)
June 25, 2024 Filing 18 Notice re:Motion for Approval of Post-Petition Retainer for Subchapter V Trustee; Objection Deadline: July 16, 2024 (related document(s):#17 Generic Motion). Filed by Joli A Lofstedt (Lofstedt, Joli)
June 25, 2024 Filing 17 Motion for Approval of Post-Petition Retainer for Subchapter V Trustee. Filed on behalf of Joli A Lofstedt by Joli A Lofstedt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Lofstedt, Joli)
June 24, 2024 Filing 16 Balance Sheet for Small Business (related document(s):#7 Notice of Incomplete Filing). Filed by SJB Trucking, LLC (Stith, Clark)
June 24, 2024 Filing 15 Tax Documents for the Year for 2022 (related document(s):#7 Notice of Incomplete Filing). Filed by SJB Trucking, LLC (Stith, Clark)
June 23, 2024 Filing 14 Cash Flow Statement for Small Business (related document(s):#7 Notice of Incomplete Filing). Filed by SJB Trucking, LLC (Stith, Clark)
June 13, 2024 Filing 13 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#10 Order Scheduling Hearing). No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 06/13/2024. (Admin.)
June 12, 2024 Filing 12 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s):#7 Notice of Incomplete Filing). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/12/2024. (Admin.)
June 12, 2024 Filing 11 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s):#9 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12). No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 06/12/2024. (Admin.)
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order, Notice of Deadlines and Date Set for 1188(A) Status Conference (related document(s):#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2024 at 10:00 AM at Telephone Conference. (tsm)
June 10, 2024 Filing 9 Notice of Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/18/2024 at 11:00 AM via Telephone Conference. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 9/16/2024.. (dxj)
June 10, 2024 Filing 8 Notice re: Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee. Filed by US Trustee (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit) (Morse, Daniel)
June 10, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Incomplete Filing and Intent to Dismiss Case. Balance Sheet Date: 6/24/2024 Cash Flow Statement Due 6/24/2024. Federal Income Tax Return Date: 6/24/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 6/24/2024. (dxj)
June 10, 2024 341 Meeting Explanation The 341 meeting is scheduled for July 18, 2024 at 11:00 AM. The 341 meeting will be held by telephone. The dial-in number is 866-766-2438 and the Participant Code is 8851168. Filed by US Trustee (Morse, Daniel)
June 8, 2024 Filing 6 Proposed Order Granting Application to Employ Attorney (related document(s):#3 Application to Employ). Filed by SJB Trucking, LLC (Stith, Clark)
June 7, 2024 Filing 5 Statement of Operations for Small Business. Filed by SJB Trucking, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2023 Profit and Loss statement) (Stith, Clark)
June 7, 2024 Filing 4 Corporation/Partnership Resolution Filed. Filed by SJB Trucking, LLC (Stith, Clark)
June 7, 2024 Filing 3 Application to Employ Clark Stith as Attorney . Filed on behalf of SJB Trucking, LLC by Clark D. Stith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Clark Stith in Support of Application to Employ #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Contract for Legal Services #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Statement of Attorney Compensation #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Corporate Resolution) (Stith, Clark)
June 7, 2024 Filing 2 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 24-20218) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2563996. Fee amount 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)
June 7, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by SJB Trucking, LLC Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 09/5/2024. (Stith, Clark)

Search for this case: SJB Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: SJB Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Clark D. Stith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
U.s. trustee: US Trustee
Represented By: Daniel J. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Joli A Lofstedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?