PJP Enterprises, Inc.
Debtor: PJP Enterprises, Inc.
U.S. Trustee: US Trustee
Case Number: 2:2024bk20373
Filed: September 22, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Cathleen D Parker
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order Scheduling Evidentiary Hearing on Debtor's Second Motion for Use of Cash Collateral and Objection Thereto (related document(s):#75 Motion to Use Cash Collateral). Evidentiary hearing scheduled for 12/3/2024 at 10:00 AM at 2120 Capitol Avenue, Bankruptcy Courtroom, 8th Floor, Cheyenne, WY 82001. (dcsl)
November 14, 2024 Filing 77 Objection to (related document(s): #75 Second Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor PJP Enterprises, Inc.) Filed by OSK X, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Woznick, Timothy)
November 1, 2024 Filing 76 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#73 Order Scheduling Hearing). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/01/2024. (Admin.)
November 1, 2024 Filing 75 Second Motion to Use Cash Collateral . Filed on behalf of PJP Enterprises, Inc. by Hampton M. Young Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Young, Hampton)
October 30, 2024 Filing 74 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [10/30/2024 09:33:27 AM]. File Size [ 2345 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:09:57 ]. (admin).
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order Scheduling Evidentiary Hearing on Debtor's Motion to Assume Executory Contract and Objections Thereto (related document(s):#21 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract). Evidentiary hearing scheduled for 12/17/2024 at 09:30 AM at 2120 Capitol Avenue, Bankruptcy Courtroom, 8th Floor, Cheyenne, WY 82001. (dxj)
October 30, 2024 Filing 72 Minutes of Hearing Held (related document(s):#21 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract). (dxj)
October 30, 2024 341 Meeting Explanation Meeting continued to 11/21/24 at 10:30 am. Same dial in information as before. Filed by US Trustee (Morse, Daniel)
October 23, 2024 Filing 71 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 09/30/2024. Filed by PJP Enterprises, Inc. (Young, Hampton)
October 20, 2024 Filing 70 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#66 Order Scheduling Hearing). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/20/2024. (Admin.)
October 20, 2024 Filing 69 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#65 Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/20/2024. (Admin.)
October 19, 2024 Filing 68 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#58 Minutes of Proceedings (Order)). No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/19/2024. (Admin.)
October 18, 2024 Filing 67 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#50 Order on Application to Employ). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/18/2024. (Admin.)
October 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order Scheduling Hearing on Debtor's Motion to Assume Executory Contract and to Request Merger with Lessee (related document(s):#21 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract). Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2024 at 09:30 AM at Telephone Conference. (dcsl)
October 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order Denying Debtor's Motion To Use Cash Collateral Without Prejudice (Related Doc #55) (dcsl)
October 18, 2024 Filing 64 Minutes of Hearing Held (related document(s):#10 Motion for Relief From Stay). (dcsl)
October 18, 2024 Filing 63 Exhibits From Hearing Held (related document(s):#48 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit). Filed by OSK X, LLC (jww)
October 18, 2024 Filing 62 Exhibits From Hearing Held (related document(s):#49 Witness List, #57 Exhibit). Filed by PJP Enterprises, Inc. (jww)
October 18, 2024 Filing 61 Exhibit 32 Admitted from Stay Relief Hearing (related document(s):#47 Witness List). Filed by OSK X, LLC (Woznick, Timothy)
October 17, 2024 Filing 60 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [10/17/2024 10:04:10 AM]. File Size [ 36016 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:35:22 ]. (admin).
October 17, 2024 Filing 59 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [10/17/2024 02:07:25 PM]. File Size [ 17997 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:17:29 ]. (admin).
October 17, 2024 Filing 58 Minutes of Hearing Held: Order (related document(s):#6 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay). (dcsl)
October 16, 2024 Filing 57 Exhibit E and F (related document(s):#10 Motion for Relief From Stay). Filed by OSK X, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh E #2 Exhibit Exh E) (Young, Hampton)
October 16, 2024 Filing 56 Exhibit 49-6 (related document(s):#20 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). Filed by OSK X, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 49-6) (Young, Hampton)
October 16, 2024 Filing 55 Motion to Use Cash Collateral Budget. Filed on behalf of PJP Enterprises, Inc. by Hampton M. Young Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cash Collateral Budget) (Young, Hampton)
October 16, 2024 Filing 54 Stipulation By OSK X, LLC and PJP Enterprises, Inc. as to Facts and Exhibits.. Filed by OSK X, LLC (Woznick, Timothy)
October 16, 2024 Filing 53 Exhibit 49-5. Filed by PJP Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 49-5) (Young, Hampton)
October 16, 2024 Filing 52 Objection to (related document(s): #20 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor PJP Enterprises, Inc.) Filed by OSK X, LLC (Woznick, Timothy)
October 16, 2024 Filing 51 Objection to (related document(s): #21 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract filed by Debtor PJP Enterprises, Inc.) Filed by OSK X, LLC (Woznick, Timothy)
October 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Retain Attorney (Related Doc #5) (tsm)
October 15, 2024 Filing 49 Witness List. Filed by PJP Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A #2 Exhibit A #3 Exhibit Exhibit C #4 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Young, Hampton)
October 15, 2024 Filing 48 Exhibit (related document(s):#47 Witness List). Filed by OSK X, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 #2 Exhibit 02 #3 Exhibit 03 #4 Exhibit 04 #5 Exhibit 05 #6 Exhibit 06 #7 Exhibit 07 #8 Exhibit 08 #9 Exhibit 09 #10 Exhibit 10 #11 Exhibit 11 #12 Exhibit 12 #13 Exhibit 13 #14 Exhibit 14 #15 Exhibit 15 #16 Exhibit 16 #17 Exhibit 17 #18 Exhibit 18 #19 Exhibit 19 #20 Exhibit 20 #21 Exhibit 21 #22 Exhibit 22 #23 Exhibit 23 #24 Exhibit 24 #25 Exhibit 25 #26 Exhibit 28 #27 Exhibit 29 #28 Exhibit 26 - Slip Sheet #29 Exhibit 27 Slip Sheet #30 Exhibit 30) (Woznick, Timothy)
October 15, 2024 Filing 47 Witness List. Filed by OSK X, LLC (Woznick, Timothy)
October 15, 2024 Filing 46 Reply to (related document(s): #36 Objection to filed by Debtor PJP Enterprises, Inc.) Filed by OSK X, LLC (Doty, Michael)
October 14, 2024 Filing 45 Objection to Debtor's Motion to Assume Executory Contract and to Request Merger With Lessee (related document(s):#21 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract). Filed by North Star Leasing a Division of Peoples Bank (Dyekman, Gregory)
October 11, 2024 Filing 44 Objection to (related document(s): #6 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay filed by Debtor PJP Enterprises, Inc.) Filed by OSK X, LLC (Woznick, Timothy)
October 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order Granting Motion for Permission for Greg Sohmer to Appear By Video Conference at Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay. (Related Doc #40) (tsm)
October 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order Granting Motion for Permission to Appear By Video Conference at Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay. (Related Doc #38) (tsm)
October 9, 2024 Filing 41 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#35 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice). No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 10/09/2024. (Admin.)
October 9, 2024 Filing 40 Motion to Appear By Video Conference for PJP Enterprises, Inc. at the Hearing on 10/17/2024 at 10 AM (related document(s):#10 Motion for Relief From Stay). Filed on behalf of PJP Enterprises, Inc. by Hampton M. Young Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order Motion to Appear by Video) (Young, Hampton)
October 9, 2024 Filing 39 Proposed Order (related document(s):#38 Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference). Filed by PJP Enterprises, Inc. (Young, Hampton)
October 9, 2024 Filing 38 Motion to Appear By Video Conference for Hampton Young, Parinda Patel, Patanga Patel-Spilker at the Hearing on 10/17/2024 at 10 AM (related document(s):#10 Motion for Relief From Stay). Filed on behalf of PJP Enterprises, Inc. by Hampton M. Young Jr.. (Young, Hampton)
October 9, 2024 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Timothy L. Woznick, Michael Franklin Doty. Filed by on behalf of OSK X, LLC (Doty, Michael)
October 9, 2024 Filing 36 Objection to Expedited Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay (related document(s):#10 Motion for Relief From Stay). Filed by PJP Enterprises, Inc. (Young, Hampton)
October 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nonresident Attorney Mike Doty (Related Doc #30) (dxj)
October 5, 2024 Filing 34 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#26 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/05/2024. (Admin.)
October 5, 2024 Filing 33 Corporation/Partnership Resolution Filed. Filed by PJP Enterprises, Inc. (Young, Hampton)
October 4, 2024 Filing 32 Schedule H: for Non-Individual-Codebtors (related document(s):#2 Notice of Incomplete Filing). Filed by PJP Enterprises, Inc. (Young, Hampton)
October 4, 2024 Filing 31 Equity Security Holders (related document(s):#2 Notice of Incomplete Filing). Filed by PJP Enterprises, Inc. (Young, Hampton)
October 4, 2024 Filing 30 Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Mike Doty. . Filed on behalf of OSK X, LLC by Timothy L. Woznick. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion #2 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Woznick, Timothy)
October 4, 2024 Filing 27 Certificate of Service (related document(s):#21 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract). Filed by PJP Enterprises, Inc. (Young, Hampton)
October 3, 2024 Filing 29 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#24 Order Scheduling Hearing). No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 10/03/2024. (Admin.)
October 3, 2024 Filing 28 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#23 Order (Generic)). No. of Notices: 26. Notice Date 10/03/2024. (Admin.)
October 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules (related document(s):#21 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract). Compliance due by 10/10/2024. (dxj)
October 1, 2024 Filing 25 Notice of Hearing (related document(s):#6 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay). Filed by PJP Enterprises, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2024 at 10:00 AM at 2120 Capitol Avenue, Bankruptcy Courtroom, 8th Floor, Cheyenne, WY 82001. (Young, Hampton)
October 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Scheduling Evidentiary Hearing on The Motion for Relief from Stay filed by OSK X, LLC (related document(s):#10 Motion for Relief From Stay). Evidentiary hearing scheduled for 10/17/2024 at 10:00 AM at 2120 Capitol Avenue, Bankruptcy Courtroom, 8th Floor, Cheyenne, WY 82001. (dxj)
October 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Regarding Motion for Expediated Hearing on Expedited Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay (related document(s):#11 Motion to Expedite Hearing). (dxj)
September 30, 2024 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice for Joel F. Newell by Theodore J. Hartl. Filed by on behalf of SureStay, Inc. (Hartl, Theodore)
September 30, 2024 Filing 21 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract . Filed on behalf of PJP Enterprises, Inc. by Hampton M. Young Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order Order on Motion to Assume Executory Contract and to Request Merger) (Young, Hampton)
September 29, 2024 Filing 20 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions . Filed on behalf of PJP Enterprises, Inc. by Hampton M. Young Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral) (Young, Hampton)
September 29, 2024 Filing 19 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#17 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice). No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 09/29/2024. (Admin.)
September 27, 2024 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jennifer M. Salisbury. Filed by on behalf of Nesh, Inc. (Salisbury, Jennifer)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Granting Admission pro hac vice of Joel F. Newell (Related Doc #12) (dcsl)
September 26, 2024 Filing 16 Certificate of Service Response to Motion for Expedited Hearing (related document(s):#11 Motion to Expedite Hearing). Filed by PJP Enterprises, Inc. (Young, Hampton)
September 26, 2024 Filing 15 Response to (related document(s): #11 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Creditor OSK X, LLC) Filed by PJP Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Response to Motion for Expedited Hearing) (Young, Hampton)
September 25, 2024 Filing 14 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s):#2 Notice of Incomplete Filing). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/25/2024. (Admin.)
September 25, 2024 Filing 13 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s):#3 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12). No. of Notices: 24. Notice Date 09/25/2024. (Admin.)
September 25, 2024 Filing 12 Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Joel F. Newell. . Filed on behalf of SureStay, Inc. by Theodore J. Hartl. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit #2 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Hartl, Theodore)
September 25, 2024 Filing 11 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related document(s):#10 Motion for Relief From Stay). Filed on behalf of OSK X, LLC by Timothy L. Woznick. (Woznick, Timothy)
September 25, 2024 Filing 10 Emergency Motion for Relief from Stay . Fee Amount $199. Filed on behalf of OSK X, LLC by Timothy L. Woznick. LBR 4001 Last Day to Object to Relief of Stay: 10/15/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E #6 Exhibit F #7 Exhibit G #8 Exhibit H #9 Exhibit I #10 Exhibit J #11 Exhibit K #12 Exhibit L #13 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Woznick, Timothy)
September 25, 2024 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Theodore J. Hartl. Filed by on behalf of SureStay, Inc. (Hartl, Theodore)
September 25, 2024 Filing 8 Proposed Order Emply Attorney, 2nd Amended (related document(s):#5 Application to Employ). Filed by PJP Enterprises, Inc. (Young, Hampton)
September 25, 2024 Filing 7 Proposed Order to Employ Attorney, Amended (related document(s):#5 Application to Employ). Filed by PJP Enterprises, Inc. (Young, Hampton)
September 25, 2024 Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(# 24-20373) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2586420. Fee amount 199.00. (re: Doc#10) (U.S. Treasury)
September 24, 2024 Filing 6 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay . Filed on behalf of PJP Enterprises, Inc. by Hampton M. Young Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order Proposed Order) (Young, Hampton)
September 24, 2024 Filing 5 Application to Employ Hampton M. Young, Jr. as Attorney . Filed on behalf of PJP Enterprises, Inc. by Hampton M. Young Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit #2 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Young, Hampton)
September 23, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Gregory C Dyekman. Filed by on behalf of North Star Leasing a Division of Peoples Bank (Dyekman, Gregory)
September 23, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/31/2024 at 11:00 AM via Telephone Conference.. (dxj)
September 23, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Incomplete Filing and Intent to Dismiss Case. Certified Corporate Resolution due 10/7/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 10/7/2024. Schedule H due 10/7/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 10/7/2024. (dxj)
September 23, 2024 341 Meeting Explanation The 341 meeting will be held by telephone on October 31, 2024 at 11 am. The dial-in number is 866-766-2438 and the Participant Code is 8851168.. Filed by US Trustee (Morse, Daniel)
September 22, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by PJP Enterprises, Inc. Chapter 11 Plan due by 01/21/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 01/21/2025. (Young, Hampton)
September 22, 2024 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 24-20373) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2585595. Fee amount 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: PJP Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: PJP Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Hampton M. Young, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
U.s. trustee: US Trustee
Represented By: Daniel J. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?