Electrical Connections Inc.
Debtor: Electrical Connections Inc.
Trustee: Paul Arthur Jordan Trustee
U.S. Trustee: US Trustee
Case Number: 2:2024bk20470
Filed: November 25, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Cathleen D Parker
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2025 Filing 129 Motion to Extend Time To File Proofs of Claim (related document(s):#15 Order Scheduling Hearing, #18 Take Notice). Filed on behalf of Electrical Connections Inc. by Clark D. Stith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Stith, Clark)
January 16, 2025 Filing 128 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#126 Order Continuing/Rescheduling Hearing). No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/16/2025. (Admin.)
January 15, 2025 Filing 127 Certificate of Service (related document(s):#108 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A mailing matrix) (Stith, Clark)
January 15, 2025 341 Meeting Concluded - Debtor(s) appeared on scheduled or continued 11 U.S.C. 341 Meeting of Creditors date and Meeting was Concluded on same date. . Filed by US Trustee (Morse, Daniel)
January 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Order Granting Motion to Continue Status Conference Under 11 U.S.C. 1188 (related document(s):#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). Hearing scheduled for 1/29/2025 at 09:00 AM at Telephone Conference. (tsm)
January 14, 2025 Filing 125 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing On Status Conference Under Section 1188 (related document(s):#15 Order Scheduling Hearing). Filed on behalf of Electrical Connections Inc. by Clark D. Stith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Stith, Clark)
January 12, 2025 Filing 119 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#110 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/12/2025. (Admin.)
January 10, 2025 Filing 124 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#109 Clerks Certificate of Service). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/10/2025. (Admin.)
January 10, 2025 Filing 123 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#108 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/10/2025. (Admin.)
January 10, 2025 Filing 122 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#107 Order Continuing/Rescheduling Hearing). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/10/2025. (Admin.)
January 10, 2025 Filing 121 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#106 Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/10/2025. (Admin.)
January 10, 2025 Filing 120 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#105 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/10/2025. (Admin.)
January 10, 2025 Filing 118 Certificate of Service (related document(s):#112 Amended Schedules/Petition, #114 Amended Schedules/Petition). Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mailing list) (Stith, Clark)
January 10, 2025 Filing 117 Amended Schedules/Petition filed: Schedule A B, . Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplement for line 11) (Stith, Clark)
January 10, 2025 Filing 116 Amended Schedules/Petition filed: Schedule G, . Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Stith, Clark)
January 10, 2025 Filing 115 Receipt of Amended Schedules/Petition(# 24-20470) [misc,amdsch] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2608619. Fee amount 34.00. (re: Doc#114) (U.S. Treasury)
January 10, 2025 Filing 114 Amended Schedules/Petition filed: Schedule E F, Fee Amount $34. Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Stith, Clark)
January 10, 2025 Filing 113 Receipt of Amended Schedules/Petition(# 24-20470) [misc,amdsch] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2608616. Fee amount 34.00. (re: Doc#112) (U.S. Treasury)
January 10, 2025 Filing 112 Amended Schedules/Petition filed: Schedule D, Fee Amount $34. Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Stith, Clark)
January 10, 2025 Filing 111 Notice re: No Objections Filed, Tentative Hearings Scheduled for 1/15/2025 at 10:30 AM and 2/13/2025 at 09:00 AM are hereby vacated. (related document(s):#74 Motion for Relief From Stay, #82 Order Scheduling Hearing, #110 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). (dcsl)
January 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Order Granting Relief From Automatic Stay (Related Doc #74) (dcsl)
January 8, 2025 Filing 109 Clerk's Certificate of Service (related document(s):#108 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). (dcsl)
January 8, 2025 Filing 108 Interim Order Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral and Notice of Final Hearing (Related Doc #24) (dcsl) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2025 (dcsl).
January 8, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Order Rescheduling Final Hearing On Debtor's Motion to Use Cash Collateral (related document(s):#24 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #47 Objection to, #50 Objection to). Hearing scheduled for 2/4/2025 at 10:00 AM at 2120 Capitol Avenue, Bankruptcy Courtroom, 8th Floor, Cheyenne, WY 82001. (dcsl)
January 8, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Order Granting Second Amended Joint Motion to Continue Evidentiary Hearing (related documents #48 Motion for Turnover of Property ) Hearing scheduled for 2/4/2025 at 10:00 AM at 2120 Capitol Avenue, Bankruptcy Courtroom, 8th Floor, Cheyenne, WY 82001. (dcsl)
January 8, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Order Granting Q&D Construction LLC's Motion for Relief from Stay Under 11 U.S.C. 362(d)(1) or, in the Alternative, to Compel Debtor to Immediately Assume or Reject the Subcontract Agreements Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 365(d)(5) and Vacating Evidentiary Hearing (Related Doc #49) (dcsl)
January 7, 2025 Filing 104 Status Report . Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Stith, Clark)
January 7, 2025 Filing 103 Amended Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing On Debtor's Motion For Turnover (related document(s):#48 Motion for Turnover of Property). Filed on behalf of Electrical Connections Inc. by Clark D. Stith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Stith, Clark)
January 7, 2025 Filing 102 Certificate of Service amended Certificate of Service (related document(s):#100 Withdrawal). Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Stith, Clark)
January 7, 2025 Filing 101 Amended Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing On Debtor's Motion for Turnover (related document(s):#48 Motion for Turnover of Property, #99 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing). Filed on behalf of Electrical Connections Inc. by Clark D. Stith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Stith, Clark)
January 6, 2025 Filing 100 Withdrawal of Opposition to Q&D Construction LLC's Motion For Relief From Stay (related document(s):#49 Motion for Relief From Stay). Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Stith, Clark)
January 6, 2025 Filing 99 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing On Debtor's Motion For Turnover (related document(s):#48 Motion for Turnover of Property). Filed on behalf of Electrical Connections Inc. by Clark D. Stith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Stith, Clark)
January 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Appear Remotely at Hearing on Electrical Connections Inc.'s Motion for Turnover of Property. (Related Doc #95) (dcsl)
January 6, 2025 Filing 97 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Ryan J. Works by Gregory C Dyekman. Filed by on behalf of Q&D Construction (Dyekman, Gregory)
January 5, 2025 Filing 96 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#94 Clerks Notice of Intent to Dismiss). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/05/2025. (Admin.)
January 3, 2025 Filing 95 Motion to Appear By Video Conference for Connor L. Cantrell at the Hearing on 01/14/2025 at 9:00 AM (related document(s):#48 Motion for Turnover of Property). Filed on behalf of Munich Re Specialty Insurance by Connor Cantrell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Appear Remotely at Hearing on Motion for Turnover) (Cantrell, Connor)
January 3, 2025 Filing 94 Notice of Intent to Dismiss. Objections due by 1/10/2025. (tsm)
January 3, 2025 341 Meeting Explanation Meeting continued to 1/15 at 8:30 a.m. Debtor's counsel had scheduling conflict. Same dial-in information as before. Debtor to file amended Schedules by cob 1/9. Filed by US Trustee (Morse, Daniel)
January 2, 2025 341 Meeting Explanation 341 Meeting continued to 1/15 at 9:30 a.m. Same dial-in information as before. Debtor to file amended Schedules by cob 1/9.. Filed by US Trustee (Morse, Daniel)
January 1, 2025 Filing 93 Receipt of Amended Schedules/Petition(# 24-20470) [misc,amdsch] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2607057. Fee amount 34.00. (re: Doc#92) (U.S. Treasury)
January 1, 2025 Filing 92 Amended Schedules/Petition filed: Schedule D, Fee Amount $34. Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Stith, Clark)
January 1, 2025 Filing 91 Amended Schedules/Petition filed: Schedule G, . Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Stith, Clark)
December 30, 2024 Filing 90 Objection to and Response Debtor's Motion for Turnover (related document(s):#48 Motion for Turnover of Property). Filed by Commerce Bank of Wyoming (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D) (Hunsicker, Bradley)
December 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Order Granting Creditor Munich Re Specialty Insurance's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Debtor's Motion for Turnover [Dkt.48] (Related Doc #85) (tsm)
December 30, 2024 Filing 88 Response to (related document(s): #48 Motion for Turnover of Property filed by Debtor Electrical Connections Inc.) Filed by Munich Re Specialty Insurance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - GAI) (Cantrell, Connor)
December 29, 2024 Filing 87 Objection to (related document(s): #49 Motion for Relief from Stay . Fee Amount $199 filed by Creditor Q&D Construction) Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Stith, Clark)
December 26, 2024 Filing 86 Monthly Financial Report. Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A #2 Exhibit Exh. B #3 Exhibit Exh. F) (Stith, Clark)
December 26, 2024 Filing 85 Motion to Extend Time to file Response to Debtor's Motion for Turnover (related document(s):#48 Motion for Turnover of Property). Filed on behalf of Munich Re Specialty Insurance by Connor Cantrell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order Order Granting Motion for Extension) (Cantrell, Connor)
December 25, 2024 Filing 84 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#82 Order Scheduling Hearing). No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/25/2024. (Admin.)
December 25, 2024 Filing 83 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#81 Order on Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract). No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/25/2024. (Admin.)
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order Scheduling Tentative Preliminary and Evidentiary Hearings on the Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Rock Springs-Sweetwater County Airport Board (related document(s):#74 Motion for Relief From Stay). Hearing scheduled for 1/15/2025 at 10:30 AM at Telephone Conference. Evidentiary hearing scheduled for 2/13/2025 at 09:00 AM at 2120 Capitol Avenue, Bankruptcy Courtroom, 8th Floor, Cheyenne, WY 82001. (dcsl)
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Order Granting Debtor's Motion To Reject Executory Contract with Rock Springs-Sweetwater County Airport Board (Related Doc #66) (dcsl)
December 22, 2024 Filing 80 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#71 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/22/2024. (Admin.)
December 20, 2024 Filing 79 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#70 Order on Application to Employ). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/20/2024. (Admin.)
December 20, 2024 Filing 78 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#69 Order Scheduling Hearing). No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/20/2024. (Admin.)
December 20, 2024 Filing 77 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#68 Order Scheduling Hearing). No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/20/2024. (Admin.)
December 20, 2024 Filing 76 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#67 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing). No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/20/2024. (Admin.)
December 20, 2024 Filing 75 Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(# 24-20470) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2605745. Fee amount 199.00. (re: Doc#74) (U.S. Treasury)
December 20, 2024 Filing 74 Motion for Relief from Stay . Fee Amount $199. Filed on behalf of Rock Springs-Sweetwater County Airport Board by Timothy L. Woznick. LBR 4001 Last Day to Object to Relief of Stay: 1/6/2025. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Woznick, Timothy)
December 20, 2024 Filing 73 Response to (related document(s): #66 Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Motion To Reject Runway Lighting Contract With Rock Springs- Sweetwater County Airport Board filed by Debtor Electrical Connections Inc.) Regarding No Objection Filed by Rock Springs-Sweetwater County Airport Board (Woznick, Timothy)
December 20, 2024 Filing 72 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Stephen R. Winship. Filed by on behalf of Douglas Exploration LLC (Winship, Stephen)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Order Granting Motion For Entry of Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Wages and Related Relief (Related Doc #22) (dxj)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Order Granting Application to Employ Attorney (Related Doc #10) (dcsl)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Order Scheduling Evidentiary Hearing on Debtor's Motion for Turnover of Property (related document(s):#48 Motion for Turnover of Property). Hearing scheduled for 1/14/2025 at 09:00 AM at 2120 Capitol Avenue, Bankruptcy Courtroom, 8th Floor, Cheyenne, WY 82001. (dcsl)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Order Scheduling Evidentiary Hearing on Q&D Construction LLC's Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay Under 11 U.S.C. 362(d)(1) or, in the Alternative, to Compel Debtor to Immediately Assume or Reject Subcontract Agreements Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 365(d)(2) (related document(s):#49 Motion for Relief From Stay). Hearing scheduled for 1/14/2025 at 09:00 AM at 2120 Capitol Avenue, Bankruptcy Courtroom, 8th Floor, Cheyenne, WY 82001. (dcsl)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order Regarding Motion for Expedited Hearing Filed by Q&D Constuction (Related Doc #52) (dcsl)
December 18, 2024 Filing 66 Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Motion To Reject Runway Lighting Contract With Rock Springs- Sweetwater County Airport Board. Filed on behalf of Electrical Connections Inc. by Clark D. Stith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Stith, Clark)
December 18, 2024 Filing 65 Proposed Order Authorizing Payment Of Certain Pre-Petition Wages (related document(s):#22 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Second Supplemental Declaration Of Darren Casey Re Wages #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Proposed Order) (Stith, Clark)
December 18, 2024 Filing 64 Proposed Order Interim Order Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral (related document(s):#24 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Revised Budget) (Stith, Clark)
December 18, 2024 Filing 63 Minutes of Hearing Held (related document(s):#24 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). (dcsl)
December 18, 2024 Filing 62 Minutes of Hearing Held (related document(s):#22 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). (dcsl)
December 15, 2024 Filing 61 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#55 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/15/2024. (Admin.)
December 15, 2024 Filing 60 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#54 Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/15/2024. (Admin.)
December 14, 2024 Filing 59 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#46 Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/14/2024. (Admin.)
December 14, 2024 Filing 58 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#38 Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/14/2024. (Admin.)
December 13, 2024 Filing 57 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#35 Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/13/2024. (Admin.)
December 13, 2024 Filing 56 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [12/13/2024 10:00:47 AM]. File Size [ 24198 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:44:25 ]. (admin).
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order Granting Motion for Admission of Ryan J. Works Pro Hac Vice as Counsel for Q &D Construction Pursuant to U.S.D.C.L.R. 84.2(b) (Related Doc #43) (tsm)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order Granting Motion to Appear Remotely at Hearing. (Related Doc #45) (dxj)
December 12, 2024 Filing 53 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#26 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/12/2024. (Admin.)
December 12, 2024 Filing 52 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related document(s):#49 Motion for Relief From Stay). Filed on behalf of Q&D Construction by Gregory C Dyekman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Dyekman, Gregory)
December 12, 2024 Filing 51 Objection to Motion for Entry of Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Wages and Related Relief (related document(s):#22 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). Filed by Q&D Construction (Attachments: #1 Affidavit #2 Exhibit 1 #3 Exhibit 2 #4 Exhibit 3 #5 Exhibit 4 #6 Exhibit 5 #7 Exhibit 6 #8 Exhibit 7 #9 Exhibit 8) (Dyekman, Gregory)
December 12, 2024 Filing 50 Objection to Motion for Entry of Order Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral (related document(s):#24 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). Filed by Q&D Construction (Attachments: #1 Affidavit #2 Exhibit 1 #3 Exhibit 2 #4 Exhibit 3 #5 Exhibit 4 #6 Exhibit 5 #7 Exhibit 6 #8 Exhibit 7 #9 Exhibit 8) (Dyekman, Gregory)
December 12, 2024 Filing 49 Motion for Relief from Stay . Fee Amount $199. Filed on behalf of Q&D Construction by Gregory C Dyekman. LBR 4001 Last Day to Object to Relief of Stay: 12/30/2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit #2 Exhibit 1 #3 Exhibit 2 #4 Exhibit 3 #5 Exhibit 4 #6 Exhibit 5 #7 Exhibit 6 #8 Exhibit 7 #9 Exhibit 8 #10 Exhibit 9) (Dyekman, Gregory)
December 12, 2024 Filing 48 Motion for Turnover of Property . Filed on behalf of Electrical Connections Inc. by Clark D. Stith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Darren Casey #2 Affidavit Supplemental declaration of Darren Casey #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Casey Declaration #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Casey Declaration #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Casey Declaration #6 Affidavit Declaration of Clark Stith in Support #7 Exhibit Exhibit A to Stith Declaration #8 Exhibit Exhibit B to Stith Declaration #9 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Stith, Clark)
December 12, 2024 Filing 47 Objection to and Response To Debtors Wage Motion And Cash Collateral Motion (related document(s):#22 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #24 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). Filed by Commerce Bank of Wyoming (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D) (Hunsicker, Bradley)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order Granting Motion For Permission to Appear by Video Conference at Hearing Scheduled on December 13, 2024. (Related Doc #37) (dxj)
December 12, 2024 Filing 45 Motion to Appear By Video Conference for Caleb R. Dahill and Ryan J. Works at the Hearing on 12/13/2024 at 10:00 am (related document(s):#25 Motion to Expedite Hearing). Filed on behalf of Q&D Construction by Gregory C Dyekman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Dyekman, Gregory)
December 12, 2024 Filing 44 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Caleb R. Dahill. Filed by on behalf of Q&D Construction (Dahill, Caleb)
December 12, 2024 Filing 43 Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Ryan J. Works. . Filed on behalf of Q&D Construction by Gregory C Dyekman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A #2 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Dyekman, Gregory)
December 12, 2024 Filing 42 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Gregory C Dyekman. Filed by on behalf of Q&D Construction (Dyekman, Gregory)
December 12, 2024 Filing 41 Notice re:NOTICE THAT UNITED STATES TRUSTEE DOES NOT OBJECT TO DEBTORS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF PRE-PETITION WAGES AND RELATED RELIEF (ECF. No. 22) (related document(s):#22 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). Filed by US Trustee (Morse, Daniel)
December 12, 2024 Filing 40 Notice re:NOTICE THAT UNITED STATES TRUSTEE DOES NOT OBJECT TO DEBTORS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER AUTHORIZING USE OF CASH COLLATERAL PURSUANT TO SECTIONS 361 AND 363 (ECF. No. 24) (related document(s):#24 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). Filed by US Trustee (Morse, Daniel)
December 12, 2024 Filing 39 Affidavit Re: Supplemental Declaration of Darren Casey In Support of Motion To Pay Pre-Petition Wages (related document(s):#22 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Stith, Clark)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order Granting Debtors' Motion to Appear By Video Conference. (Related Doc #36) (tsm)
December 12, 2024 Filing 37 Motion to Appear By Video Conference for Ryan Blansett at the Hearing on 12/13/2024 at 10:00 AM (related document(s):#25 Motion to Expedite Hearing). Filed on behalf of Commerce Bank of Wyoming by Ryan Blansett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order Granting Motion for Permission to Appear by Video Conference at Hearing Scheduled on December 13, 2024) (Blansett, Ryan)
December 12, 2024 Filing 36 Motion to Appear By Video Conference for Clark Stith at the Hearing on 12/13/2024 at 10:00 AM (related document(s):#25 Motion to Expedite Hearing). Filed on behalf of Electrical Connections Inc. by Clark D. Stith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Stith, Clark)
December 12, 2024 Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(# 24-20470) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2604332. Fee amount 199.00. (re: Doc#49) (U.S. Treasury)
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Appear Remotely at Hearing on Electrical Connections Inc.'s Motion for Entry of Order Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Wages and Related Relief; and Motion for Entry of Order Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral. (Related Doc #33) (tsm)
December 11, 2024 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Ryan Blansett. Filed by on behalf of Commerce Bank of Wyoming (Blansett, Ryan)
December 11, 2024 Filing 33 Motion to Appear By Video Conference for Connor L. Cantrell at the Hearing on 01/13/2025 at 10:00 AM (related document(s):#25 Motion to Expedite Hearing). Filed on behalf of Munich Re Specialty Insurance by Connor Cantrell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Cantrell, Connor)
December 11, 2024 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Connor Cantrell. Filed by on behalf of Munich Re Specialty Insurance (Cantrell, Connor)
December 11, 2024 Filing 31 Certificate of Service (related document(s):#26 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing). Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Attachments: #1 creditor mailing matrix) (Stith, Clark)
December 11, 2024 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by C. Levi Martin. Filed by on behalf of Small Business Administration (Martin, C.)
December 11, 2024 Filing 29 ***DISREGARD*** Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by C. Levi Martin. Filed by on behalf of US Trustee (Martin, C.) Modified on 12/11/2024 (dcsl).
December 10, 2024 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Bradley T Hunsicker. Filed by on behalf of Commerce Bank of Wyoming (Hunsicker, Bradley)
December 10, 2024 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jen Godonis. Filed by on behalf of Rock Springs-Sweetwater County Airport Board (Godonis, Jen)
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order Granting Motion for Expedited Hearing on Debtor's (1) Motion for Entry of Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Wages and Related Relief; and (2) Motion for Entry of Order Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral (Related Doc #25) Evidentiary hearing scheduled for 12/13/2024 at 10:00 AM at 2120 Capitol Avenue, Bankruptcy Courtroom, 8th Floor, Cheyenne, WY 82001. (tsm)
December 9, 2024 Filing 25 Motion to Expedite Hearing on First Day Motions (related document(s):#22 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #24 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). Filed on behalf of Electrical Connections Inc. by Clark D. Stith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Stith, Clark)
December 9, 2024 Filing 24 Second Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion For Entry of Order Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral. Filed on behalf of Electrical Connections Inc. by Clark D. Stith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Darren Casey In Support of Motion to Use Cash Collateral #2 Exhibit Creditor Mailing Matrix #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Six month Projected Budget #4 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Stith, Clark)
December 9, 2024 Filing 23 Initial Financial Report. Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Balance Sheet #2 Exhibit Profit and Loss #3 Exhibit 2023 Tax Return) (Stith, Clark)
December 9, 2024 Filing 22 First Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion For Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Wages and Related Relief. Filed on behalf of Electrical Connections Inc. by Clark D. Stith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Darren Casey in Support of Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Wagess #2 Proposed/Unsigned Order #3 Exhibit Creditor Mailing Matrix) (Stith, Clark)
December 6, 2024 Filing 21 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s):#18 Take Notice). No. of Notices: 40. Notice Date 12/06/2024. (Admin.)
December 6, 2024 Filing 20 Proposed Order (Amended) Granting Application to Employ Clark Stith (related document(s):#10 Application to Employ). Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Stith, Clark)
December 4, 2024 Filing 19 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s):#15 Order Scheduling Hearing). No. of Notices: 40. Notice Date 12/04/2024. (Admin.)
December 4, 2024 Filing 18 Take Notice-Re: Proof of Claims Deadline (related document(s):#12 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12). (tsm)
December 4, 2024 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Timothy L. Woznick. Filed by on behalf of Rock Springs-Sweetwater County Airport Board (Woznick, Timothy)
December 4, 2024 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Rick A. Thompson. Filed by on behalf of Commerce Bank of Wyoming (Thompson, Rick)
December 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order, Notice of Deadlines Including Deadline for the Filing of Proofs of Claim and Date Set for 1188(A) Status Conference. Proofs of claim due 1/24/2025. (related document(s):#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). Hearing scheduled for 1/15/2025 at 10:30 AM at Telephone Conference. (tsm) Modified on 12/4/2024 to add POC deadline (dccf).
November 29, 2024 Filing 14 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s):#12 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12). No. of Notices: 41. Notice Date 11/29/2024. (Admin.)
November 28, 2024 Filing 13 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s):#5 Notice of Incomplete Filing). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/28/2024. (Admin.)
November 27, 2024 Filing 12 Notice of Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/2/2025 at 11:00 AM via Telephone Conference. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 3/3/2025. (tsm) Modified on 12/4/2024 to remove POC deadline (dctm).
November 27, 2024 Filing 11 Notice re:Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee. Filed by US Trustee (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Morse, Daniel)
November 27, 2024 341 Meeting Explanation The 341 meeting will be held by telephone on January 2, 2025 at 11 am. The dial-in number is 866-766-2438 and the Participant Code is 8851168.. Filed by US Trustee (Morse, Daniel)
November 26, 2024 Filing 10 Application to Employ Clark Stith as Attorney . Filed on behalf of Electrical Connections Inc. by Clark D. Stith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Declaration of Clark Stith in Support #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Contract for Legal Services #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Statement of Compensation #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Corporate Resolution Authorizing Employment of Counsel #5 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Stith, Clark)
November 26, 2024 Filing 9 Certificate of Service (related document(s):#8 Amended Schedules/Petition). Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Stith, Clark)
November 26, 2024 Filing 8 Amended Schedules/Petition filed: Schedule E F, Fee Amount $34. Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Stith, Clark)
November 26, 2024 Filing 7 Tax Documents for the Year for 2023 (related document(s):#5 Notice of Incomplete Filing). Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Stith, Clark)
November 26, 2024 Filing 6 Balance Sheet for Small Business (related document(s):#5 Notice of Incomplete Filing). Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Stith, Clark)
November 26, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Incomplete Filing and Intent to Dismiss Case. Balance Sheet Date: 12/10/2024 Federal Income Tax Return Date: 12/10/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 12/10/2024. (tsm)
November 26, 2024 Receipt of Amended Schedules/Petition(# 24-20470) [misc,amdsch] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2600712. Fee amount 34.00. (re: Doc#8) (U.S. Treasury)
November 25, 2024 Filing 4 Statement of Operations for Small Business. Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Stith, Clark)
November 25, 2024 Filing 3 Cash Flow Statement for Small Business. Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Stith, Clark)
November 25, 2024 Filing 2 Corporation/Partnership Resolution Filed. Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Stith, Clark)
November 25, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 02/24/2025. (Stith, Clark)
November 25, 2024 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 24-20470) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2600545. Fee amount 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: Electrical Connections Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Electrical Connections Inc.
Represented By: Clark D. Stith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Paul Arthur Jordan Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
U.s. trustee: US Trustee
Represented By: Daniel J. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?