Khan Howard Johnson LLC v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Khan Howard Johnson LLC
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 0:2020cv00195
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Filing 8 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE of Hearing: BY TELEPHONE - All parties may appear by telephone through the Courts conference call system. Guests call: Toll Free 1-888-398-2342| Access code 3107456. | Join as guest Press # |Security code 1001#. Parties should have their calendars on hand for scheduling. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2021 09:00 AM before Honorable Kelly H Rankin. (Court Staff, smxb)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Scoggin, Sean)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company,. (Scoggin, Sean)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of complexity by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company ; this case is non-complex. (Scoggin, Sean)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean Scoggin on behalf of Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Scoggin, Sean) Modified event/text and termed motion and on 12/1/2020 (Court Staff, sjlg).
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 First ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Scoggin, Sean)
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (summons issued) with Jury Demand. (Filing fee ($400) paid - receipt #CHY033800) filed by Khan Howard Johnson LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sal) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2020: #2 Magistrate Consent) (Court Staff, sal).
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DISREGARD Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl. (Court Staff, sal) Modified on 10/21/2020 (Court Staff, sal).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan Howard Johnson LLC v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khan Howard Johnson LLC
Represented By: Jessica Rutzick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Sean W Scoggin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?