Beck v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Deborah Marie Beck
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2020cv00201
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $320.00 received on filing fee. Receipt CHY034041. (Court Staff, stmo)
November 30, 2020 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $80 received on filing fee. Receipt CHY033963. (Court Staff, sjk)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Marie Beck. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 11/16/2020, answer due on 1/15/2021. Served through the Andrew M. Saul. (Brent, Karen) Modified on 12/7/2020 to correct service date (Court Staff, skb).
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall pay $80.00 monthly, beginning 11/16/2020 until the filing fee is paid in full. (Copy of Order provided to Plaintiff via US mail.) (Court Staff, skb)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - First MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Deborah Marie Beck. (Brent, Karen)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued. (Court Staff, stbd)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl. (Court Staff, stbd)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW filed by Deborah Marie Beck. 3 Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Summons-Saul, #4 Exhibit Summons-US Attorney, #5 Exhibit Summons-Attorney Gen) (Brent, Karen) Modified text on 10/29/2020 (Court Staff, stbd). (Attachment 3 replaced to correct page format on 11/2/2020) (Court Staff, stbd). (Attachment 4 replaced to correct page format on 11/2/2020) (Court Staff, stbd). (Attachment 5 replaced to correct page format on 11/2/2020) (Court Staff, stbd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beck v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Marie Beck
Represented By: Karen Brent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?