Rhoades v. Rhoades
Plaintiff: Jonathan W Rhoades
Defendant: Jeffrey S Rhoades
Case Number: 0:2020cv00202
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 20 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2021 at 9:30 AM BY TELEPHONE before Honorable Alan B Johnson. All parties should appear by telephone through the Courts conference call system. Guests call:Toll Free 866-434-5269 | Access code 1316504# | Join as guest Press # | Security code 1001# (Court Staff, ssw)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT of Meeting and Proposed Joint Discovery and Case Management Plan and Setting Initial Pretrial Conference by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Court Staff, ssw)
December 22, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANALOGOUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN CIVIL CASES by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Court Staff, ssw) Modified to select filer on 12/23/2020 (Court Staff, stmo). Removed filer on 12/23/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
December 21, 2020 Filing 17 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Plaintiff Jonathan W Rhoades. (Addleman, Billie)
December 21, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #14 Counterclaim by Jonathan W Rhoades. (Addleman, Billie) Modified text on 12/23/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
December 11, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa R Theriault on behalf of Jeffrey S Rhoades (Theriault, Melissa)
December 11, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Jonathan W Rhoades by Jeffrey S Rhoades. (Hutchins, Clyde)
December 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde William Hutchins, Jr on behalf of Jeffrey S Rhoades (Hutchins, Clyde)
December 3, 2020 Filing 11 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin finding as moot #10 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court has already ruled on this issue ( #9 ). (Court Staff, smh)
December 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant Jeffrey S Rhoades. (Court Staff, sbh)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant has until 12/11/2020 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Court Staff, smh)
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #7 Motion for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) filed by Plaintiff Jonathan W Rhoades. (Addleman, Billie)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant Jeffrey S Rhoades. (Court Staff, sbh)
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan W Rhoades. Jeffrey S Rhoades served on 11/5/2020, answer due on 11/27/2020 (Addleman, Billie)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason G Mitchell on behalf of Jonathan W Rhoades (Mitchell, Jason)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff Jonathan W Rhoades: this case is non-complex (Court Staff, sbh)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 Praecipe for summons filed by Plaintiff Jonathan W Rhoades, 1 issued (Court Staff, sbh)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Billie L M Addleman on behalf of Jonathan W Rhoades (Court Staff, sbh)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jonathan W Rhoades (summons issued) (Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY033841) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Magistrate Consent Form) (Court Staff, sbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhoades v. Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan W Rhoades
Represented By: Jason G Mitchell
Represented By: Billie L M Addleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S Rhoades
Represented By: Melissa R Theriault
Represented By: Clyde William Hutchins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?