Friedman v. Bank of Jackson Hole et al
Appellee: Estate of Robert Biolchini, Charles Hingle, Jeffrey Plimpton, Timothy J Lane, Holland and Hart LLP, Peter Lawton, Hathaway & Kunz LLP, Randy L Royal, John C Smiley, Gary A Barney, Patricia E Lane, Bank of Jackson Hole, David Perino, Scott Meier, Matthew W Lane, Michael Gilbert, Ballard Spahr LLP, Robert M Lane, Christopher Lane, Dennis O'Malley, Lucas Buckley and Colleen Lane
Appellant: Richard Friedman
Case Number: 0:2020cv00209
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Filing 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #12 , #13 Orders. Mail sent to Patricia E Lane. (Court Staff, sbh) Modified text on 12/18/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson denying as moot #10 , #11 Motions to appear pro hac vice. The Court orders the Clerk's Office to refund any fees already paid. (Order mailed to appellant and pro se appellees on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying Appellant Leave to Appeal by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. This Court finds Mr. Friedman's requested appeal to be frivolous and denies leave to appeal. (Order mailed to appellant and pro se appellees on this date) (Court Staff, sbh) Modified text on 11/23/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
November 20, 2020 PAYMENT ENTRY: Pro Hac Vice fee paid on behalf of William D. Hauptman, $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-1846095 re #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Fleck, Paula) Modified on 11/20/2020 to edit relationship (Court Staff, sjk). Modified on 11/24/2020 - Filing Fee Refunded via Pay.gov on 11/24/20 (Court Staff, sjk).
November 20, 2020 PAYMENT ENTRY: Pro Hac Vice fee paid on behalf of Carolyn J Fairless, $100, receipt number AWYDC-1846074, #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Fleck, Paula) Modified on 11/20/2020 to edit attorney name for fee (Court Staff, sjk). Modified on 11/24/2020 - Filing Fee Refunded via Pay.gov on 11/24/2020 (Court Staff, sjk).
November 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for William D. Hauptman to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Appellees Charles Hingle, Holland and Hart LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fleck, Paula)
November 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Carolyn J. Fairless to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Appellees Charles Hingle, Holland and Hart LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fleck, Paula)
November 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent R Cohen on behalf of Bank of Jackson Hole, Estate of Robert Biolchini, Peter Lawton, David Perino (Cohen, Brent)
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 Corrected NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paula Ann Fleck on behalf of Charles Hingle, Holland and Hart LLP (Fleck, Paula) Modified text on 11/19/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paula Ann Fleck on behalf of Bank of Jackson Hole, Charles Hingle (Fleck, Paula)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John C Smiley on behalf of Ballard Spahr LLP, Gary A Barney, Michael Gilbert, Dennis O'Malley, Randy L Royal, John C Smiley (Smiley, John)
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 (TEXT ONLY) ORDER entered by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. The Court orders counsel to associate with local counsel to be admitted pro hac vice into this District within 14 days of this entry. (See Local Rule 84.2). (Court Staff, ssw) Modified on 11/13/2020 to correct that counsel has 14 days (Court Staff, ssw).
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 RECORD on Appeal received from Bankruptcy Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Court Staff, sbh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT of Issues to be Presented on Appeal by Appellant Richard Friedman (Court Staff, sbh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 DESIGNATION of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court by Appellant Richard Friedman re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Court Staff, sbh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 20-2018. (Court Staff, sbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friedman v. Bank of Jackson Hole et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Estate of Robert Biolchini
Represented By: Brent R Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Charles Hingle
Represented By: William D Hauptman
Represented By: Paula Ann Fleck
Represented By: Carolyn J Fairless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jeffrey Plimpton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Timothy J Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Holland and Hart LLP
Represented By: William D Hauptman
Represented By: Paula Ann Fleck
Represented By: Carolyn J Fairless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Peter Lawton
Represented By: Brent R Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hathaway & Kunz LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Randy L Royal
Represented By: Michael T Gilbert
Represented By: John C Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John C Smiley
Represented By: Michael T Gilbert
Represented By: John C Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gary A Barney
Represented By: Michael T Gilbert
Represented By: John C Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Patricia E Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank of Jackson Hole
Represented By: Brent R Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: David Perino
Represented By: Brent R Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Scott Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Matthew W Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael Gilbert
Represented By: Michael T Gilbert
Represented By: John C Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ballard Spahr LLP
Represented By: Michael T Gilbert
Represented By: John C Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Robert M Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Christopher Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dennis O'Malley
Represented By: Michael T Gilbert
Represented By: John C Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lucas Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Colleen Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Richard Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?