Manning v. United States of America
Petitioner: Carroll Thomas Manning, Jr
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 0:2020cv00229
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (Kubichek, David)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time Motion response deadline 1/25/2021. Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner on this date via U.S. mail.(Court Staff, sal)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Time to Respond to 2255 Motion filed by Respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kubichek, David)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A Kubichek on behalf of United States of America (Kubichek, David)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal finding as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. There is no fee required for this type of case. Copy of docket sheet containing this Order mailed to Petitioner on this date via U.S. mail.(Court Staff, sal)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Requiring Service of Complaint by Clerk of Court and Requiring Response re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Carroll Thomas Manning, Jr by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Motion response deadline 12/25/2020. Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner on this date via U.S. mail.(Court Staff, sal)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Petitioner Carroll Thomas Manning, Jr. (Court Staff, sal)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Carroll Thomas Manning, Jr. (Court Staff, sal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manning v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Stephanie Hambrick
Represented By: David A Kubichek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carroll Thomas Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?