Granite Canyon Quarry et al v. Sutherland et al
Plaintiff: Meridian Granite Co., Granite Canyon Quarry, Martin Marietta Real Estate Investments, Inc., Martin Marietta Materials Real Estate Investments Inc and Meridian Granite Co
Defendant: Sutherland Brothers Ranch, LLC, John Eldon Sutherland and Sutherland Brothers Ranch LLC
Case Number: 0:2021cv00002
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING SERVICE by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Status Report due by 4/4/2021.(Court Staff, sal)
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal. (Court Staff, stbd)
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued (Court Staff, stbd)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiffs Granite Canyon Quarry, Martin Marietta Materials Real Estate Investments, Inc., Meridian Granite Co. (Decker, Michael) (Main Document 2 replaced/NEF regenerated on 1/5/2021) (Court Staff, stbd).
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number AWYDC-1869858), filed by Granite Canyon Quarry, Martin Marietta Materials Real Estate Investments, Inc., Meridian Granite Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Decker, Michael) Modified text on 1/5/2021 (Court Staff, stbd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granite Canyon Quarry et al v. Sutherland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meridian Granite Co.
Represented By: Michael Jason Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granite Canyon Quarry
Represented By: Michael Jason Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Marietta Real Estate Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Jason Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Marietta Materials Real Estate Investments Inc
Represented By: Michael Jason Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meridian Granite Co
Represented By: Michael Jason Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutherland Brothers Ranch, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Eldon Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutherland Brothers Ranch LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?