Interstate Power Systems Inc v. Beaty et al
Plaintiff: Interstate Power Systems Inc a Minnesota corporation doing business as Interstate Bearing Systems
Defendant: Basin Industrial Solutions LLC and Michael Beaty
Counter Defendant: Interstate Power Systems Inc
Case Number: 0:2021cv00006
Filed: January 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 13 NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - REPLY to #12 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Counter Defendant Interstate Power Systems Inc. (Nethercott, Tara)
March 8, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Defendant Basin Industrial Solutions LLC. (Norris, Nicholas)
March 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal)
February 22, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Counter Defendant Interstate Power Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Nethercott, Tara)
February 4, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, , COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Interstate Power Systems Inc by Michael Beaty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Norris, Nicholas)
January 29, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Interstate Power Systems Inc. Michael Beaty served on 1/25/2021, answer due on 2/16/2021 (Nethercott, Tara)
January 25, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $200 received for pro hac vice fees for Joseph M Windler and Kyle R Kroll. Receipt CHY034212. (Court Staff, sjk)
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle Kroll on behalf of Interstate Power Systems Inc (Kroll, Kyle)
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph M Windler on behalf of Interstate Power Systems Inc (Windler, Joseph)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #3 Motion to appear pro hac vice and granting #4 Motion to appear pro hac vice. Copy of Order emailed to PHV attorneys on this date. (Court Staff, sal)
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Kyle R. Kroll to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Interstate Power Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Nethercott, Tara)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Joseph M. Windler to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Interstate Power Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Nethercott, Tara)
January 14, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Interstate Power Systems Inc. Basin Industrial Solutions LLC served on 1/14/2021, answer due on 2/4/2021 (Nethercott, Tara)
January 14, 2021 Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment. Filing Fee was paid with Receipt Number: CHY034168. (Court Staff, stmo)
January 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (two (2)summons(es) issued) with Jury Demand. Counsel - payment is due within three calendar days. To pay the filing fee with a credit card, please use the event Notice of Civil Filing Fee in CM/ECF or send a check to the Clerk of US District Court, 2120 Capitol Avenue Room 2131, Cheyenne, WY 82001, filed by Interstate Power Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, stmo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Interstate Power Systems Inc v. Beaty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basin Industrial Solutions LLC
Represented By: Nicholas A Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Beaty
Represented By: Nicholas A Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interstate Power Systems Inc a Minnesota corporation doing business as Interstate Bearing Systems
Represented By: Tara Brooke Nethercott
Represented By: Christopher M Brennan
Represented By: Kyle R Kroll
Represented By: Joseph M Windler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Interstate Power Systems Inc
Represented By: Tara Brooke Nethercott
Represented By: Christopher M Brennan
Represented By: Joseph M Windler
Represented By: Kyle R Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?