Dooley et al v. Platte County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Steven Ray Dooley, Jr, Wilbur R Turner, Scott O Slater and Adam Collins Stills
Defendant: Platte County Detention Center Sergeant Sutton, Platte County Detention Center Sergeant McDonald, Platte County Detention Center Nurse Elsie, Platte County Detention Center, Platte County Detention Center Captain Russle and Platte County Wyoming
Case Number: 0:2021cv00007
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Filing 11 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER DIRECTING REFUND OF FILING FEE by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. This Court having entered an Order dismissing action without prejudice on March 12, 2021 directs the Clerk's Office to immediately refund to Steven Ray Dooley the amount of $350.00 for which he paid for the filing fee in this case after it had already been dismissed. Copy of the docket sheet containing this Order mailed to Steven Ray Dooley on this date via U.S. mail.(Court Staff, sal)
March 12, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $350 received for filing fee. Receipt CHY034433. (Court Staff, sjk)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiffs on this date via U.S. mail.(Court Staff, sal)
March 5, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Platte County Detention Center Captain Russle, Platte County Detention Center Nurse Elsie, Platte County Detention Center Sergeant McDonald, Platte County Detention Center Sergeant Sutton filed by Wilbur R Turner. (Court Staff, stmo) Text modified on 3/5/2021 (Court Staff, sal).
March 2, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Platte County Detention Center, Platte County Detention Center Captain Russle, Platte County Detention Center Nurse Elsie, Platte County Detention Center Sergeant McDonald, Platte County Detention Center Sergeant Sutton, Platte County Wyoming, filed by Scott O. Slater. (Court Staff, stmo) Modified on 3/5/2021 (Court Staff, stmo).
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 Letters from Steven Ray Dooley regarding numerous case matters. (Attachments: #1 Letter Regarding Payment of Filing Fee, #2 Regarding Appointment of Attorney) (Court Staff, szf)
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Adam Collins Stills returned to Office of the Clerk marked as "Return to Sender. Not deliverable as address. Unable to forward." (Court Staff, sal)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to file an Amended Complaint and Motions for In Forma Pauperis. Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiffs on this date via U.S. mail. Plaintiffs shall file their new motions for IFP and amended complaint by 3/9/21. If Plaintiffs do not file new motions for IFP or pay the filing fee, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. (Court Staff, sal) Modified on 2/16/2021 (Court Staff, sal).
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time (Dispositive) requesting extension of filing amended complaint, filed by Plaintiff Steven Ray Dooley, Jr. (Court Staff, stmo) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/16/2021). Plaintiff's address updated.(Court Staff, stmo). Modified on 2/16/2021 (Court Staff, stmo).
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER dismissing in part #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, allowing amendment and requiring new Motions for In Forma Pauperis by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Plaintiffs shall amend their Complaint to address the deficiencies identified in this Order by and file new Motions for IFP no later than 2/17/21. Failure to do so will result on the dismissal of this case. Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiffs on this date via U.S. mail.(Court Staff, sal)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Steven Ray Dooley, Jr. (Court Staff, sal)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER Civil Rights Complaint with Jury Demand (Filing fee ($350) NOT paid) filed by Steven Ray Dooley, Jr. (Attachments: #1 cover letter and envelope) (Court Staff, sal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dooley et al v. Platte County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platte County Detention Center Sergeant Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platte County Detention Center Sergeant McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platte County Detention Center Nurse Elsie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platte County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platte County Detention Center Captain Russle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platte County Wyoming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ray Dooley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbur R Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott O Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Collins Stills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?