Thomas v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Andrea Lynn Thomas
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2021cv00008
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea Lynn Thomas. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 2/1/2021, answer due on 4/2/2021. Served through the United States Attorney, Office of Regional Chief Counsel, U.S. Attorney General. (Wicklund, Edward)
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Edward A. Wicklund on behalf of Andrea Lynn Thomas (Wicklund, Edward)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson granting #6 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Edward A. Wicklund for Plaintiff Andrea Lynn Thomas (Order emailed to counsel on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Edward A. Wicklund to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Andrea Lynn Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Crocker, Berthenia)
January 26, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Edward A Wicklund. Receipt CHY034230. (Court Staff, sjk)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Court Staff, sbh)
January 22, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Andrea Lynn Thomas. (Court Staff, stbd)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summonses Issued. (Court Staff, stbd)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. (Court Staff, stbd)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Petition for Judicial Review filed by Andrea Lynn Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Court Staff, stbd) Modified event text on 1/26/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Lynn Thomas
Represented By: Berthenia S Crocker
Represented By: Edward A Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?