Bryant v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: Devin Bryant
Defendant: Laramie County Sheriff's Department Deputy Gillott, Laramie County Sheriff's Department Deputy Lee, Ryan Lee, Jason Gillott and Laramie County Board of County Commissioners
Case Number: 0:2021cv00015
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand, by Ryan Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Tysse, Holly)
April 1, 2021 Filing 27 BRIEF re #26 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Laramie County Board of County Commissioners, Laramie County Sheriff's Department Deputy Gillott, Laramie County Sheriff's Department Deputy Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Young, Catherine)
April 1, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Laramie County Board of County Commissioners, Laramie County Sheriff's Department Deputy Gillott, Laramie County Sheriff's Department Deputy Lee. (Young, Catherine)
April 1, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Laramie County Board of County Commissioners, Laramie County Sheriff's Department Deputy Gillott, Laramie County Sheriff's Department Deputy Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Young, Catherine)
April 1, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Holly Lee Tysse on behalf of Ryan Lee (Tysse, Holly)
April 1, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of complexity by Defendant Jason Gillott ; this case is non-complex. (Bestol, Kay)
April 1, 2021 Filing 22 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Defendant Jason Gillott. (Bestol, Kay)
April 1, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Jason Gillott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Bestol, Kay)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF RECUSAL by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. Honorable Alan B. Johnson recused. Case reassigned to Honorable Kelly H. Rankin for all further proceedings. (Court Staff, sbh)
March 31, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine M. Young on behalf of Laramie County Board of County Commissioners, Laramie County Sheriff's Department Deputy Gillott, Laramie County Sheriff's Department Deputy Lee (Young, Catherine)
March 31, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jon Mark Stewart on behalf of Laramie County Board of County Commissioners, Laramie County Sheriff's Department Deputy Gillott, Laramie County Sheriff's Department Deputy Lee (Stewart, Jon)
March 12, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Hunkins-Newton on behalf of Ryan Lee (Hunkins-Newton, Amanda)
March 12, 2021 Filing 16 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin. All Defendants, answer due on or before April 1, 2021. (Court Staff, sjgc)
March 11, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kay Lynn Bestol on behalf of Jason Gillott (Bestol, Kay)
February 26, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devin Bryant. Laramie County Sheriff's Department Deputy Gillott served on 2/26/2021, answer due on 3/19/2021 (Petersen, Devon)
February 26, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devin Bryant. Laramie County Sheriff's Department Deputy Lee served on 2/26/2021, answer due on 3/19/2021 (Petersen, Devon)
February 26, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devin Bryant. Laramie County Board of County Commissioners served on 2/24/2021, answer due on 3/17/2021 (Petersen, Devon)
February 26, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devin Bryant. Jason Gillott served on 2/26/2021, answer due on 3/19/2021 (Petersen, Devon)
February 26, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devin Bryant. Ryan Lee served on 2/25/2021, answer due on 3/18/2021 (Petersen, Devon)
February 22, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued to Laramie County Board of County Commissioners (Court Staff, sbh)
February 19, 2021 Filing 8 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Devin Bryant (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Petersen, Devon)
February 5, 2021 Filing 7 Summonses Issued to Ryan Lee and Jason Gillott. Issued Summonses returned to requesting counsel via e-mail on this date. (Court Staff, sal) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/5/2021) (Court Staff, sbh). Modified text on 2/22/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
February 5, 2021 Filing 6 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Counsel filed a summons with the Clerk of Court on February 5, 2021. Per Local Rule 4.1 "Summons shall be prepared by counsel... using the form obtained at the Clerk's Office or through the Court's website." Counsel did not use the proper form for the summons. If he wishes to proceed, the Court orders Counsel to file a new summons on the proper form. (Court Staff, ssw)
February 5, 2021 Filing 5 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Devin Bryant (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Petersen, Devon) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/5/2021) (Court Staff, szf). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/5/2021) (Court Staff, sal).
February 5, 2021 Filing 4 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Devin Bryant (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Petersen, Devon)
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Devin Bryant. (Petersen, Devon)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Alan B. Johnson and referred to Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin. (Court Staff, sbh)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Devin Bryant (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number AWYDC-1886515) Attorney Devon Walter Petersen added to party Devin Bryant(pty:pla) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Petersen, Devon) Modified text on 2/1/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laramie County Sheriff's Department Deputy Gillott
Represented By: Catherine M. Young
Represented By: Jon Mark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laramie County Sheriff's Department Deputy Lee
Represented By: Catherine M. Young
Represented By: Jon Mark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Lee
Represented By: Catherine M. Young
Represented By: Amanda Hunkins-Newton
Represented By: Jon Mark Stewart
Represented By: Holly Lee Tysse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Gillott
Represented By: Catherine M. Young
Represented By: Jon Mark Stewart
Represented By: Kay Lynn Bestol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laramie County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Catherine M. Young
Represented By: Jon Mark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Bryant
Represented By: Devon Walter Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?