Saunders v. CNC Oilfield Services LLC
Plaintiff: Phillip Saunders and Philip Saunders
Defendant: CNC Oilfield Services LLC
Case Number: 0:2021cv00023
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam D Boland on behalf of CNC Oilfield Services LLC (Boland, Adam)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER of Conditional Certification by the Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal granting #10 Motion to Certify Class (Court Staff, sbh)
April 7, 2021 Filing 25 Joint STATUS REPORT re #22 Order, #10 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to FLSA by Philip Saunders. (Parmet, Matthew)
April 6, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE by Plaintiff Philip Saunders of Filing Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent) (Parmet, Matthew)
March 30, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/26/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE to #10 Plaintiff's Motion to conditionally certify collective action by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Defendant must respond by 4/8/21.(Court Staff, sal)
March 26, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Adam D Boland. Receipt CHY034497. (Court Staff, sjk)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #19 Motion to appear pro hac vice for Adam D. Boland. Order emailed to counsel on this date. (Court Staff, stmo)
March 25, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by CNC Oilfield Services LLC. (Cave, Bradley)
March 25, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Adam D Boland to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Defendant CNC Oilfield Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Cave, Bradley)
March 25, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley T Cave on behalf of CNC Oilfield Services LLC (Cave, Bradley)
March 23, 2021 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT re #16 Status Report Order by Philip Saunders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Exchange) (Parmet, Matthew)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT REGARDING SERVICE by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Status Report due by 3/31/2021.(Court Staff, sal)
March 12, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by Plaintiff Philip Saunders of Filing Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent) (Parmet, Matthew)
March 9, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by Plaintiff Philip Saunders of Filing Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent) (Parmet, Matthew)
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Plaintiff Philip Saunders of Filing Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent) (Parmet, Matthew)
March 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Plaintiff Philip Saunders of Filing Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent) (Parmet, Matthew)
March 2, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 Motion to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Philip Saunders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Saunders Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Lawrence Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Jones Declaration, #4 Appendix Proposed Notice and Consent Forms, #5 Proposed Order) (Parmet, Matthew)
March 2, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to FLSA filed by Plaintiff Philip Saunders. Responses due by 3/16/2021 (Parmet, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Plaintiff Philip Saunders of Filing Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent, #2 Exhibit 2 - Consent) (Parmet, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued. Emailed to filing counsel on this date. (Court Staff, sal)
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 Praecipe for Summons on CNC Oilfield Services LLC filed by Plaintiff Philip Saunders (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Parmet, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Filing 6 FILED INCORRECTLY. Will be refiled by counsel. Praecipe for Summons on CNC Oilfield Services LLC filed by Plaintiff Philip Saunders (Parmet, Matthew) Modified on 2/19/2021 (Court Staff, sal).
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Matthew Scott Parmet on behalf of Phillip Saunders (Parmet, Matthew)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #2 Motion to appear pro hac vice. Copy of Order emailed to Matthew S. Parmet on this date. (Court Staff, sal)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Matthew S. Parmet to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Philip Saunders. (Lujan, Dustin) Modified on 2/12/2021 (Court Staff, sal)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 Original Collective Action COMPLAINT against CNC Oilfield Services LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number AWYDC-1892937)Attorney Dustin T Lujan added to party Philip Saunders(pty:pla), filed by Philip Saunders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lujan, Dustin) Modified text on 2/16/2021 (Court Staff, sjlg). Modified on 2/17/2021 (Court Staff, sal).
February 12, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Matthew S Parmet. Receipt AWYDC-1892950. (Court Staff, sjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saunders v. CNC Oilfield Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Saunders
Represented By: Dustin T Lujan
Represented By: Matthew Scott Parmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Saunders
Represented By: Matthew Scott Parmet
Represented By: Dustin T Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNC Oilfield Services LLC
Represented By: Adam D Boland
Represented By: Bradley T Cave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?