Plimpton v. Bank of Jackson Hole et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Plimpton
Defendant: John Smiley, Holland & Hart, LLP, Ballard Spahr LLP, Michael Gilbert, Matthew W Lane, Timothy J Lane, Robert M Lane, David Perino, DFWU LLC, Colleen Lane, Estate of Patricia A. Lane, Bank of Jackson Hole, Dennis O'Malley, Patricia E Lane, Hathaway and Kunz PC, Scott Meier, Randy Royal, Gary Barney, Charles Hingle, Windriver Corp. of WY, LLC and Lucas Buckley
Case Number: 0:2021cv00050
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 126 Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:20-cv-00323.
March 11, 2021 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Perez, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting #60 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting #69 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting #102 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot #116 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. For the reasons detailed in the attached order, the Bank and Estates Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED; the Bank Defendants' supplemental motion to dismiss is GRANTED; the Lane Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED; and the Hathaway Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED, and their renewed motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. Mr. Plimpton's motion for preliminary injunction is DENIED as moot. The Court orders the case TRANSFERRED to Wyoming. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to transfer this case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/26/2021. (Shaffer, Chelsea) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #123 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kevin W. Munn is terminated from this case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/21/2021. (Shaffer, Chelsea) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Filing 123 MOTION for Kevin W. Munn to Withdraw as Attorney by Bank of Jackson Hole, David Perino. (Munn, Kevin) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
November 24, 2020 Filing 122 REPLY to Response to #116 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed in Response to Filing Proofs of Service filed by Lucas Buckley, Hathaway and Kunz, P.C., Scott Meier. (Chafe, Marie) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 121 RESPONSE re #119 Objection to Notice of Filing Supplemental Authority #117 by Ballard Spahr, LLP, Gary Barney, Michael Gilbert, Dennis O'Malley, Randy Royal, John Smiley. (Atkins, David) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
November 12, 2020 Filing 120 OBJECTION re #116 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed in Response to Filing Proofs of Service filed by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
November 12, 2020 Filing 119 OBJECTION re #117 Notice of Additional Authority and #118 Exhibit filed by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
October 29, 2020 Filing 118 EXHIBIT 38 by Ballard Spahr, LLP, Gary Barney, Michael Gilbert, Dennis O'Malley, Randy Royal, John Smiley re #117 Notice of Additional Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 39)(Atkins, David) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
October 29, 2020 Filing 117 Notice of Additional Authority re #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ballard Spahr, LLP, Gary Barney, Michael Gilbert, Dennis O'Malley, Randy Royal, John Smiley. (Atkins, David) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
October 26, 2020 Filing 116 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed in Response to Filing Proofs of Service by Lucas Buckley, Hathaway and Kunz, P.C., Scott Meier.Responses due by 11/16/2020 (Chafe, Marie) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
October 23, 2020 Filing 115 REPLY to Response to #102 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lucas Buckley, Hathaway and Kunz, P.C., Scott Meier. (Chafe, Marie) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 114 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Plimpton. Hathaway and Kunz, P.C. served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 113 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Plimpton. Scott Meier served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 112 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Plimpton. Lucas Buckley served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 111 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #110 Objection to #102 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 110 OBJECTION re #102 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Durney on behalf of Lucas Buckley, Hathaway and Kunz, P.C., Scott Meier (Durney, Peter) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 108 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #105 MOTION for Attorney(s) Peter M. Durney to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6110052) by Lucas Buckley, Hathaway and Kunz, P.C., Scott Meier. (Durney, Peter) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 107 AFFIDAVITS of Service: Complaint and accompanying orders served on Scott Gray, assistant to Scott Meier and Gwendolyn Croft, employee for Hathaway and Kunz, who also accepted for Lucas Buckley on September 1, 2020, filed by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #105 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Peter M. Durney. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/22/2020. Signed by Clerk on 09/23/2020. (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 105 MOTION for Attorney(s) Peter M. Durney to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6110052) by Lucas Buckley, Hathaway and Kunz, P.C., Scott Meier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Peter M. Durney)(Chafe, Marie) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 104 NOTICE by Lucas Buckley, Hathaway and Kunz, P.C., Scott Meier re #102 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #103 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Notice to Self-Represented Litigant Concerning Motion to Dismiss, Per Local Rule 12(A) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Fed. R. Civ. P. 12, #2 Exhibit 1 - Local Rule 7)(Chafe, Marie) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 103 Memorandum in Support re #102 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lucas Buckley, Hathaway and Kunz, P.C., Scott Meier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Lucas E. Buckley, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Scott W. Meier)(Chafe, Marie) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 102 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Lucas Buckley, Hathaway and Kunz, P.C., Scott Meier.Responses due by 10/12/2020 (Chafe, Marie) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 101 REPLY to Response to #60 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bank of Jackson Hole, David Perino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, Lane v. Lane, 9:15-cv-1740)(Munn, Kevin) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 100 REPLY to Response to #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Charles Hingle, Holland & Hart, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 33 - Order Granting Motion to Enforce Barton Doctrine, #2 Exhibit 34 - Objection to Motion to Enforce Barton Doctrine, #3 Exhibit 35 - Reply in Support of Motion to Enforce Barton Doctrine, #4 Exhibit 36 - Declaration of Charles Hingle, #5 Exhibit 37 - Debtor's Opposition to Proposed Settlement)(Fairless, Carolyn)[Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 99 RESPONSE re #84 Objection, filed by Estate of Patricia A. Lane, Colleen Lane, Matthew W. Lane, Patricia E. Lane, Timothy J. Lane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Wheelin, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 98 AFFIDAVIT of Service: Complaint and accompanying paperwork served on Gwendolyn Croft, employee for Hathaway Kunz, on September 1, 2020, filed by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 97 AFFIDAVIT of Service: Complaint and accompanying orders served on Scott Gray, assistant to Scott Meier, on September 1, 2020, filed by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 96 AFFIDAVIT of Service: Complaint and accompanying orders served on Gwendolyn Croft, employee for Hathaway and Kunz, who accepted for Lucas Buckley on September 1, 2020, filed by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #90 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/31/2020. (Shaffer, Chelsea) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #89 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/31/2020. (Shaffer, Chelsea) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #88 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/31/2020. (Shaffer, Chelsea) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #87 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/31/2020. (Shaffer, Chelsea) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 90 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 17, 2020 to File Reply Memorandum #84 Objection, by Estate of Patricia A. Lane, Colleen Lane, Matthew W. Lane, Patricia E. Lane, Timothy J. Lane. (Wheelin, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 89 MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/17/2020 to File Reply Memorandum re #84 Objection, by Bank of Jackson Hole, David Perino. (Munn, Kevin) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 88 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply to #84 re Motion to Dismiss (Partially Unopposed) by Charles Hingle, Holland & Hart, LLP. (Fairless, Carolyn) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 87 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Partially Unopposed) as to #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction until 09/17/2020 by Charles Hingle, Holland & Hart, LLP. (Fairless, Carolyn) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 91 OBJECTION re #81 Notice of Additional Authority, filed by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 86 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Lucas Buckley, Hathaway and Kunz, P.C., Scott Meier* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Jeffrey Plimpton* *626C Admiral Drive* *Suite 814* *Annapolis, MD 21401*. (Reis, Julia) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
August 27, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Lucas Buckley, Hathaway and Kunz, P.C., Scott Meier. (Reis, Julia) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #83 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court may grant a motion for extension of time for service when Plaintiff shows good cause for such an extension or at the Courts discretion. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m); see also Zapata v. City of New York, 502 F.3d 192, 196 (2d Cir. 2007) ("[D]istrict courts have the discretion to grant extensions of the service period even where there is no good cause shown."); Williams v. Mid-Hudson Forensic Psychiatric Ctr., 2018 WL 1581684, at *4 (S.D.N.Y. Mar. 27, 2018) ("[T]he Second Circuit has consistently held that Rule 4 should be construed liberally...")(citing Romandette v. Weetabix Co., Inc., 807 F.2d 309, 311 (2d Cir. 1986)). Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/21/2020. (Shaffer, Chelsea) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 84 AMENDED OBJECTION re #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #60 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Envelope)(Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 83 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve All Summonses by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 82 OBJECTION re #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #60 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Memorandum in Support Part 2)(Reis, Julia) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 81 Notice of Additional Authority re #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ballard Spahr, LLP, Gary Barney, Michael Gilbert, Charles Hingle, Holland & Hart, LLP, Dennis O'Malley, Randy Royal, John Smiley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Atkins, David) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #79 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #60 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 8/16/2020. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/5/2020. (Conde, Djenab) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #60 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction until August 16, 2020 by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE of Withdrawal of #74 Motion for Default Judgment by Jeffrey Plimpton.(Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying #74 Motion for Default Judgment; granting #76 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Court denies Mr. Plimpton's motion for default judgment as to Matthew W. Lane, because Mr. Lane has responded by filing the #69 motion to dismiss. Mr. Plimpton's response to the #69 motion to dismiss is now due by August 12, 2020. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/15/2020. (Conde, Djenab) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 76 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until 8/21/2020 as to #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 75 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Robert M. Lane.(Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 74 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Matthew Lane by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #57 Motion to Dismiss and #60 Supplemental Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/5/2020. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/30/2020. (Conde, Djenab) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 72 RESPONSE re #68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #60 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction until August 5, 2020 (Noting No Objection) filed by Bank of Jackson Hole, David Perino. (Munn, Kevin) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE by Matthew W. Lane, Timothy J. Lane re #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice to Self-Represented Litigant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fed. Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 12(A), #2 Exhibit Rule 7 Motion Procedure)(Wheelin, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 70 Memorandum in Support re #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Matthew W. Lane, Timothy J. Lane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy Lane, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew Lane)(Wheelin, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Matthew W. Lane, Timothy J. Lane.Responses due by 7/21/2020 (Wheelin, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Wheelin on behalf of Matthew W. Lane (Wheelin, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda McCorkle on behalf of Matthew W. Lane (McCorkle, Melinda) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #60 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction until August 5, 2020 by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 65 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Plimpton. Matthew W. Lane served on 6/3/2020, answer due 6/24/2020. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda McCorkle on behalf of Timothy J. Lane (McCorkle, Melinda) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Wheelin on behalf of Timothy J. Lane (Wheelin, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 62 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Plimpton. Timothy J. Lane served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE by Bank of Jackson Hole, David Perino re #60 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Munn, Kevin) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 60 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Bank of Jackson Hole, David Perino.Responses due by 7/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Supplemental Motion to Dismiss)(Munn, Kevin) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE by Ballard Spahr, LLP, Bank of Jackson Hole, Gary Barney, Michael Gilbert, Charles Hingle, Holland & Hart, LLP, Colleen Lane, Patricia E. Lane, Dennis O'Malley, David Perino, Randy Royal, John Smiley, Estate of Patricia A. Lane re #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Atkins, David) Modified on 6/16/2020 (Blough, B.). [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 58 Memorandum in Support re #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ballard Spahr, LLP, Bank of Jackson Hole, Gary Barney, Michael Gilbert, Charles Hingle, Holland & Hart, LLP, Colleen Lane, Patricia E. Lane, Dennis O'Malley, David Perino, Randy Royal, John Smiley, Estate of Patricia A. Lane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit Declaration of David Perino, #24 Exhibit Declaration of Gary A. Barney, #25 Exhibit Declaration of Randy L. Royal, #26 Exhibit Declaration of William A. Slaughter, #27 Exhibit Declaration of Dennis O'Malley, #28 Exhibit Declaration of John C. Smiley, #29 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Gilbert, #30 Exhibit Declaration of Charles W. Hingle, #31 Exhibit Declaration of Lucy Stark, #32 Exhibit Declaration of Patricia E. Lane)(Atkins, David) Modified on 6/16/2020 (Blough, B.). [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ballard Spahr, LLP, Bank of Jackson Hole, Gary Barney, Michael Gilbert, Charles Hingle, Holland & Hart, LLP, Colleen Lane, Patricia E. Lane, Dennis O'Malley, David Perino, Randy Royal, John Smiley, Estate of Patricia A. Lane.Responses due by 7/6/2020 (Atkins, David) Modified on 6/16/2020 (Blough, B.). [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Gilbert on behalf of Ballard Spahr, LLP, Gary Barney, Michael Gilbert, Dennis O'Malley, Randy Royal, John Smiley (Gilbert, Michael) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda McCorkle on behalf of Estate of Patricia A. Lane, Colleen Lane, Patricia E. Lane (McCorkle, Melinda) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying #50 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve All Summonses, without prejudice to renewal when Mr. Plimpton specifies which of the two Defendants he has encountered difficulty with effectuating service of process. In his motion, Mr. Plimpton emphasizes the large number of Defendants, the incorrect addresses for two Defendants, and the foreign residence of one Defendant, but does not identify which of the twenty-one Defendants to which he is referring. Mr. Plimpton may file an additional motion for extension of time to effectuate service, provided he identifies the two Defendants for which he requests additional time to serve. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/20/2020. (Conde, Djenab) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying #49 Motion for Reconsideration re 46 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. To the extent that issues arise regarding this attorney serving as a witness in this case, any such issue, like a motion in limine, should be addressed at a later stage in the case. Cf. Nat'l Union Fire Ins. Co. of Pittsburgh, Pa. v. L.E. Myers Co., 937 F. Supp. 276, 287 (S.D.N.Y. 1996) (noting the court's discretion to reserve judgment on some or all motions in limine until trial so that the "admission of particular pieces of evidence is in an appropriate factual context"). Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/20/2020. (Conde, Djenab) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Extension of Time ; denying #51 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall submit their Rule 26(f) report twenty days after the Court issues its ruling on Defendants' anticipated motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/20/2020. (Conde, Djenab) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for Extension of Time for Rule 26f Conference by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve All Summonses by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Reconsideration re 46 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION for Extension of Time until 20 days after a ruling on the Defendants' anticipated motion(s) to dismiss to File Rule 26(f) Statement by Bank of Jackson Hole. (Munn, Kevin) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #45 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael T. Gilbert to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5860464) by Ballard Spahr, LLP, Gary Barney, Michael Gilbert, Dennis O'Malley, Randy Royal, John Smiley. (Atkins, David) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael T. Gilbert. Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 05/18/2020. (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael T. Gilbert to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5860464) by Ballard Spahr, LLP, Gary Barney, Michael Gilbert, Dennis O'Malley, Randy Royal, John Smiley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Atkins, David) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #42 MOTION for Attorney(s) Melinda McCorkle to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5852262) by Estate of Patricia A. Lane, Colleen Lane, Patricia E. Lane. (Wheelin, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Melinda McCorkle. Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/12/2020. Signed by Clerk on 05/13/2020. (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Attorney(s) Melinda McCorkle to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5852262) by Estate of Patricia A. Lane, Colleen Lane, Patricia E. Lane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Melinda McCorkle)(Wheelin, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of Jackson Hole identifying Corporate Parent Bancshares of Jackson Hole, Inc. for Bank of Jackson Hole. (Donnelly, Michael) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Robert M. Lane waiver sent on 5/1/2020, answer due 6/30/2020 filed by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 4, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Ballard Spahr, LLP to 6/15/2020; Gary Barney to 6/15/2020; Michael Gilbert to 6/15/2020; Dennis O'Malley to 6/15/2020; Randy Royal to 6/15/2020; John Smiley to 6/15/2020. (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time until June 15, 2020 for Defendants Ballard Spahr, LLP, Gary Barney, Michael Gilbert, Dennis O'Malley, Randy Royal, and John Smiley to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/2/2020. (Conde, Djenab) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 15, 2020 to Respond to the Complaint #1 Complaint,, by Ballard Spahr, LLP, Gary Barney, Michael Gilbert, Dennis O'Malley, Randy Royal, John Smiley. (Atkins, David) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Atkins on behalf of Ballard Spahr, LLP, Gary Barney, Michael Gilbert, Dennis O'Malley, Randy Royal, John Smiley (Atkins, David) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by William D Hauptman on behalf of Charles Hingle, Holland & Hart, LLP (Hauptman, William) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Jean Fairless on behalf of Charles Hingle, Holland & Hart, LLP (Fairless, Carolyn) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #26 MOTION for Attorney(s) William D. Hauptman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5824515) by Charles Hingle, Holland & Hart, LLP. (Atkins, David) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #25 MOTION for Attorney(s) Carolyn J. Fairless to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5824495) by Charles Hingle, Holland & Hart, LLP. (Atkins, David) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to William D. Hauptman. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/27/2020. Signed by Clerk on 04/28/2020. (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Carolyn J. Fairless. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/27/2020. Signed by Clerk on 04/28/2020. (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 28 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by Windriver Corp. of WY, LLC. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Attorney(s) William D. Hauptman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5824515) by Charles Hingle, Holland & Hart, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Atkins, David) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Attorney(s) Carolyn J. Fairless to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5824495) by Charles Hingle, Holland & Hart, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Atkins, David) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 27, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Charles Hingle to 6/15/2020; Holland & Hart, LLP to 6/15/2020. (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time until June 15, 2020 for Defendants Holland & Hart, LLP and Charles Hingle to respond to the Complaint.. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/26/2020. (Conde, Djenab) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 15, 2020 to Respond to the #1 Complaint,, by Charles Hingle, Holland & Hart, LLP. (Atkins, David) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Plimpton. DFWU, LLC served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020; Windriver Corp. of WY, LLC served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Atkins on behalf of Charles Hingle, Holland & Hart, LLP (Atkins, David) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #20 Motion to Set Aside. Having reviewed Plaintiff's filing and considered the arguments raised in it, the Court nevertheless denies the motion to set aside the extensions of time previously granted. See Dietz v. Bouldin, 136 S. Ct. 1885, 1892 (2016) (emphasizing a district court's inherent authority to manage its docket with a "view toward the efficient and expedient resolution of cases"). Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/15/2020. (Conde, Djenab) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Set Aside by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 13, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Bank of Jackson Hole to 6/15/2020; David Perino to 6/15/2020. (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time until June 15, 2020 for Defendants Bank of Jackson Hole and David Perino to respond to #1 Complaint and oppose #2 emergency motion for preliminary injunction.. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/12/2020. (Conde, Djenab) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 15, 2020 to file an answer or motion re Complaint and file an opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #1 Complaint,, by Bank of Jackson Hole, David Perino. (Donnelly, Michael) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin W. Munn on behalf of Bank of Jackson Hole, David Perino (Munn, Kevin) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Donnelly on behalf of Bank of Jackson Hole, David Perino (Donnelly, Michael) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 8, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Estate of Patricia A. Lane to 6/15/2020; Colleen Lane to 6/15/2020; Patricia E. Lane to 6/15/2020. (Perez, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time until June 15, 2020 for Defendants Colleen Lane, Patricia E. Lane, and the Estate of Patricia E. Lane to respond to #1 Complaint and oppose #2 emergency motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/7/2020. (Conde, Djenab) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 7, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/21/2020 (Perez, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/15 to respond to Complaint and oppose emergency motion for preliminary injunction #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #1 Complaint, by Estate of Patricia A. Lane, Colleen Lane, Patricia E. Lane. (Wheelin, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Wheelin on behalf of Estate of Patricia A. Lane, Colleen Lane, Patricia E. Lane (Wheelin, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Plimpton. Estate of Patricia A. Lane served on 3/24/2020, answer due 4/14/2020. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Plimpton. Patricia E. Lane served on 3/24/2020, answer due 4/14/2020. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Plimpton. Colleen Lane served on 3/25/2020, answer due 4/15/2020. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 EXHIBITS re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits Part 2, #2 Envelope)(Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 Consent to Electronic Notice by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ballard Spahr, LLP, Bank of Jackson Hole, Gary Barney, Lucas Buckley, DFWU, LLC, Estate of Patricia A. Lane, Michael Gilbert, Hathaway and Kunz, P.C., Charles Hingle, Holland & Hart, LLP, Colleen Lane, Matthew W. Lane, Patricia E. Lane, Robert M. Lane, Timothy J. Lane, Scott Meier, Dennis O'Malley, David Perino, Randy Royal, John Smiley, Windriver Corp. of WY, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeffrey Plimpton* *626C Admiral Drive* *Suite 814* *Annapolis, MD 21401*. (Caffrey, A.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jeffrey Plimpton, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, filed by Jeffrey Plimpton, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2020.(Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/11/2020.(Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/11/2020.(Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/10/2020; Discovery due by 9/10/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2020. Signed by Clerk on 3/11/2020.(Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ballard Spahr, LLP, Gary Barney, Lucas Buckley, DFWU, LLC, Michael Gilbert, Hathaway and Kunz, P.C., Charles Hingle, Hollard & Hart, LLP, Colleen Lane, Matthew W. Lane, Patricia A. Lane, Patricia E. Lane, Robert M. Lane, Timothy J. Lane, Scott Meier, Dennis O'Malley, David Perino, Randy Royal, John Smiley, The Bank of Jackson Hole, Windriver Corp. of WY, LLC, filed by Jeffrey Plimpton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Freberg, B) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2020: #2 OCR'ed pdf) (Freberg, B). [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]
March 11, 2020 Filing fee received from Jeffrey Plimpton: $ 400, receipt number CTXN00021117 (Freberg, B) Modified on 3/18/2020 added receipt number (Nuzzi, Tiffany). [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/11/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plimpton v. Bank of Jackson Hole et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Smiley
Represented By: Michael T Gilbert
Represented By: David P. Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland & Hart, LLP
Represented By: William D Hauptman
Represented By: Carolyn Jean Fairless
Represented By: David P. Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ballard Spahr LLP
Represented By: Michael T Gilbert
Represented By: David P. Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gilbert
Represented By: Michael T Gilbert
Represented By: David P. Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew W Lane
Represented By: Brian J. Wheelin
Represented By: Melinda McCorkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J Lane
Represented By: Brian J. Wheelin
Represented By: Melinda McCorkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Perino
Represented By: Michael J. Donnelly
Represented By: Kevin W. Munn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFWU LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Lane
Represented By: Brian J. Wheelin
Represented By: Melinda McCorkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Patricia A. Lane
Represented By: Brian J. Wheelin
Represented By: Melinda McCorkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Jackson Hole
Represented By: Michael J. Donnelly
Represented By: Kevin W. Munn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis O'Malley
Represented By: Michael T Gilbert
Represented By: David P. Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia E Lane
Represented By: Brian J. Wheelin
Represented By: Melinda McCorkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hathaway and Kunz PC
Represented By: Marie E. Chafe
Represented By: Peter M. Durney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Meier
Represented By: Marie E. Chafe
Represented By: Peter M. Durney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Royal
Represented By: Michael T Gilbert
Represented By: David P. Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Barney
Represented By: Michael T Gilbert
Represented By: David P. Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Hingle
Represented By: William D Hauptman
Represented By: Carolyn Jean Fairless
Represented By: David P. Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windriver Corp. of WY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Buckley
Represented By: Marie E. Chafe
Represented By: Peter M. Durney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Plimpton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?