State of Wyoming v. United States Department of Interior et al
Petitioner: State of Wyoming
Respondent: United States Department of Interior Secretary, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Department of Interior, Nada Culver, Kim Liebhauser, Bureau of Land Management and Debra Anne Haaland
Intervenor: Conservation Colorado, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Alterra Mountain Company, Roan Creek Ranch, Hunt to Eat, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Western Spirit Cycling, Valley Organic Growers Association, WildEarth Guardians, Sierra Club, Aspen Skiing Company, Thistle Whistle Farm, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Earthworks, Montana Environmental Information Center, The Wilderness Society, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Center for Biological Diversity, Food & Water Watch, Wilderness Workshop, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Friends of the Earth, Indian People's Action and Great Old Broads for Wilderness
Case Number: 0:2021cv00056
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
2 Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Filing 56 GLOBAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PRELIMINARY-INJUNCTION MOTIONS (Doc. 41 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS; Doc. 44 in 0:21-cv-00056) by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. See Order for details. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Court Staff, skb)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting #52 Motion to Consolidate Cases for Trial. It is ORDERED that the State of Wyoming's Motion to Consolidate Civil Cases (21CV56 Doc. #52 ) is GRANTED. Case Numbers 21-CV-13-SWS and 21-CV-56- SWS are hereby consolidated under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Case No. 21-CV-13-SWS shall be the lead case, as reflected in the caption above. For ease of administration, all further pleadings shall be filed in Case No. 21-CV-13-SWS, and no further pleadings should be filed in Case No. 21-CV-56. Any further pleadings received by the Clerk of Court for Case No. 21-CV-56 shall be filed in Case No. 21-CV-13. (Court Staff, skb)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl for all further proceedings; the Honorable Alan B Johnson no longer assigned to case by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl.(Court Staff, sjlg)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson granting in part and denying in part #50 , #51 Motions for Extension of Time and to File Excess Pages. Intervenors shall restrict their briefing to 10 pages. Intervenors choosing to file briefs may do so by June 1, 2021. (Court Staff, sbh)
May 14, 2021 Filing 52 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Trial filed by Petitioner State of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jordan, Travis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 51 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Response to Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding Response to Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Conservation Colorado, Friends of the Earth, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Workshop (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Delehanty, Thomas) Modified filers on 5/20/2021 (Court Staff, stmo). Modified on 5/20/2021 (Court Staff, stmo). Added filers on 5/20/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
May 13, 2021 Motions No Longer Referred: #50 MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Brief in Response to Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding Brief in Response to Preliminary Injunction (Court Staff, smxb)
May 12, 2021 Filing 50 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Brief in Response to Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding Brief in Response to Preliminary Injunction filed by Intervenor Respondents Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Kellan) Modified text on 5/13/2021 (Court Staff, smxb). Added filers on 5/17/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #20 Conservation Groups' Motion to Intervene by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin. (Court Staff, smxb) Modified text on 5/17/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
May 5, 2021 Filing 48 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Melissa A Hornbein on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Food & Water Watch, Indian People's Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Western Organization of Resource Councils, WildEarth Guardians (Hornbein, Melissa)
May 3, 2021 Filing 47 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Neil Levine on behalf of Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling (Levine, Neil) Added filers on 5/3/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
May 3, 2021 Filing 46 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Kellan Richard Smith on behalf of Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling (Smith, Kellan) Added filers on 5/3/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
May 3, 2021 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Support of #44 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Petitioner State of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David Glenn, #2 Affidavit of Thomas Kropatsch, #3 Affidavit of Pete Obermueller, #4 Affidavit of Jenifer Scoggin, #5 Affidavit of Katie Smith, #6 Affidavit of James Willox) (Jordan, Travis)
May 3, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Petitioner State of Wyoming. (Jordan, Travis)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #33 , #39 Motions to appear pro hac vice admitting Neal Levine and Kellan Smith for Intervenor-Respondents Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling (Order emailed to phv counsel on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson granting #26 Motion to File Excess Pages. Petitioners may file a 50-page brief. Federal Respondents may file a 50-page brief and have 28 days from the filing of the Motion to file a response. (Court Staff, sbh)
May 3, 2021 Filing 41 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #40 Motion to Intervene. (Court Staff, smh)
April 30, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Intervene as Respondents filed by Movants Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Perry, #2 Declaration of Auden Schendler, #3 Declaration of Martins Putelis, #4 Declaration of Kathryn Bedell, #5 Declaration of Mark Waltermire, #6 Declaration of Ashley Korenblat) (Moats, Bruce) Modified text on 4/30/2021 (Court Staff, sbh). Modified text on 5/3/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 30, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Kellan Smith to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movants Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kellan Smith, #2 Proposed Order) (Moats, Bruce) Modified text on 4/30/2021 (Court Staff, sbh). Modified text on 5/3/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 30, 2021 Filing 38 DISREGARD. Duplicate of #33 . MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. First MOTION for Neal Levine to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondent Western Spirit Cycling. (Moats, Bruce) Modified on 4/30/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 30, 2021 Filing 37 DISREGARD. Duplicate of #33 . MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. First MOTION for Neal Levine to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondent Thistle Whistle Farm. (Moats, Bruce) Modified on 4/30/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 30, 2021 Filing 36 DISREGARD. Duplicate of #33 . MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. First MOTION for Neal Levine to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondent Roan Creek Ranch. (Moats, Bruce) Modified on 4/30/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 30, 2021 Filing 35 DISREGARD. Duplicate of #33 . MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. First MOTION for Neal Levine to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondent Hunt to Eat. (Moats, Bruce) Modified on 4/30/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 30, 2021 Filing 34 DISREGARD. Duplicate of #33 . MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. First MOTION for Neal Levine to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondent Aspen Skiing Company. (Moats, Bruce) Modified on 4/30/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 30, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Neal Levine to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movants Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling (Moats, Bruce) Modified filers on 4/30/2021 (Court Staff, sbh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/30/2021: #1 Declaration of Neil Levine) (Court Staff, sbh). Modified text on 5/3/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 30, 2021 Filing 32 DISREGARD. Duplicate of #27 . NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce T Moats on behalf of Western Spirit Cycling (Moats, Bruce) Modified on 4/30/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 30, 2021 Filing 31 DISREGARD. Duplicate of #27 . NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce T Moats on behalf of Thistle Whistle Farm (Moats, Bruce) Modified on 4/30/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 30, 2021 Filing 30 DISREGARD. Duplicate of #27 . NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce T Moats on behalf of Roan Creek Ranch (Moats, Bruce) Modified on 4/30/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 30, 2021 Filing 29 DISREGARD. Duplicate of #27 . NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce T Moats on behalf of Hunt to Eat (Moats, Bruce) Modified on 4/30/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 30, 2021 Filing 28 DISREGARD. Duplicate of #27 . NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce T Moats on behalf of Aspen Skiing Company (Moats, Bruce) Modified on 4/30/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 30, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce T Moats on behalf of Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling (Moats, Bruce) Modified filers on 4/30/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 30, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $200 received for pro hac vice fees for Neil Levine and Kellan Smith. Receipt CHY034661. (Court Staff, sjk)
April 28, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding Memorandum in Support of and in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Petitioner State of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jordan, Travis) Modified text on 4/28/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 27, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #20 MOTION to Intervene filed by Respondents Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary. (Sawyer, Michael) Modified text on 4/28/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 22, 2021 Filing 24 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Kyle James Tisdel on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Food & Water Watch, Indian People's Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Western Organization of Resource Councils, WildEarth Guardians (Tisdel, Kyle)
April 20, 2021 Filing 23 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Thomas R. Delehanty on behalf of Conservation Colorado, Friends of the Earth, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Workshop (Delehanty, Thomas)
April 20, 2021 Filing 22 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Robin Cooley on behalf of Conservation Colorado, Friends of the Earth, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Workshop (Cooley, Robin)
April 20, 2021 Filing 21 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Michael S Freeman on behalf of Conservation Colorado, Friends of the Earth, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Workshop (Freeman, Michael)
April 19, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $200 received for pro hac vice fees for Melissa Hornbein and Kyle Tisdel. Receipt CHY034599. (Court Staff, sjk)
April 19, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $300 received for pro hac vice fees for Robin Cooley, Thomas Delehanty & Michael Freeman. Receipt CHY034600. (Court Staff, sjk)
April 19, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Intervene filed by Movants Powder River Basin Resource Council, Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Conservation Colorado, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Friends of the Earth, Food & Water Watch, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, Indian People's Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declarations in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Proposed Order) (Anderson, Shannon) Modified filers and text on 4/20/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 19, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Anderson on behalf of Movants Powder River Basin Resource Council, Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Conservation Colorado, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Friends of the Earth, Food & Water Watch, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, Indian People's Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop (Anderson, Shannon) Modified filers on 4/20/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF RECUSAL by the Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl. The Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal recused. Case reassigned to Honorable Alan B. Johnson for all further proceedings. (Court Staff, sal) (Main Document 18 replaced on 4/20/2021) (Court Staff, sal).
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #15 Motion for Melissa Hornbein to appear pro hac vice; granting #16 Motion for Kyle Tisdel to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Movants Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Food & Water Watch, Indian Peoples Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Western Organization of Resource Councils, WildEarth Guardians. Copy of order emailed to counsel on this date. (Court Staff, stmo) Modified text on 4/20/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 19, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Kyle Tisdel to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movants Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Food & Water Watch, Indian Peoples Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Western Organization of Resource Councils, WildEarth Guardians (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Anderson, Shannon) Modified filers on 4/20/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 19, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Melissa Hornbein to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movants Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Food & Water Watch, Indian Peoples Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Western Organization of Resource Councils, WildEarth Guardians (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Anderson, Shannon) Modified filers on 4/20/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #11 Motion for Robin Cooley to appear pro hac vice; granting #12 Motion for Thomas R. Delehanty to appear pro hac vice; granting #13 Motion for Michael S. Freeman to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Movants Conservation Colorado, Friends of the Earth, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Workshop (Court Staff, stmo). Copy of order emailed to counsel on this date. Modified on 4/19/2021 (Court Staff, stmo). Modified text on 4/20/2021 (Court Staff, sbh). (Main Document 14 replaced on 4/20/2021) (Court Staff, szf).
April 19, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Mike Freeman to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movants Conservation Colorado, Friends of the Earth, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Workshop (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Anderson, Shannon) Modified filers on 4/20/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 19, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Tom Delehanty to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movants Conservation Colorado, Friends of the Earth, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Workshop (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Anderson, Shannon) Modified filers on 4/20/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Robin Cooley to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movants Conservation Colorado, Friends of the Earth, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Workshop (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Anderson, Shannon) Modified filers on 4/20/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 18, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Michael Sawyer on behalf of Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Sawyer, Michael)
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Wyoming. Bureau of Land Management served on 3/26/2021, answer due on 5/25/2021; Bureau of Land Management Acting Director served on 3/26/2021, answer due on 5/25/2021; Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director served on 3/26/2021, answer due on 5/25/2021; United States Department of Interior served on 3/29/2021, answer due on 5/28/2021; United States Department of Interior Secretary served on 3/29/2021, answer due on 5/28/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, U.S. Attorney General, #2 Proof of Service, Bureau of Land Management, #3 Proof of Service, Civil Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney's Office, #4 Proof of Service Nada Culver, Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management, #5 Proof of Service, U.S. Dep't of Interior, #6 Proof of Service, Debra Haaland, Secretary, U.S. Dep't of Interior, #7 Proof of Service, Kim Liebhauser, Acting Director, Wyoming Bureau of Land Management) (Jordan, Travis)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #7 Motion for Michael S. Sawyer to appear pro hac vice. Copy of order emailed to counsel on this date. (Court Staff, stmo) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/8/2021) (Court Staff, stmo).
April 6, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Michael S. Sawyer to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Respondents Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael S. Sawyer, #2 Proposed Order)(Vassallo, Nicholas)
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Vassallo on behalf of Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Vassallo, Nicholas)
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued. (Court Staff, stbd)
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal (presiding). Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (referral). (Court Staff, stbd)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James C Kaste on behalf of State of Wyoming (Kaste, James)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Steven Jordan on behalf of State of Wyoming (Jordan, Travis)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW filed by State of Wyoming (Filing fee $402, receipt #AWYDC-1910614) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jordan, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Wyoming v. United States Department of Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Interior Secretary
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bureau of Land Management Acting Director
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Interior
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nada Culver
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kim Liebhauser
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Debra Anne Haaland
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Wyoming
Represented By: James C Kaste
Represented By: Travis Steven Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Conservation Colorado
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Western Colorado Alliance
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Alterra Mountain Company
Represented By: Neil Levine
Represented By: Bruce T Moats
Represented By: Kellan Richard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Roan Creek Ranch
Represented By: Neil Levine
Represented By: Bruce T Moats
Represented By: Kellan Richard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Hunt to Eat
Represented By: Neil Levine
Represented By: Bruce T Moats
Represented By: Kellan Richard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Citizens for a Healthy Community
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Western Spirit Cycling
Represented By: Neil Levine
Represented By: Bruce T Moats
Represented By: Kellan Richard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Valley Organic Growers Association
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Sierra Club
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Aspen Skiing Company
Represented By: Neil Levine
Represented By: Bruce T Moats
Represented By: Kellan Richard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Thistle Whistle Farm
Represented By: Neil Levine
Represented By: Bruce T Moats
Represented By: Kellan Richard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Parks Conservation Association
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Powder River Basin Resource Council
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Earthworks
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Montana Environmental Information Center
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: The Wilderness Society
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Western Organization of Resource Councils
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Food & Water Watch
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Wilderness Workshop
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Friends of the Earth
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Indian People's Action
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Great Old Broads for Wilderness
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?