Line Finders LLC v. Arch Insurance Company Inc
Plaintiff: Line Finders LLC
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company Inc
Case Number: 0:2021cv00104
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 28 STATEMENT Concerning Diversity Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Line Finders LLC. (Gragg, Brenton)
July 1, 2021 Filing 27 INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. Expert Witness Designation-Plaintiff deadline 11/30/2021. Expert Witness Designation-Defendant deadline 12/30/2021. Discovery due by 1/31/2022. Motions filing deadline 2/25/2022. Motion response deadline 3/11/2022. Replies due by 3/18/2022. Joint Final Pretrial Memorandum due by 4/29/2022. Motion in Limine deadline 4/29/2022. Motions in Limine Response Deadline 5/13/2022. Motions in Limine Reply Deadline 5/20/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2022 09:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B. Johnson. 3-4 day Bench Trial set for 7/11/2022 01:30 PM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B. Johnson. (Court Staff, sbh)
July 1, 2021 Filing 26 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B. Johnson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/1/2021 (Court Reporter: Melanie Sonntag) (Court Staff, sbh)
June 24, 2021 Filing 25 Proposed JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting re #16 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT filed by Plaintiff Line Finders LLC. (Gragg, Brenton) Modified text on 6/28/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
June 15, 2021 Filing 24 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE Resetting Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 7/1/2021 at 10:30 AM BY TELEPHONE before Honorable Alan B Johnson. All parties should appear by telephone through the Courts conference call system. Guests call: Toll Free 866-434-5269 | Access code 1316504# | Join as guest Press # | Security code 1001# (Court Staff, ssw)
June 15, 2021 Filing 23 Amended CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Line Finders LLC identifying Other Affiliate Quest Holdco LLC for Line Finders LLC (Hendrickson, James) Modified on 6/16/2021 (Court Staff, stmo).
June 14, 2021 Filing 22 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Brenton L. Gragg on behalf of Line Finders LLC (Gragg, Brenton)
June 14, 2021 Filing 21 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Jordan Factor on behalf of Line Finders LLC (Factor, Jordan)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #18 Motion for Brenton Gragg to appear pro hac vice; granting #19 Motion for Jordan Factor to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff Line Finders LLC. Copy of order emailed to PHV counsel on this date (Court Staff, stmo). Fees of $200 paid on 6/7/21 with receipt CHY034832. Modified on 6/11/2021 to include receipt for fees (Court Staff, sjk).
June 11, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Amended MOTION for Jordan Factor to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Line Finders LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Hendrickson, James)
June 11, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Amended MOTION for Brenton Gragg to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Line Finders LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Hendrickson, James)
June 11, 2021 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Line Finders LLC (Hendrickson, James)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT of Meeting and Proposed Joint Discovery and Case Management Plan and Setting Initial Pretrial Conference by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 9:30 AM BY TELEPHONE before Honorable Alan B Johnson. All parties should appear by telephone through the Courts conference call system. Guests call:Toll Free 866-434-5269 | Access code 1316504# | Join as guest Press # | Security code 1001#(Court Staff, ssw)
June 10, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANALOGOUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN CIVIL CASES by the Honorable Alan B Johnson.(Court Staff, ssw)
June 9, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Arch Insurance Company Inc identifying Corporate Parent Arch Reinsurance Company, Corporate Parent Arch Capital Group Ltd for Arch Insurance Company Inc (Hearing, Gregory)
June 9, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Arch Insurance Company Inc. (Hearing, Gregory)
June 9, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service re #4 State Court Complaint filed by Plaintiff Line Finders LLC. Arch Insurance Company Inc was served on 4/26/2021. (Court Staff, sbh)
June 9, 2021 Filing 11 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET (Court Staff, sbh)
June 8, 2021 Filing 10 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record by Defendant Arch Insurance Company Inc re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Assignment of Judge, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Motion for Admission Pro Hav Vice - Brenton Gragg, #4 Exhibit 4 - Motion for Admission Pro Hace Vice Admission - Jodan Factor, #5 Exhibit 5 - Order Admitting Non-Resident Attorney - Jordan Factor, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order Admitting Non-Residence Attorney - Brenton Gragg, #7 Exhibit 7 - Entry of Appearane of John M. Palmeri and Gregory S. Hearing, #8 Exhibit 8 - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, #9 Exhibit 9 - Order Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, #10 Exhibit 10 - Affdavit of Service for Arch Insurance Group, #11 Exhibit 11 - Amended Complaint, #12 Exhibit 12 - State Court Notice of Removal and Exhibit A, #13 Exhibit 13 - USDC Order on Removal, #14 State Court Docket Sheet) (Hearing, Gregory) Modified event and text on 6/9/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
June 7, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $200 received for pro hac vice fees for Brenton Gragg & Jordan Factor. Receipt CHY034832. Additional fee(s) is NOT required upon filing Amended Motion(s) to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Court Staff, sjk)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin denying for failure to comply with Local Rule #7 , #8 Motions to appear pro hac vice (Court Staff, sbh)
June 4, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Jordan Factor to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Line Finders LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Hendrickson, James)
June 4, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Brenton Gragg to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Line Finders LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Hendrickson, James)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON REMOVAL by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson re #1 Notice of Removal (Order mailed to State Court on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
May 26, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Defendant Arch Insurance Company Inc filed 5/26/2021 by Line Finders LLC. (Court Staff, stmo) (Main Document 5 replaced with conformed copy on 6/9/2021) (Court Staff, sbh). Modified text on 6/9/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed 3/31/2021 by Line Finders LLC. (Court Staff, stmo)
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Alan B. Johnson with a referral to Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin. (Court Staff, stmo) Modified text on 5/26/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Palmeri on behalf of Arch Insurance Company Inc (Palmeri, John)
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sixth Judicial District Court, 39763 filed by Arch Insurance Company Inc (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AWYDC-1940581) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Line Finders Corporate Disclosure, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hearing, Gregory) Modified text on 5/26/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Line Finders LLC v. Arch Insurance Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Line Finders LLC
Represented By: Amanda Kay Roberts
Represented By: Brenton L. Gragg
Represented By: James Kyle Hendrickson
Represented By: Jordan Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company Inc
Represented By: Gregory Steve Hearing, II
Represented By: John M Palmeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?