Engel v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Randolph Engel
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2021cv00109
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randolph Engel. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 7/15/2021, answer due on 8/5/2021 (Merritt, Hannalore)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OR STATUS REPORT by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Plaintiff shall file either a proof of service or a status report regarding service by 7/30/21.(Court Staff, sal)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Hannalore B Merritt on behalf of Randolph Engel (Merritt, Hannalore) Modified on 6/28/2021 (Court Staff, szf).
June 2, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Hannalore Merritt. Receipt CHY034812. (Court Staff, sjk)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Court Staff, sal)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #3 Motion for Hannalore B. Merritt to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff Randolph Engel (copy of order emailed to pro hac vice counsel on this date) (Court Staff, stmo).
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Hannalore B. Merritt to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Randolph Engel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, stbd) (Main Document 3 replaced with Counsel's signature on 6/8/2021) (Court Staff, stbd).
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Randolph Engel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, stbd) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/2/2021) (Court Staff, stbd). (Main Document 2 replaced to correct case number on 6/8/2021) (Court Staff, stbd).
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Petition for Judicial Review (3 summons(es) issued), filed by Randolph Engel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover sheet) (Court Staff, stbd) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/3/2021) (Court Staff, sal).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engel v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Engel
Represented By: Christine Lichtenfels
Represented By: Hannalore B Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?