Defty v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: Spencer Defty and Laura Defty
Defendant: Stacy Runia, Swift Creek Plumbing LLC, Suburban Propane MLP, Dane Runia and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv00112
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin.(Court Staff, smh)
July 12, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Laura Defty, Spencer Defty (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tollison, Sarah)
July 7, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott P Klosterman on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Klosterman, Scott)
July 6, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Loyd E Smith on behalf of Swift Creek Plumbing LLC (Smith, Loyd)
July 1, 2021 Filing 12 First CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company,. (Scoggin, Sean)
July 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of complexity by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company ; this case is non-complex. (Scoggin, Sean)
July 1, 2021 Filing 10 E-FILING ERROR, DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED. NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean W Scoggin on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Scoggin, Sean) Modified on 7/1/2021 (Court Staff, szf).
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 First ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Scoggin, Sean)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean W Scoggin on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Scoggin, Sean)
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin.In accordance with Local Rule 6.1(b), the Court grants Defendants a ten day extension to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Court Staff, smh)
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Spencer Defty, Laura Defty. Suburban Propane MLP served on 6/10/2021, answer due on 7/1/2021 (Court Staff, stmo)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Spencer Defty, Laura Defty. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company served on 6/10/2021, answer due on 7/1/2021 (Court Staff, stmo)
June 9, 2021 Filing 4 Four Summons Issued by Clerk of Court on June 9, 2021. (Court Staff, szf)
June 8, 2021 Filing 3 Praecipe for Summonses to be Issued filed by Plaintiffs Laura Defty, Spencer Defty (Attachments: #1 Summons to State Farm, #2 Summons to Suburban Propane, #3 Summons to Swift Creek Plumbing, #4 Summons to Runias) (Tollison, Sarah) (Main Document 3 and Attachments 1, 2, 3, 4 replaced on 6/9/2021) (Court Staff, szf).
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. (Court Staff, stbd)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number AWYDC-1944876)Attorney Sarah E Tollison added to party Spencer and Laura Defty(pty:pla), filed by Spencer and Laura Defty. (Tollison, Sarah) (Main Document 1 replaced with Counsel's signature on 6/7/2021) (Court Staff, stbd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet received and added) (Court Staff, stbd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Defty v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Runia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Creek Plumbing LLC
Represented By: Loyd E Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suburban Propane MLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane Runia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Scott P Klosterman
Represented By: Sean W Scoggin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer Defty
Represented By: Sarah E Tollison
Represented By: David F DeFazio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Defty
Represented By: Sarah E Tollison
Represented By: David F DeFazio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?