Clervrain v. Wyoming Governor et al
Plaintiff: Manetirony Clervrain
Defendant: Wyoming Governor, United States Board of Immigration Appeals Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation Director, United States Senator, Mark Gordon, Hugh Mullane, Renea McDermatt and Cynthia M Lummis
Case Number: 0:2021cv00132
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. No Amended Complaint was filed in this matter by the filing deadline of August 20, 2021. Therefore, pursuant to the Order entered by this Court on July 19, 2021, this case is hereby dismissed and the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Copy of docket sheet containing this Order mailed to Plaintiff on this date via U.S. mail.(Court Staff, sal)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal dismissing action with leave to amend and ruling on pending motions. #2 Motion for consideration of compelling needs denied as moot; #3 Motion to proceed IFP granted; #4 Motion for judicial interventions denied as moot; #5 Motion for prompt notices denied as moot. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by 8/20/21. It is hereby certified that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff on this date via U.S. mail.(Court Staff, sal) Modified text on 7/20/2021 (Court Staff, sjlg).
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 "MOTION for ["Prompt Notices(s)"] or ["Their Expertise Act"] ("TEA"), or Opinion(s) by the National Issues Regulatory Treaties Act ("NIRTA") filed by Plaintiff Manetirony Clervrain. (Court Staff, sal)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 "MOTION for ["Judicial Intervention(s)"] and Clarification Necessary by Invoking the Movement(s) on Crimes Mitigating Act ("MOCMA")" filed by Plaintiff Manetirony Clervrain. (Court Staff, sal)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 "MOTION for Mitigating Financial Burden or ("IFP") Constitutional Issues by massive issues ["Rights Aggravated"] Treatment Act" filed by Plaintiff Manetirony Clervrain. (Court Staff, sal)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 "MOTION for consideration or compelling need(s) or controversies to litigate by invoking the ANT(S) Duty Mitigating Act ("TADMA")" filed by Plaintiff Manetirony Clervrain. (Court Staff, sal)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no summons(es) issued) with Jury Demand filed by Manetirony Clervrain. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clervrain v. Wyoming Governor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Governor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Board of Immigration Appeals Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Senator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh Mullane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renea McDermatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia M Lummis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manetirony Clervrain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?