Teichert v. Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints et al
Plaintiff: Tim Teichert and Tim Teichert (MT)
Defendant: The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints and Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints
Case Number: 0:2021cv00145
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 21 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Larry R. Laycock on behalf of Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints (Laycock, Larry)
September 9, 2021 Filing 20 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Adam Beckstrom on behalf of Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints (Beckstrom, Adam)
September 9, 2021 Filing 19 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Clinton Duke on behalf of Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints (Duke, Clinton)
September 9, 2021 PAYMENT ENTRY: Pro Hac Vice fee paid on behalf of Adam B. Beckstrom, $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-1991928 re #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Beckstrom, Adam)
September 9, 2021 PAYMENT ENTRY: Pro Hac Vice fee paid on behalf of Clinton E. Duke, $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-1991920 re #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Duke, Clinton)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT AND PROPOSED JOINT DISCOVERY AND CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 9:30 AM BY TELEPHONE from Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B. Johnson. Guests call: Toll Free 866-434-5269 | Access code 1316504# | Join as guest Press # | Security code 1001#. (Court Staff, sbh)
September 8, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANALOGOUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN CIVIL CASES by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson (Court Staff, sbh)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #14 , #15 MOTIONS to appear pro hac vice admitting Clinton E. Duke and Adam B. Beckstrom for Defendants Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints (Order emailed to phv counsel on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
September 7, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Adam B. Beckstrom to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Buckley, Lucas)
September 7, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Clinton E. Duke to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Buckley, Lucas)
September 3, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Buckley, Lucas)
September 1, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR LARRY R LAYCOCK. RECEIPT CHY035208. (Court Staff, sjk)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall have until September 6, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Court Staff, smh)
August 23, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendants Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Buckley, Lucas)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #9 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Larry R. Laycock for Defendants Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints (Order emailed to phv counsel on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Larry R. Laycock to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Buckley, Lucas)
August 6, 2021 Filing 8 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE filed by Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints filed in State Court on 7/22/21. Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints served on 7/9/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Court Staff, sjlg)
August 6, 2021 Filing 7 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET (Buckley, Lucas)
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record. (Buckley, Lucas)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON REMOVAL by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson re #1 Notice of Removal. The removing party shall file the state court record and docket sheet within 10 days. (Order mailed to state court on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints , Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Court Staff, stmo) Modified text on 8/2/2021 (Court Staff, sjlg).
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lucas Evan Buckley on behalf of Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints (Court Staff, stmo) Modified text on 8/2/2021 (Court Staff, sjlg). Modified on 8/10/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed June 15, 2021 by Tim Teichert, Tim Teichert (MT). (Court Staff, stmo) Modified text on 8/2/2021 (Court Staff, sjlg).
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third Judicial District, Lincoln County, CV-2021-87 filed by Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CHY035056) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 MJ Consent) (Court Staff, stmo) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/28/2021: #3 Proposed Order) (Court Staff, stmo). Modified text on 7/30/2021 (Court Staff, sbh). Modified text on 8/2/2021 (Court Staff, sjlg). Modified on 8/10/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teichert v. Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Teichert
Represented By: Henry F Bailey, Jr
Represented By: Lance Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Teichert (MT)
Represented By: Henry F Bailey, Jr
Represented By: Lance Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints
Represented By: Lucas Evan Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints
Represented By: Lucas Evan Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints
Represented By: Lucas Evan Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints
Represented By: Adam Beckstrom
Represented By: Clinton Duke
Represented By: Larry R. Laycock
Represented By: Lucas Evan Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints
Represented By: Adam Beckstrom
Represented By: Clinton Duke
Represented By: Larry R. Laycock
Represented By: Lucas Evan Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints
Represented By: Adam Beckstrom
Represented By: Clinton Duke
Represented By: Larry R. Laycock
Represented By: Lucas Evan Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?