Switch Ltd v Lunavi Inc et al
Plaintiff: Switch, Ltd. and Switch Ltd
Defendant: Lunavi, Inc., Green House Data, Inc., Lunavi Inc and Green House Data Inc
Case Number: 0:2021cv00147
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Office: WYD Office
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 45 ANSWER to #37 Counterclaim by Switch Ltd. (Whitmer, Frederick) Modified text on 9/21/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
September 13, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel of Samuel D. Castor and Lynnel M. Reyes by Plaintiff Switch Ltd, Counter Defendant Switch Ltd (Stedillie, Alaina)
September 9, 2021 Filing 43 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Mansi Shah on behalf of Switch Ltd (Shah, Mansi)
September 2, 2021 Filing 42 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by J Mark Smith on behalf of Green House Data Inc, Lunavi Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-1989183. (Smith, J)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT AND PROPOSED JOINT DISCOVERY AND CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 1:30 PM BY TELEPHONE from Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B. Johnson. Guests call: Toll Free 866-434-5269 | Access code 1316504# | Join as guest Press # | Security code 1001#. (Court Staff, sbh)
September 1, 2021 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANALOGOUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN CIVIL CASES by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson (Court Staff, sbh)
September 1, 2021 Filing 39 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Megan Elizabeth Bussey on behalf of Switch Ltd (Bussey, Megan)
September 1, 2021 Filing 38 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Frederick L. Whitmer on behalf of Switch Ltd (Whitmer, Frederick)
August 31, 2021 Filing 37 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Switch Ltd by Green House Data Inc, Lunavi Inc. (Smith, Michael)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #35 MOTION to appear pro hac vice admitting J. Mark Smith for Defendants Lunavi Inc, Green House Data Inc (Order emailed to phv counsel on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
August 30, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for J. Mark Smith to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants Green House Data Inc, Lunavi Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
August 30, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Daniel Smith on behalf of Green House Data Inc, Lunavi Inc (Smith, Michael)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #32 MOTION to appear pro hac vice admitting Megan E. Bussey for Plaintiff Switch Ltd (Order emailed to phv counsel on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
August 28, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Megan Bussey to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Switch Ltd. (See #28 for payment) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Megan Bussey, #2 Exhibit NY Bar Registration Status, #3 Proposed Order) (Stedillie, Alaina) Modified text on 8/30/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
August 27, 2021 Filing 31 Notice of Withdrawal filed by Switch Ltd withdrawing #28 MOTION for to appear pro hac vice (Stedillie, Alaina)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #27 , #29 MOTIONS to appear pro hac vice admitting Frederick L. Whitmer and Mansi H. Shah for Plaintiff Switch Ltd (Order emailed to phv counsel on this date) (Court Staff, sbh) Modified text on 8/30/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
August 27, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Mansi H. Shah to appear pro hac vice filed by Switch Ltd. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-1986844. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Stedillie, Alaina) Modified event and text on 8/27/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
August 27, 2021 Filing 28 WITHDRAWN per #31 Notice. MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Megan E. Bussey to appear pro hac vice filed by Switch Ltd. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-1986838. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Stedillie, Alaina) Modified event and text on 8/27/2021 (Court Staff, sbh). Modified on 8/30/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
August 27, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Frederick L. Whitmer to appear pro hac vice filed by Switch Ltd. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-1986833. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Stedillie, Alaina) Modified event and text on 8/27/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
August 27, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alaina Marie Stedillie on behalf of Switch Ltd (Stedillie, Alaina)
August 27, 2021 REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: #27 MOTION for Frederick L. Whitmer to appear pro hac vice (Court Staff, sbh)
August 27, 2021 REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: #29 MOTION for Mansi H. Shah to appear pro hac vice (Court Staff, sbh)
August 27, 2021 REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: #28 MOTION for Megan E. Bussey to appear pro hac vice (Court Staff, sbh)
August 16, 2021 Filing 25 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. This case was transferred from the Southern District of New York to the District of Wyoming on July 30, 2021. No counsel is a member of the Federal Bar in Wyoming. Therefore, this Court orders that within 14 days of this Order, counsel shall associate with local counsel to be admitted pro hac vice into this District. (See Local Rule 84.2). (Order mailed to plaintiff's counsel and emailed to defendants' counsel on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
July 30, 2021 Filing 24 Case transferred in from Southern District of New York. Case Number 7:21-cv-01539. Modified on 8/3/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
July 30, 2021 Filing 23 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Wyoming. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Accordingly, it is HEREBY ORDERED: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404, the Clerk of Court is instructed to transfer this case to the District of Wyoming and close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/30/2021) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
July 29, 2021 Filing 21 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Switch, Ltd...(Whitmer, Frederick) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
July 29, 2021 Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Frederick L. Whitmer dated July 29, 2021 re: Response to July 20, 2021 Order (Dkt. 18). Document filed by Switch, Ltd...(Whitmer, Frederick) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
July 23, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Amended Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1400(b) and Section 1404 re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Green House Data, Inc., Lunavi, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Errata Defendants' Amended Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1400 (b) and Section 1404).(Smith, J.) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, by no later than July 29, 2021, plaintiff must notify the Court by letter whether it (i) intends to file an amended complaint in response to the motion to dismiss, or (ii) will rely on the complaint that is the subject of the motion to dismiss. If plaintiff elects not to file an amended complaint, the motion will proceed in the regular course, and the Court is unlikely to grant plaintiff a further opportunity to amend to address the purported deficiencies made apparent by the fully briefed arguments in defendants' motion. See Loreley Fin. (Jersey) No. 3 Ltd. v. Wells Fargo Sec., LLC, 797 F.3d 160, 190 (2d Cir. 2015) (leaving "unaltered the grounds on which denial of leave to amend has long been held proper, such as undue delay, bad faith, dilatory motive, and futility"); accord F5 Capital v. Pappas, 856 F.3d 61, 89-90 (2d Cir. 2017). The time to file opposing and reply papers shall be governed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Civil Rules, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. If plaintiff elects to file an amended complaint, it must file the amended complaint by no later than 14 days after notifying the Court of its intent to do so. Within 21 days of such amendment, defendants may either: (i) file an answer to the amended complaint; or (ii) file a motion to dismiss the amended complaint; or (iii) notify the Court by letter that they are relying on the initially filed motion to dismiss. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/20/2021) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of to Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Green House Data, Inc., Lunavi, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1400 (b) and Section 1404, #2 Exhibit 1).(Smith, J.) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
July 13, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by J. Mark Smith on behalf of Green House Data, Inc., Lunavi, Inc...(Smith, J.) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Green House Data, Inc. waiver sent on 5/20/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. Document filed by Switch, Ltd...(Whitmer, Frederick) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Lunavi, Inc. waiver sent on 5/20/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. Document filed by Switch, Ltd...(Whitmer, Frederick) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADMITTING MANSI H. SHAH PRO HAC VICE granting #12 Motion for Mansi H. Shah to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 4/27/2021) (nb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Mansi H. Shah to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24452787. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Switch, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mansi H. Shah, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Shah, Mansi) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
April 26, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Mansi H. Shah to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24452787. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
April 23, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Samuel Castor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-24440347. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
April 23, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #11 MOTION for Lynnel M. Reyes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24440468. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Nevada;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
April 22, 2021 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Lynnel M. Reyes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24440468. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Switch, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Reyes, Lynnel) Modified on 4/23/2021 (wb). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
April 22, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Samuel Castor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-24440347. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Switch, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Castor, Sam) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 9 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Green House Data, Inc.. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lunavi, Inc.. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
February 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Frederick L. Whitmer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 35:0271. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 35:0001. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
February 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Frederick L. Whitmer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: All Parties. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
February 22, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Green House Data, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Switch, Ltd...(Whitmer, Frederick) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lunavi, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Switch, Ltd...(Whitmer, Frederick) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Whitmer, Frederick) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Switch Inc. for Switch, Ltd.. Document filed by Switch, Ltd...(Whitmer, Frederick) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Whitmer, Frederick) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Green House Data, Inc., Lunavi, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24013710)Document filed by Switch, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Whitmer, Frederick) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Switch Ltd v Lunavi Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Switch, Ltd.
Represented By: Lynnel Reyes
Represented By: Mansi H Shah
Represented By: Sam Castor
Represented By: Frederick L Whitmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Switch Ltd
Represented By: Alaina Marie Stedillie
Represented By: Frederick L. Whitmer
Represented By: Mansi Shah
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Bussey
Represented By: Lynnel Reyes
Represented By: Sam Castor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lunavi, Inc.
Represented By: J Mark Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green House Data, Inc.
Represented By: J Mark Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lunavi Inc
Represented By: J Mark Smith
Represented By: Michael Daniel Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green House Data Inc
Represented By: J Mark Smith
Represented By: Michael Daniel Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?