Three Forks Ranch Corp v. Maximum Comfort Pool & Spa Inc
Plaintiff: Three Forks Ranch Corp
Defendant: Maximum Comfort Pool & Spa Inc
Case Number: 0:2021cv00148
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Isaac Eckert on behalf of Maximum Comfort Pool & Spa Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2002749. (Eckert, Isaac)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by the Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl. Case reassigned to the Honorable Alan B. Johnson as Presiding Judge and Honorable Kelly H. Rankin as Referral Judge for all further proceedings. (Court Staff, sjlg)
September 13, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Daniel F Wolf on behalf of Maximum Comfort Pool & Spa Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-1993968. (Wolf, Daniel)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #13 , #14 MOTIONS to appear pro hac vice admitting Isaac "Ike" M. Eckert and Daniel F. Wolf for Defendant Maximum Comfort Pool & Spa Inc (Emailed to counsel) (Court Staff, smxb) Modified text on 9/9/2021 (Court Staff, smxb) Modified text on 9/22/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
September 9, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Daniel F. Wolf to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Counter Claimant Maximum Comfort Pool & Spa Inc, Defendant Maximum Comfort Pool & Spa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Reitman, Andrew)
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Issac "Ike" M. Eckert to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Counter Claimant Maximum Comfort Pool & Spa Inc, Defendant Maximum Comfort Pool & Spa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Reitman, Andrew)
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE indicating no corporate parent filed by Maximum Comfort Pool & Spa Inc (Reitman, Andrew) Modified docket text on 9/10/2021 (Court Staff, szf). Modified text on 9/22/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Three Forks Ranch Corp by Maximum Comfort Pool & Spa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Termination email and letter, #3 Exhibit C - MCPSs final invoice, costing information and transmittal letter) (Reitman, Andrew)
September 8, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Brian Andrew Lamping on behalf of Three Forks Ranch Corp (Lamping, Brian)
September 8, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Dudley W. Von Holt on behalf of Three Forks Ranch Corp (Von Holt, Dudley)
August 25, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $200 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEES FOR DUDLEY W VON HOLT AND BRIAN A LAMPING. RECEIPT CHY035173. (Court Staff, sjk)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #7 Motion to appear pro hac vice (Dudley W. Von Holt and Brian A. Lamping as counsel for Three Forks Ranch Corp). Copy of Order emailed to PHV counsel on this date. (Court Staff, sal) Modified on 8/26/2021 (Court Staff, sal).
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Dudley W. Von Holt and Brian A. Lamping to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Three Forks Ranch Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Thomas)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff Three Forks Ranch Corp: this case is non-complex. (Thompson, Thomas)
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Three Forks Ranch Corp. Maximum Comfort Pool & Spa Inc served on 8/5/2021, answer due on 8/26/2021 (Thompson, Thomas)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued. (Court Staff, stbd) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/30/2021) (Court Staff, szf).
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. (Court Staff, stbd)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE indicating no corporate parent filed by Plaintiff Three Forks Ranch Corp (Thompson, Thomas) Modified text on 7/30/2021 (Court Staff, stbd). Modified docket text on 7/30/2021. (Court Staff, szf). Modified text on 9/22/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Maximum Comfort Pool & Spa Inc filed by Three Forks Ranch Corp (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number AWYDC-1972698) (Thompson, Thomas) Modified text on 7/30/2021 (Court Staff, stbd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, stbd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Three Forks Ranch Corp v. Maximum Comfort Pool & Spa Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Three Forks Ranch Corp
Represented By: Thomas A Thompson
Represented By: Brian Andrew Lamping
Represented By: Dudley W. Von Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maximum Comfort Pool & Spa Inc
Represented By: Andrew P Reitman
Represented By: Daniel F Wolf
Represented By: Isaac Eckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?