Jones v. Mountainside Apartments LP et al
Plaintiff: Willie Jones
Defendant: Mountainside Apartments LP and Hudson Real Estate Co
Case Number: 0:2021cv00149
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Filing 9 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE RESETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: BY TELEPHONE - All parties shall appear by telephone through the Courts conference call system. Guests call: Toll Free 1-888-398-2342| Access code 3107456. | Join as guest Press # |Security code 1001#. Parties should have their calendars on hand for scheduling. Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 10/8/2021 10:00 AM before Honorable Kelly H Rankin. (Court Staff, smxb)
September 1, 2021 Filing 8 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: BY TELEPHONE - All parties shall appear by telephone through the Courts conference call system. Guests call: Toll Free 1-888-398-2342| Access code 3107456. | Join as guest Press # |Security code 1001#. Parties should have their calendars on hand for scheduling. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2021 09:00 AM before Honorable Kelly H Rankin. (Court Staff, smxb) Modified text on 9/1/2021 (Court Staff, smxb).
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Consent to Trial before Magistrate Judge by Hudson Real Estate Co, Willie Jones, Mountainside Apartments LP. (Court Staff, sjlg)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Mountainside Apartments LP. (Coppede, John)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Hudson Real Estate Co. (Coppede, John)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John A Coppede on behalf of Hudson Real Estate Co, Mountainside Apartments LP (Coppede, John)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. (Court Staff, stmo)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summonses Issued (Court Staff, stmo)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. (Filing fee $ 402 Receipt Number AWYDC-1974485)Attorney Alexander F Freeburg added to party Willie Jones(pty:pla), filed by Willie Jones. (Freeburg, Alexander) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2021: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, stmo). Modified text on 8/3/2021 (Court Staff, stmo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Mountainside Apartments LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Jones
Represented By: Alexander F Freeburg
Represented By: Ethan K Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountainside Apartments LP
Represented By: John A Coppede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Real Estate Co
Represented By: John A Coppede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?