VanBuskirk v. Teton & Stone LLC
Plaintiff: Sheila VanBuskirk
Defendant: Teton & Stone LLC doing business as Best Western Outlaw Inn
Case Number: 0:2021cv00151
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2021 09:00 AM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal.See Notice for call-in instructions. (Court Staff, sal)
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of complexity by Defendant Teton & Stone LLC ; this case is non-complex. (Santini, George)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Teton & Stone LLC. (Santini, George)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George Santini on behalf of Teton & Stone LLC (Santini, George)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin. The Court grants Defendant's stipulated request to extend the answer deadline. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 20, 2021. (Court Staff, sjgc)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued. (Court Staff, skb)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal. (Court Staff, skb)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Teton & Stone LLC with Jury Demand. (Filing fee $402, Receipt Number AWYDC-1976635), filed by Sheila VanBuskirk. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Freeburg, Alexander) (Attachment 2 replaced at counsel's request on 8/6/2021) (Court Staff, skb). Modified text on 8/6/2021 (Court Staff, skb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VanBuskirk v. Teton & Stone LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila VanBuskirk
Represented By: Alexander F Freeburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teton & Stone LLC doing business as Best Western Outlaw Inn
Represented By: George Santini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?