Arcamone-Makinano et al v. United States Department of the Interior Secretary et al
Plaintiff: Amelia Arcamone-Makinano, Bonifacio Makinano and Pauline St. Denis
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior Secretary, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, Deborah Halaand, Tracy Stone-Manning and Deborah Haaland
Case Number: 0:2021cv00196
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Dismissing Case with Leave to Amend by the Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal. This case is DISMISSED FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. The Court will afford Plaintiffs/Petitioners (one or more) up until the close of business on Friday, January 14, 2022, to file an amended complaint to adequately demonstrate that this Court has jurisdiction over a final agency action. Failure to timely file an amended complaint shall result in the clerk of court closing this case without notice and returning the filing fee. This will be Plaintiffs/Petitioners last opportunity to amend without leave of Court. Copy to all pro se parties via US Mail on December 14, 2021. (Court Staff, szf) Modified text on 12/16/2021 (Court Staff, sjlg).
November 16, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED PETITION FOR REVIEW, filed by Amelia Arcamone-Makinano, Pauline St. Denis, Bonifacio Makinano. (Court Staff, stbd)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Plaintiff9s) have until the close of business on 11/22/21 to file an Amended Complaint. Failure to timely file an amended complaint shall result in the clerk of court closing this case without notice and returning the filing fee. Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiffs on this date via U.S. mail.(Court Staff, sal)
October 25, 2021 Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment. Filing Fee was paid with Receipt Number: CHY035440. (Court Staff, sbh)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW OF AGENCY ACTIONS. Counsel - payment is due within three calendar days. To pay the filing fee with a credit card, please use the event Notice of Civil Filing Fee in CM/ECF or send a check to the Clerk of US District Court, 2120 Capitol Avenue Room 2131, Cheyenne, WY 82001, filed by Amelia Arcamone-Makinano, Bonifacio Makinano. Copy of NEF provided to pro-se filer via e-mail. (Court Staff, scat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arcamone-Makinano et al v. United States Department of the Interior Secretary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior Secretary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Halaand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Stone-Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Haaland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Arcamone-Makinano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonifacio Makinano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline St. Denis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?