Calvert v. Sky Ridge Investments Inc

Plaintiff: James R Calvert
Defendant: Sky Ridge Investments Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv00118
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Office: Casper Office
County: Campbell
0 Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
1 Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal denying #13 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Court Staff, sal)
November 27, 2018 Filing 16 REPLY to #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, #14 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, filed by Plaintiff James R Calvert. (Cotton, C)
November 20, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Sky Ridge Investments Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1, #2 Exhibit #2, #3 Exhibit #3, #4 Exhibit #4) (Gilbertz, Jay)
November 13, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of #13 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff James R Calvert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Gillette Police Report Regarding Incidents At Rodeway Inn, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Gillette Police Report Regarding Fire Investigation, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 State Of Wyoming Fire Marshal Report, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Campbell County Fire Department Report, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Statement Of Jordan Sharp) (Cotton, C) (Main Document 14 replaced on 11/14/2018) (Court Staff, sth). (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/14/2018) (Court Staff, sth).
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff James R Calvert. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment)(Cotton, C)
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDERby the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Motions filing deadline 6/3/2019. Motion response deadline 6/17/2019. Dispositive Motions Hearing set for 6/27/2019 01:30 PM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 1 (Room No. 2132) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Expert Witness Designation-Plaintiff deadline 3/1/2019. Expert Witness Designation-Defendant deadline 4/15/2019. Discovery due by 6/3/2019. Stipulation Deadline 6/10/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2019 01:30 PM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Jury Trial (7 days/stacked #1) set for 8/26/2019 08:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 1 (Room No. 2132) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Status Conference set for 4/30/2019 09:00 AM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal.(Court Staff, sal)
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 10/11/2018 02:30 PM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal)
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Sky Ridge Investments Inc. (Gilbertz, Jay)
August 30, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2018 10:30 AM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal)
August 24, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff James R Calvert ; this case is non-complex. (Cotton, C)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 First ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand by Sky Ridge Investments Inc. (Gilbertz, Jay)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James R Calvert. Sky Ridge Investments Inc served on 7/31/2018, answer due on 8/21/2018 (Cotton, C)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Defendant Sky Ridge Investments Inc Rule 7.1 Disclosure (Gilbertz, Jay)
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of complexity by Defendant Sky Ridge Investments Inc ; this case is non-complex. (Gilbertz, Jay)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jay A Gilbertz on behalf of Sky Ridge Investments Inc (Gilbertz, Jay)
July 23, 2018 Filing 2 Praecipe for 2 Alias Summons filed by Plaintiff James R Calvert (Attachments: #1 Alias Summons For Service On Agent, #2 Alias Summons For Service On Attorney) (Cotton, C) 2 Summons issued on 7/23/2018. Modified on 7/23/2018.(Court Staff, skb).
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (1 summons issued) with Jury Demand (filing fee $400 receipt #CAS002093), filed by James R Calvert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge) (Court Staff, skb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calvert v. Sky Ridge Investments Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R Calvert
Represented By: C John Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky Ridge Investments Inc
Represented By: Jay A Gilbertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?