Jackson National Life Insurance Company v. Reynolds et al

Plaintiff: Jackson National Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Darla L Reynolds, Kosette Vargas, Shawn Karban, Jeralynn Jo Andersen and Karla Rounseville
Case Number: 1:2018cv00133
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Office: Casper Office
County: Crook
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 10 First ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, , CROSSCLAIM against Crossclaim-Defendant Karla Rounseville, Kosette Vargas, Shawn Karban, Jeralynn Jo Andersen, COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Jackson National Life Insurance Company by Darla L Reynolds. (Schumacher, John)
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Charles Schumacher on behalf of Darla L Reynolds (Schumacher, John)
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kosette Vargas. (Court Staff, scat)
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jackson National Life Insurance Company. Darla L Reynolds 8/15/2018, answer due 10/15/2018 (Sweat, Bradley)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackson National Life Insurance Company. Karla Rounseville served on 8/17/2018, answer due on 9/7/2018 (Court Staff, scat)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackson National Life Insurance Company. Shawn Karban served on 8/18/2018, answer due on 9/10/2018 (Court Staff, scat)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackson National Life Insurance Company. Kosette Vargas served on 8/22/2018, answer due on 9/12/2018 (Court Staff, scat)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting #2 Motion to Deposit Funds (Court Staff, scat)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Order Authorizing Deposit of Funds filed by Plaintiff Jackson National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, scat) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/28/2018) (Court Staff, scat).
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader (5 summons(es) issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CAS002099.), filed by Jackson National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (Court Staff, scat) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/16/2018) (Court Staff, scat). Modified text on 8/20/2018 (Court Staff, scat). (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/22/2018) (Court Staff, scat).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson National Life Insurance Company v. Reynolds et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darla L Reynolds
Represented By: John Charles Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kosette Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Karban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeralynn Jo Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Rounseville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy Michael Stubson
Represented By: Bradley C Sweat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?