She v. Health Line International Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Dr Limin She
Defendant: Gloria Faulkner, Estrella Medical LLC, Health Line International Corporation, IMSI Medical Inc, Aaron Faulkner, Director and CEO of Health Line International Corporation, Elliot Faulkner and Joel Faulkner
Case Number: 1:2018cv00135
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Office: Casper Office
County: U.S. (County Unknown)
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting #15 Motion to transfer case to the United States District Court for the District of Utah and deferring ruling on #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. The hearing set for 8/30/18 at 9:00 a.m. is VACATED.(Court Staff, sal)
August 29, 2018 Filing 29 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE filed by Limin She. Estrella Medical LLC served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018; Aaron Faulkner served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018; Elliot Faulkner served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018; Gloria Faulkner served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018; Joel Faulkner served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018; IMSI Medical Inc served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. (Johansen, Bryan)
August 29, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah G Muirhead Kellam on behalf of Health Line International Corporation (Kellam, Deborah)
August 28, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Change Venue to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Utah filed by Plaintiff Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Mathey, Danielle)
August 28, 2018 Filing 26 NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - ERRATA re #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Plaintiff Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Mathey, Danielle)
August 28, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Order Leave to File Document Under Seal filed by Plaintiff Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mathey, Danielle)
August 27, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Stephen P Horvat. Receipt CHY029399. (Court Staff, sjk)
August 27, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendant Health Line International Corporation. (Horvat, Stephen)
August 27, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendants Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, IMSI Medical Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Lacock, Traci)
August 24, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $300 received for pro hac vice fees for Timothy Anderson, Brett Ekins, and Jeffrey Shields. Receipt CHY029387. (Court Staff, sjk)
August 24, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Brian Gargano. Receipt CHY029393. (Court Staff, sjk)
August 24, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Bryan S Johansen. Receipt CHY029392. (Court Staff, sjk)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #19 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Stephen P Horvat for Health Line International Corporation (Court Staff, sal)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #12 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Timothy B Anderson for Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner and IMSI Medical Inc; granting #13 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Brett D Ekins for Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner and IMSI Medical Inc; and granting #14 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Jeffrey W Shields for Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner and IMSI Medical Inc(Court Staff, sal)
August 23, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Support of #15 MOTION to Change Venue to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Utah filed by Defendant Health Line International Corporation. (Shurtleff, Lance)
August 23, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Stephen P. Horvat to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Health Line International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stephen P. Horvat, Esq., #2 Proposed Order)(Shurtleff, Lance)
August 23, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance E Shurtleff on behalf of Health Line International Corporation (Shurtleff, Lance)
August 23, 2018 Filing 17 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER Setting Schedule for #15 Motion to Change Venue to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Utah by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. It is ordered that Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion to Change Venue #15 on or before August 28, 2018. It is further ordered that the Court will hold a hearing on the Motion to Change Venue #15 on 8/30/2018 at 09:00 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 1 (Room No. 2132) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sjgc)
August 23, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. REQUEST for Hearing re #15 MOTION to Change Venue to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Utah filed by Defendants Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, IMSI Medical Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lacock, Traci)
August 23, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Change Venue to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Utah filed by Defendants Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, IMSI Medical Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lacock, Traci) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2018: #2 Exhibits) (Court Staff, sjlg).
August 23, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Jeffrey W. Shields to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, IMSI Medical Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lacock, Traci)
August 23, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Brett D. Ekins to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, IMSI Medical Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lacock, Traci)
August 23, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Timothy B. Anderson to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, IMSI Medical Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lacock, Traci)
August 22, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Traci L Lacock on behalf of Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, IMSI Medical Inc (Lacock, Traci)
August 22, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Carl Jarosh on behalf of Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, IMSI Medical Inc (Jarosh, Robert)
August 22, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Barbara Nickels-Smith Concerning Service filed by Plaintiff Limin She. (Mathey, Danielle)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Bryan S. Johansen for Plaintiff Dr. Limin She and #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Brian Gargano for Plaintiff Dr. Limin She by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin(Court Staff, szf)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Brian Gargano to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Mathey, Danielle)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Schedule for #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. It is ordered that Defendants shall respond to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before August 27, 2018. It is further ordered that the Court will hold a hearing on the #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on 8/30/2018 at 09:00 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 1 (Room No. 2132) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. It is finally ordered that Plaintiff shall provide Defendants with prompt notice of this order. Failure to ensure Defendants' have prompt notice of this Order will result in the Court vacating the briefing schedule. (Court Staff, sjlg)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Bryan S. Johansen to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Mathey, Danielle)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing on #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mathey, Danielle) Modified on 8/17/2018 (Court Staff, sal). Modified text on 8/17/2018 (Court Staff, sjlg).
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Mathey, Danielle) Modified text on 8/17/2018 (Court Staff, sjlg).
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Limin She. (Mathey, Danielle). Added MOTION relief and changed text on 8/17/2018 (Court Staff, sjlg).
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT (No summons(es) issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CAS002100.), filed by Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits A-P) (Court Staff, stbd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: She v. Health Line International Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Faulkner
Represented By: Jeffrey W Shields
Represented By: Timothy B Anderson
Represented By: Robert Carl Jarosh
Represented By: Brett D Ekins
Represented By: Traci L Lacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estrella Medical LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey W Shields
Represented By: Timothy B Anderson
Represented By: Robert Carl Jarosh
Represented By: Brett D Ekins
Represented By: Traci L Lacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Line International Corporation
Represented By: Lance E Shurtleff
Represented By: Deborah G Muirhead Kellam
Represented By: Stephen P Horvat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMSI Medical Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey W Shields
Represented By: Timothy B Anderson
Represented By: Robert Carl Jarosh
Represented By: Brett D Ekins
Represented By: Traci L Lacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Faulkner
Represented By: Jeffrey W Shields
Represented By: Timothy B Anderson
Represented By: Robert Carl Jarosh
Represented By: Brett D Ekins
Represented By: Traci L Lacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director and CEO of Health Line International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Faulkner
Represented By: Jeffrey W Shields
Represented By: Timothy B Anderson
Represented By: Robert Carl Jarosh
Represented By: Brett D Ekins
Represented By: Traci L Lacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Faulkner
Represented By: Jeffrey W Shields
Represented By: Timothy B Anderson
Represented By: Robert Carl Jarosh
Represented By: Brett D Ekins
Represented By: Traci L Lacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr Limin She
Represented By: Danielle M Mathey
Represented By: Brian Gargano
Represented By: Bryan S Johansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?