Box Creek Mineral Limited Partnership v. Chesapeake Exploration LLC et al

Plaintiff: Box Creek Mineral Limited Partnership
Defendant: Devon Energy Production Company LP, OOGC America LLC and Chesapeake Exploration LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00143
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
0 Judge: Alan B Johnson
1 Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE Resetting Initial Pretrial Conference (Judge Change Only!): Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2018 09:30 AM in Judge Rankin Chambers (Room No. 2204) before Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. All parties should appear by telephone, with Plaintiff's counsel initiating the call, through a conference call operator, and connecting to the Court at 307/433-2180. Parties are advised to have their calendars on hand to assist with scheduling. (Court Staff, szf)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by the Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl. Case reassigned to Honorable Kelly H. Rankin for all further proceedings; Honorable Alan B. Johnson no longer assigned to case.(Court Staff, szf)
October 1, 2018 Filing 22 STIPULATIONS of Consent to Trial before United States Magistrate Judge Entry of Final Judgement by United States Magistrate and Consent to Appeal to United States Court of Appeals by Box Creek Mineral Limited Partnership, Chesapeake Exploration LLC, Devon Energy Production Company LP, OOGC America LLC. (Court Staff, sjl)
September 20, 2018 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by OOGC America LLC, identifying Corporate Parent Nexen Energy Holdings USA Inc for OOGC America LLC.. (Killean, James)
September 18, 2018 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Devon Energy Production Company LP, identifying Corporate Parent DVN Operating Company, LLC, Corporate Parent Devon OEI Operating, LLC, Other Affiliate Devon Energy Corporation for Devon Energy Production Company LP.. (Gregersen, Clayton)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT of Meeting and Proposed Joint Discovery and Case Management Plan and Setting Initial Pretrial Conference by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2018 at 9:30 AM in Judge Johnson Chambers (Room No. 2018) before Honorable Alan B Johnson.(Court Staff, ssw)
September 18, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANALOGOUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN CIVIL CASES by the Honorable Alan B Johnson.(Court Staff, ssw)
September 14, 2018 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Chesapeake Exploration LLC. Chesapeake Operating LLC, Chesapeake E&P Holding LLC, and Chesapeak Energy Corporation added as corporate parents. (Klosterman, Scott) Modified on 9/18/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
September 6, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clayton Gregersen on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company LP (Gregersen, Clayton)
September 5, 2018 Filing 15 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET. (Court Staff, stbd)
September 5, 2018 Filing 14 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record. (Court Staff, stbd) (Main Document 14 replaced on 9/6/2018) (Court Staff, ssw). Duplicate received from District Court on on 9/10/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
September 4, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by OOGC America LLC. (Killean, James)
September 4, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James J Killean on behalf of OOGC America LLC (Killean, James)
August 31, 2018 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Plaintiff Box Creek Mineral Limited Partnership. (Hendrickson, James)
August 29, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of complexity by Defendant Chesapeake Exploration LLC ; this case is non-complex. (Klosterman, Scott)
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Chesapeake Exploration LLC. (Klosterman, Scott)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON REMOVAL regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Chesapeake Exploration LLC, by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Certified copy to Eighth Judicial District Court)(Court Staff, ssw) Text Modified on 9/5/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Kyle Hendrickson on behalf of Box Creek Mineral Limited Partnership (Hendrickson, James)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dan B Riggs on behalf of Box Creek Mineral Limited Partnership (Riggs, Dan)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Oven, Jeffery)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott P Klosterman on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration LLC. (Court Staff, stbd)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas F Reese on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration LLC. (Court Staff, stbd)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT, filed 7/24/2018 by Box Creek Mineral Limited Partnership. (Court Staff, stbd)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case No. 17838. (Filing fee $ 400 CAS002106), filed by Chesapeake Exploration LLC, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent, #3 Proposed Order) (Court Staff, stbd) Modified to update receipt number on 8/28/2018 (Court Staff, stbd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Box Creek Mineral Limited Partnership v. Chesapeake Exploration LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Energy Production Company LP
Represented By: Clayton Gregersen
Represented By: Jeffery James Oven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OOGC America LLC
Represented By: James J Killean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Exploration LLC
Represented By: Thomas F Reese
Represented By: Scott P Klosterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Box Creek Mineral Limited Partnership
Represented By: Dan B Riggs
Represented By: James Kyle Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?