King v. Prairie Field Services LLC

Plaintiff: Chico L King
Defendant: Prairie Field Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00176
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by Prairie Field Services LLC. (Hartl, Theodore)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Prairie Field Services LLC. Prairie Field Services LLC 11/1/2018, answer due 12/31/2018 (Hartl, Theodore)
November 28, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Mark S Enslin. Receipt CHY029923. (Court Staff, sjk)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #2 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Mark S Enslin for Prairie Field Services LLC. (Court Staff, ssw)Copy of order mailed to pro se plaintiff on 11/20/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theodore J Hartl on behalf of Prairie Field Services LLC (Hartl, Theodore)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Mark S. Enslin to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Prairie Field Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Hartl, Theodore)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (1 summons issued) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CAS002135.), filed by Chico L King. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope, #3 Envelope, #4 Consent to Magistrate Judge) Copy of Consent to Magistrate Judge mailed to defendant on this date. (Court Staff, scat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Prairie Field Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prairie Field Services LLC
Represented By: Theodore J Hartl
Represented By: Mark S Enslin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chico L King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?