Rohrbacher v. Teton Therapy PC

Plaintiff: Julie Rohrbacher and Julie L Rohrbacher
Defendant: Teton Therapy PC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00214
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Mark L Carman
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
2 Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Thomas H Mitchiner. Receipt CHY030300. (Court Staff, sjk)
February 4, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Steven L Murray. Receipt CHY030299. (Court Staff, sjk)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE RESETTING Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference reset from 3/04/2019 at 10:30 AM before Honorable Mark L. Carman to 2/27/2019 at 09:00 AM in Judge Rankin Chambers (Room No. 2204) before Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. All parties should appear by telephone, with Plaintiff's counsel initiating the call, through a conference call operator, and connecting to the Court at 307/433-2180. Parties are advised to have their calendars on hand to assist with scheduling. (Court Staff, szf)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl as Presiding Judge and the Honorable Kelly H Rankin as Referral Judge for all further proceedings; Honorable Mark L Carman no longer assigned to caseby the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl.(Court Staff, sjlg)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by the Honorable Mark L. Carman granting #5 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Thomas H. Mitchiner for Julie L. Rohrbacher. (Court Staff, sea) (Main Document 8 replaced on 1/30/2019) (Court Staff, sea).
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by the Honorable Mark L. Carman granting #4 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Steven L. Murray for Julie L. Rohrbacher. (Court Staff, sea) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/30/2019) (Court Staff, sea). (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/30/2019) (Court Staff, sea).
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2019 10:30 AM in Yellowstone Justice Center (by telephone) before Honorable Mark L Carman. (Court Staff, sea)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for Thomas H. Mitchiner to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Julie L Rohrbacher. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Strike, Katherine)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for Steven L. Murray to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Julie L Rohrbacher. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Strike, Katherine)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Plaintiff Julie L Rohrbacher. Answer due 1/27/2019 (Strike, Katherine) Modified text on 2/6/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Teton Therapy PC. (Nethercott, Tara)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (1 summons(es) issued) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CAS002163.), filed by Julie Rohrbacher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (Court Staff, scat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rohrbacher v. Teton Therapy PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Rohrbacher
Represented By: Katherine A Strike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie L Rohrbacher
Represented By: Katherine A Strike
Represented By: Thomas H. Mitchiner
Represented By: Steven L Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teton Therapy PC
Represented By: Tara Brooke Nethercott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?