Mosher v Herrell
Appellee: Randy L Royal and Janice Herrell
Appellant: United States Trustee for Region 19 and Leonard Owen Mosher
Case Number: 1:2019cv00036
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL DESIGNATION of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court by Appellee Janice Herrell, Janice Herrell re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript) (Hunsicker, Bradley)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court by Appellee Janice Herrell re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Part 2) (Court Staff, stbd) (Main Document 6 replaced to correct page orientation on 4/2/2019) (Court Staff, stbd).
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Thomas Faga on behalf of Janice Herrell, Janice Herrell (Faga, Matthew)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley Tanner Hunsicker on behalf of Janice Herrell, Janice Herrell (Hunsicker, Bradley)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Issues on Appeal by Appellant Leonard Owen Mosher re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Court Staff, stbd)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 DESIGNATION of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court by Appellant Leonard Owen Mosher re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Court Staff, stbd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2019: #1 Attachment) (Court Staff, stbd).
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 17-20929. (Court Staff, stbd) (Main Document 1 replaced to add Notice of Appeal on 2/25/2019) (Court Staff, stbd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosher v Herrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Randy L Royal
Represented By: Randy L Royal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Janice Herrell
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Faga
Represented By: Bradley Tanner Hunsicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: United States Trustee for Region 19
Represented By: Daniel James Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Leonard Owen Mosher
Represented By: Ken McCartney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?