Lennen et al v. Casper WY et al
Plaintiff: Linda Lennen and Linda Lennen (Est)
Defendant: Schlager, Casper Police Department Officer, Meyers, Casper Police Department Officer, Casper WY, Casper Police Department, Jonathan Schlager, Cody Meyers and Wyoming Law Enforcement Academy
Case Number: 1:2019cv00041
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Meyers, Casper Police Department Officer, Schlager, Casper Police Department Officer. (Daraie, Justin)
April 11, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Meyers, Casper Police Department Officer, Schlager, Casper Police Department Officer, Casper WY, filed by Linda Lennen, Linda Lennen (Est). (Court Staff, scat)
April 11, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Case, filed by Plaintiff Linda Lennen (Est). (Hambrick, Todd)
April 10, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by Meyers, Casper Police Department Officer, Schlager, Casper Police Department Officer. (Daraie, Justin)
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Ashkhan Daraie on behalf of Meyers, Casper Police Department Officer, Schlager, Casper Police Department Officer (Daraie, Justin)
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adrian K Kowalski on behalf of Meyers, Casper Police Department Officer, Schlager, Casper Police Department Officer (Kowalski, Adrian)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Casper WY, Casper Police Department. Casper WY 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019; Casper Police Department 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019 (O'Neill, Hampton)
April 5, 2019 Filing 12 First NOTICE by Plaintiff Linda Lennen (Est) (Hambrick, Todd)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of complexity by Defendants Casper Police Department, Casper WY ; this case is non-complex. (O'Neill, Hampton)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of #9 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Wyoming Law Enforcement Academy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished Case Cramer v. Rommell) (Kowalski, Adrian)
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Case, filed by Defendant Wyoming Law Enforcement Academy. (Kowalski, Adrian)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of complexity by Defendant Wyoming Law Enforcement Academy ; this case is non-complex. (Kowalski, Adrian)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adrian K Kowalski on behalf of Wyoming Law Enforcement Academy (Kowalski, Adrian)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Ashkhan Daraie on behalf of Wyoming Law Enforcement Academy (Daraie, Justin)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John A Masterson on behalf of Casper Police Department, Casper WY (Masterson, John)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hampton K O'Neill on behalf of Casper Police Department, Casper WY (O'Neill, Hampton)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Linda Lennen, 3 issued. (Court Staff, skb)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Plaintiffs Linda Lennen. (Court Staff, scat) Modified to correct filed date on 2/26/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no summons(es) issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CAS002200.), filed by Linda Lennen(individually and as the Mother of Douglas Burton Oneyear), Linda Lennen(Personal Representive of the Estate of Douglas Burton Oneyear). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, scat) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2019: #2 Constent to Magistrate Judge) (Court Staff, scat).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lennen et al v. Casper WY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schlager, Casper Police Department Officer
Represented By: Adrian K Kowalski
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meyers, Casper Police Department Officer
Represented By: Adrian K Kowalski
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casper WY
Represented By: John A Masterson
Represented By: Hampton K O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casper Police Department
Represented By: John A Masterson
Represented By: Hampton K O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Schlager
Represented By: Adrian K Kowalski
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Meyers
Represented By: Adrian K Kowalski
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Law Enforcement Academy
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Adrian K Kowalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lennen
Represented By: Todd H Hambrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lennen (Est)
Represented By: Todd H Hambrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?