Hoose v. Pettersen MD et al

Plaintiff: Brian L Hoose
Defendant: Mednax Services Inc, Pediatrix Medical Group Inc, Michael D Pettersen MD and Obstetrix Medical Goup of Colorado PC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00091
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
2 Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Plaintiff Brian L Hoose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) (Lawson, Grant)Text Modified on 6/19/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of #13 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Mednax Services Inc, Pediatrix Medical Group Inc. (Moeller, Lena)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Defendants Pediatrix Medical Group Inc, Mednax Services Inc. ATTACHMENT HAS BEEN REFILED AS A SEPARATE DOCUMENT (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law)(Moeller, Lena) Modified on 6/10/2019 (Court Staff, ssw). Modified on 6/11/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Obstetrix Medical Goup of Colorado PC, Michael D Pettersen MD. (Moeller, Lena)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick J Murphy on behalf of Mednax Services Inc, Obstetrix Medical Goup of Colorado PC, Pediatrix Medical Group Inc, Michael D Pettersen MD (Murphy, Patrick)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Dr. Pettersen, Obstetrix Medical Group of Colorado, and Mednax Services shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before June 7, 2019. (Court Staff, sjh)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleading filed by Defendants Mednax Services Inc, Obstetrix Medical Goup of Colorado PC, Pediatrix Medical Group Inc, Michael D Pettersen MD. (Moeller, Lena) Text Modified on 6/7/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lena Kathleen Moeller on behalf of Mednax Services Inc, Obstetrix Medical Goup of Colorado PC, Pediatrix Medical Group Inc, Michael D Pettersen MD (Moeller, Lena)
May 21, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Mednax Services Inc answer due 6/5/2019; Obstetrix Medical Goup of Colorado PC answer due 6/5/2019; Michael D Pettersen MD answer due 6/5/2019 (Court Staff, ssw)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian L Hoose. Pediatrix Medical Group Inc served on 5/17/2019, answer due on 6/7/2019 (Ingram, Robert)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian L Hoose. Obstetrix Medical Goup of Colorado PC served on 5/15/2019, answer due on 6/5/2019 (Ingram, Robert) Modified on 5/21/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian L Hoose. Michael D Pettersen MD served on 5/15/2019, answer due on 6/5/2019 (Ingram, Robert) Modified on 5/21/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian L Hoose. Mednax Services Inc served on 5/15/2019, answer due on 6/5/2019 (Ingram, Robert) Modified on 5/21/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Alan B Johnson and Honorable Kelly H Rankin for all further proceedings; Honorable Scott W Skavdahl no longer assigned to caseby the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl.(Court Staff, scat)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 DISREGARD ERROR IN FILING COUNSEL WILL REFILE. SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian L Hoose. Brian L Hoose served on 5/14/2019, answer due on 6/4/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service, # 2 Proof of Service, # 3 Proof of Service, # 4 Proof of Service, # 5 Proof of Service) (Metier, T) Modified on 5/21/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (5 summons(es) issued) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CAS002236.), filed by Brian L Hoose. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (Court Staff, scat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoose v. Pettersen MD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mednax Services Inc
Represented By: Lena Kathleen Moeller
Represented By: Patrick J Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pediatrix Medical Group Inc
Represented By: Lena Kathleen Moeller
Represented By: Patrick J Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D Pettersen MD
Represented By: Lena Kathleen Moeller
Represented By: Patrick J Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obstetrix Medical Goup of Colorado PC
Represented By: Lena Kathleen Moeller
Represented By: Patrick J Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian L Hoose
Represented By: Grant H Lawson
Represented By: Robert Todd Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?