Sheriff v. Grote et al

Plaintiff: Elmore Sheriff
Defendant: Sheridan Veterans Medical Center Employee, Sheridan Veteran Medical Center, State of Wyoming, Grote, Sheridan Veteran Medical Center Employee and Mr Grote
Case Number: 1:2019cv00117
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Elmore Sheriff. (Court Staff, stbd)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by Elmore Sheriff. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Court Staff, stbd)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Plaintiff has until 7/29/19 to file an Amended Complaint and an Amended Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff does not file these amended pleadings by 7/29/19, this case will be closed. Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff on this date via U.S. mail.(Court Staff, sal)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Elmore Sheriff. (Court Staff, stbd)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No summons(es) issued) filed by Elmore Sheriff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (Court Staff, stbd) Modified text on 6/11/2019 (Court Staff, sbh). (Additional document(s) added/NEF regenerated on 6/21/2019: #3 Consent) (Court Staff, stbd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheriff v. Grote et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheridan Veterans Medical Center Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheridan Veteran Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Wyoming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheridan Veteran Medical Center Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Grote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmore Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?