Wingfield v. Smiths Food & Drug Centers Inc
Plaintiff: Sandra K Wingfield
Defendant: Smiths Food & Drug Centers Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00135
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand by Smiths Food & Drug Centers Inc. (Curry, Grant)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sandra K Wingfield. Smiths Food & Drug Centers Inc 7/5/2019, answer due 9/3/2019 (Hugus, Jeremy)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (1 summons(es) issued) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CAS002260.), filed by Sandra K Wingfield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (Court Staff, scat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wingfield v. Smiths Food & Drug Centers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra K Wingfield
Represented By: Jeremy J Hugus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smiths Food & Drug Centers Inc
Represented By: Grant R Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?