Danzik et al v. CWT Canada II Limited Partnership et al

Appellant: Dennis Meyer Danzik
Appellee: Resource Recovery Corporation and CWT Canada II Limited Partnership
Case Number: 1:2019cv00136
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Court Staff, stbd)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 A transcript of the proceeding held on 05/15/19 was filed on 8/15/2019.To review the transcript for redaction purposes, you may purchase a copyfrom the transcriber AB Court Reporting & Video, Telephone number(303) 2960017. (Court Staff, stbd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL DESIGNATION of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court by Appellees' CWT Canada II Limited Partnership, Resource Recovery Corporation re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record) (Court Staff, stbd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley Tanner Hunsicker on behalf of CWT Canada II Limited Partnership, Resource Recovery Corporation (Hunsicker, Bradley)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Issues on Appeal by Appellant Dennis Meyer Danzik re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Court Staff, stbd)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 DESIGNATION of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court by Appellant Dennis Meyer Danzik re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Court Staff, stbd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2019: #1 Addendum to Appellant Designation of Contents) (Court Staff, stbd).
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-20116. (Court Staff, stbd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danzik et al v. CWT Canada II Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Dennis Meyer Danzik
Represented By: Ken McCartney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Resource Recovery Corporation
Represented By: Bradley Tanner Hunsicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CWT Canada II Limited Partnership
Represented By: Bradley Tanner Hunsicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?