Weidenbach v Casper Natrona County Health Department
Plaintiff: Dr Kelly Weidenbach
Defendant: Casper Natrona County Health Department and Casper-Natrona County Health Department
Case Number: 1:2020cv00008
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDERby the Honorable Kelly H Rankin. Motions filing deadline 1/11/2021. Motion response deadline 1/25/2021. Dispositive Motions Hearing set for 2/10/2021 01:00 PM in Casper Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 204) before Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Other Fact Witness Deadline 12/1/2020 Expert Witness Designation-Plaintiff deadline 9/28/2020. Expert Witness Designation-Defendant deadline 10/28/2020. Discovery due by 1/11/2021. Stipulation Deadline 2/16/2021. Motion in Limine deadline 2/16/2021. Motions in Limine Response Deadline 2/23/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2021 01:00 PM in Judge Skavdahl Chambers (Room No. 210) before Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Jury Trial set for 3/22/2021 09:00 AM in Casper Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 204) before Honorable Scott W Skavdahl (#1/5 days).(Court Staff, sjlg)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #7 Motion for Protective Order. The parties shall abide by the terms and conditions of this Order. (Court Staff, sem)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Casper-Natrona County Health Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Thomas)
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2020 09:00 AM in Judge Rankin Chambers (Room No. 2204) before Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. (Court Staff, szf)
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Casper-Natrona County Health Department. (Thompson, Thomas)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of complexity by Defendant Casper-Natrona County Health Department ; this case is non-complex. (Thompson, Thomas)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas A Thompson on behalf of Casper-Natrona County Health Department (Thompson, Thomas)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Weidenbach. Casper Natrona County Health Department served on 1/28/2020, answer due on 2/18/2020. (Court Staff, skb)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (2 summons(es) issued) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CAS002345.) filed by Kelly Weidenbach. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (Court Staff, scat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weidenbach v Casper Natrona County Health Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr Kelly Weidenbach
Represented By: Scott J Olheiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casper Natrona County Health Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casper-Natrona County Health Department
Represented By: Thomas A Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?