Blackburn v. Schlumberger Technology Corporation
Plaintiff: Jason Blackburn
Defendant: Schlumberger Technology Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00095
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Blackburn Deposition, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of McConnell, #4 Exhibit C - Nelson Deposition, #5 Exhibit D - McConnell Deposition, #6 Exhibit E - Limb Deposition, #7 Exhibit F - Tillery Deposition, #8 Exhibit G - Herwaldt Deposition, #9 Exhibit H - Moore Deposition, #10 Exhibit I - Briscoe Deposition)(Roberts, MaryJo)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting #31 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Amend Schedule. Motions filing deadline 11/24/2021. Motion response deadline 12/8/2021. Replies due by 12/15/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2022 01:30 PM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Jury Trial set for 2/14/2022 08:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 1 (Room No. 2132) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal.(Court Staff, sal)
November 12, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Landin on behalf of Schlumberger Technology Corporation (Landin, Alexander)
November 10, 2021 Filing 31 EX-PARTE DOCUMENT - MOTION for Extension of Time (Dispositive) requesting extension of Deadline for Dispositve Motions filed by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation, Plaintiff Jason Blackburn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roberts, MaryJo) Restriction modified on 11/16/2021 (Court Staff, sal).
September 30, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR ALEXANDER C LANDIN. RECEIPT CHY035340. (Court Staff, sjk)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #29 First MOTION for Alexander C. Landin to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation (cc: Order e-mailed to pro hac vice counsel on this date)(Court Staff, stmo) Modified text on 9/27/2021 (Court Staff, stmo).
September 24, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. First MOTION for Alexander C. Landin to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Landin in Support of PHV Motion, #2 Proposed Order Granting PHV Landin)(Nachbar, Keith)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting #27 Joint Motion to Extend Schedule. Motions filing deadline 11/12/2021. Motion response deadline 11/29/2021. Plaintiff Reply Brief due 12/6/2021. Discovery due by 11/5/2021. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 1/12/2022 01:30 PM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Jury Trial (3 DAYS/#2) RESET for 2/14/2022 08:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 1 (Room No. 2132) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal.(Court Staff, sal)
August 31, 2021 Motions No Longer Referred: #27 MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Litigation Deadlines and Trial (Court Staff, sal)
August 30, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Litigation Deadlines and Trial filed by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Deadlines)(Nachbar, Keith) Unreferred on 8/31/2021 (Court Staff, sal).
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting in part #22 Motion for Extension of Time. Motions filing deadline 9/13/2021. Motion response deadline 9/27/2021. Motion Reply deadline due 10/4/2021. Discovery due by 9/7/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2021 01:30 PM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Jury Trial (3 days/#2) set for 12/6/2021 08:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 1 (Room No. 2132) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal.(Court Staff, sal)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #23 Motion for Protective Order. (Court Staff, smh)
July 12, 2021 Filing 24 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal: Status Conference held on 7/12/2021. (Court Reporter Jan Davis.) (Court Staff, sal)
July 9, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. First MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nachbar, Keith)
July 9, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H. Rankin. First MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Litigation Deadlines filed by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Deadlines)(Nachbar, Keith) (Main Document 22 replaced on 7/9/2021) (Court Staff, sbh). Modified on 7/9/2021 (Court Staff, szf).
July 9, 2021 Motions No Longer Referred: #22 First MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Litigation Deadlines (Court Staff, szf)
June 29, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE Resetting Hearing: BY TELEPHONE - All parties may appear by telephone through the Courts conference call system. Guests call:Toll Free 877-336-1829, Access code 3509533#, Join as guest Press #, Security code 2967#. Status Conference reset from 7/13/2021 01:30 PM to 7/12/2021 09:00 AM before Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal. (Court Staff, szf)
June 8, 2021 Filing 20 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin denying without prejudice #19 Motion for Protective Order. Under Local Rule 5.1(g), any provision of a protective order that allows for filing documents either under seal or as non-public first requires the Courts approval. Defendant may file a new motion with the required language.(Court Staff, smh)
June 7, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. First MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulated) filed by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Nachbar, Keith)
December 18, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Andrew W Stavros on behalf of Jason Blackburn (Stavros, Andrew)
December 11, 2020 Filing 17 FILED INCORRECTLY - DISREGARD Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Jeremy J Hugus on behalf of Jason Blackburn (Hugus, Jeremy) Modified on 12/11/2020 (Court Staff, sal).
November 20, 2020 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Andrew W Stavros. Receipt CHY033925. (Court Staff, sjk)
November 12, 2020 Filing 16 INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDERby the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Motions filing deadline 8/13/2021. Motion response deadline 8/27/2021. Dispositive Motions Hearing set for 9/16/2021 09:00 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 1 (Room No. 2132) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Expert Witness Designation-Plaintiff deadline 6/4/2021. Expert Witness Designation-Defendant deadline 7/6/2021. Discovery due by 8/6/2021. Stipulation Deadline 12/11/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2021 01:30 PM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Jury Trial (5 days/stacked #1) set for 11/15/2021 08:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 1 (Room No. 2132) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Status Conference set for 7/13/2021 01:30 PM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal.(Court Staff, sal)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #14 Motion to appear pro hac vice. Copy of Order emailed to Andrew Stavros on this date. (Court Staff, sal) (Main Document 15 replaced on 11/12/2020) (Court Staff, sal).
November 12, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Andrew Stavros to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Plaintiff Jason Blackburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Andrew Stavros, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - List of Admissions, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - Cert. of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order)(Hugus, Jeremy)
November 6, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Jason Blackburn. (Hugus, Jeremy)
October 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 11/12/2020 11:00 AM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal)
October 5, 2020 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Jessica M Thomas. Receipt CHY033717. (Court Staff, sjk)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2020 11:00 AM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #9 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Jessica M Thomas for Schlumberger Technology Corporation (Court Staff, sal)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Jessica M. Thomas to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Nachbar, Keith)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Nachbar, Keith)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith R Nachbar on behalf of Schlumberger Technology Corporation (Nachbar, Keith)
August 26, 2020 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for MaryJo L Roberts. Receipt CHY033508 (Court Staff, stmo)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #5 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting MaryJo L Roberts for Schlumberger Technology Corporation (Court Staff, sal)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for MaryJo L Roberts to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Nachbar, Keith)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jason Blackburn. Schlumberger Technology Corporation 8/5/2020, answer due 10/5/2020 (Hugus, Jeremy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT by Jason Blackburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver) (Hugus, Jeremy)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Status Report due by 8/17/2020.(Court Staff, sal)
June 8, 2020 Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment - filed by Plaintiff Jason Blackburn. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1089-1753082. (Hugus, Jeremy)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No summons(es) issued) with Jury Demand. Counsel - payment is due within 3 days. To pay the filing fee with a credit card, please use the event Notice of Civil Filing Fee in CM/ECF or send a check to the Clerk of US District Court, 2131 Capitol Avenue Room 2131, Cheyenne, WY 82001, filed by Jason Blackburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, stbd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackburn v. Schlumberger Technology Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Blackburn
Represented By: Andrew W Stavros
Represented By: Jeremy J Hugus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schlumberger Technology Corporation
Represented By: Jessica M Thomas
Represented By: MaryJo L Roberts
Represented By: Keith R Nachbar
Represented By: Alexander Landin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?