Profile Properties LLC v. West American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Profile Properties LLC
Defendant: West American Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00134
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT of Meeting and Proposed Joint Discovery and Case Management Plan and Setting Initial Pretrial Conference by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2020 at 9:30 AM by TELEPHONE from Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. Guests call: Toll Free 866-434-5269 | Access code 1316504# | Join as guest Press # | Security code 1001#(Court Staff, ssw)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANALOGOUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN CIVIL CASES by the Honorable Alan B Johnson.(Court Staff, ssw)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by West American Insurance Company. (Coppede, John)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by West American Insurance Company. (Coppede, John)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Finding good cause, and under Local Rule 6.1(b), Defendant's unopposed motion is granted. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 24, 2020.(Court Staff, sem)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Time to Serve Answer filed by Defendant West American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coppede, John)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John A Coppede on behalf of West American Insurance Company (Coppede, John)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE in Compliance With W.S. 26-3-122 by Plaintiff Profile Properties LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Compliance, #2 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 3 to Affidavit, #5 Exhibit 4 to Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 5 to Affidavit) (Brady, Patrick) Modified text on 7/27/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
July 20, 2020 Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment. Filing Fee was paid with Receipt Number: CHY033333. (Court Staff, sbh)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Profile Properties LLC, 1 issued. (Court Staff, stbd)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Plaintiff Profile Properties LLC. (Court Staff, stbd)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Profile Properties LLC (1 summons(es) issued) Counsel - payment is due within 3 days. To pay the filing fee with a credit card, please use the event Notice of Civil Filing Fee in CM/ECF or send a check to the Clerk of US District Court, 2131 Capitol Avenue Room 2131, Cheyenne, WY 82001 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent) (Court Staff, stbd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #3 Exhibit A) (Court Staff, stbd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Profile Properties LLC v. West American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Profile Properties LLC
Represented By: Patrick Michael Brady
Represented By: Raymond W Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West American Insurance Company
Represented By: John A Coppede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?