Intellitronix Corporation v. Fraker
Plaintiff: Intellitronix Corporation
Defendant: Cameron Daley Fraker
Intervenor: Xcentric Ventures, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00158
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Wright on behalf of Intellitronix Corporation, Paul Spivak, U.S. Lighting Group, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00157-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00158-ABJ (Wright, Ryan)
October 8, 2020 Filing 52 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B. Johnson: Status Conference held on 10/8/2020. (Court Reporter: Monique Gentry) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00157-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00158-ABJ (Court Staff, sbh)
October 6, 2020 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $200 received for pro hac vice fees for Aaron M Minc and Andrew C Stebbins. Receipt CHY033722. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00157-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00158-ABJ (Court Staff, sjk)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting (94), (95) in case 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ Motions to appear pro hac vice admitting Aaron M. Minc and Andrew C. Stebbins for Paul Spivak, U.S. Lighting Group Inc, Intellitronix Corp. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00157-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00158-ABJ (Court Staff, sbh)
October 5, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Andrew Stebbins to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs Intellitronix Corporation, Paul Spivak, Consolidated Counter Defendant Paul Spivak, Intervenor Plaintiff U.S. Lighting Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Certificate Good Standing)Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00157-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00158-ABJ (Wright, Ryan) Removed restriction and modified text on 10/6/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
October 5, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Aaron Minc to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs Intellitronix Corporation, Paul Spivak, Consolidated Counter Defendant Paul Spivak, Intervenor Plaintiff U.S. Lighting Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Certificate Good Standing)Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00157-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00158-ABJ (Wright, Ryan) Removed restriction and modified text on 10/6/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
October 1, 2020 Filing 48 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 10:30 AM BY TELEPHONE before Honorable Alan B Johnson. All parties shall appear by telephone through the Courts conference call system. Guests call:Toll Free 866-434-5269 | Access code 1316504# | Join as guest Press # | Security code 1001# Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00157-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00158-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw)
August 19, 2020 Filing 47 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00966.
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order that the motion of Fraker to dismiss USLG's amended complaint (ECF #74 in 1:18cv615, 90 in 1:19cv87 and 29 in 1:19cv966) is hereby granted except that the relief accorded Fraker shall be the transfer of USLG's amended complaint to the United States District Court for the District of Wyoming; Further Ordered that all remaining aspects of these three consolidated cases shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Wyoming; and Further Ordered that the Clerk of Court shall forthwith transfer Case Nos. 1:18CV615, 1:19CV87, and 1:19CV966 to the United States District Court for the District of Wyoming. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 8/19/20. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB (D,Ky) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] The oral argument scheduled in this case on July 7, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. is hereby postponed. Further orders regarding proceedings in these cases to issue. Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 7/3/20. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(D,Ky) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] rescheduling zoom oral argument for 7/7/2020 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman Jr. Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr on 6/24/20. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(D,Ky) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order setting oral argument on motion for 6/29/20 at 11:00am on zoom. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 6/19/20. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(D,Ky) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] The Court will conduct a oral argument on all dispositive motion on all claims on 6/29/20 at 11:00am. This hearing will take place using the Zoom technology. A separate order setting out the procedures for the hearing will follow. Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 6/11/20.Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(D,Ky) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 44 Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Cameron D. Fraker. Related document(s)(74 in 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 29 in 1:19-cv-00966-WHB, 90 in 1:19-cv-00087-WHB). (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Wedell, Kristin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 43 Brief In Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by U.S. Lighting Group, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Minc, Aaron) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 42 Reply To Brief in Opposition to Partial Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claims for Defamation and Deceptive Trade Practices filed by Intellitronix Corporation, Paul Spivak. Related document(s)(82 in 1:18-cv-00615-WHB). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - ROR, # 2 Exhibit 2 - subpoena response and sign up steps, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Paul Spivak Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Paul Spivak Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Paul Spivak Part 3, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Email dated 7.7.16 from Fraker, # 7 Exhibit 5 - Text message dated 10.1.16, # 8 Exhibit 6 - Transcript of 10.2.19 Status Conf., # 9 Exhibit 7 - Email dated 5.11.16, # 10 Exhibit 8 - USLG warranty, # 11 Exhibit 9 - Answer to second set of discovery) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Minc, Aaron) Modified on 3/19/2020 (S,SR). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 41 Reply to Defendant's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendant's Counterclaims filed by Paul Spivak. Related document(s)( 33 in 1:19-cv-00966-WHB). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to reply to counter claims - Email dated 7/13/2016, # 2 Exhibit 2 Reply to counterclaims BIO - OTC markets chart) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Minc, Aaron) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 40 Reply to Defendant's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike filed by Intellitronix Corporation, Paul Spivak. Related document(s)(39 in 1:19-cv-00966-WHB). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Def. answers to first set of Discovery, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Def. Answers to Pl. Intell. First set of discovery, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Def. Initial Disclosures, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts from Frakers deposition, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Def. Answers to Pls combined second set of discovery) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Minc, Aaron) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 39 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Paul Spivak and Intellitronix Corporation Motion to Strike References to Hearsay Evidence and Declaration of Jason Atkinson filed by Cameron D. Fraker. Related document(s)(75 in 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 30 in 1:19-cv-00966-WHB, 91 in 1:19-cv-00087-WHB). (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - November 22, 2019 Correspondence from Kristy Wedell to Aaron Minc, # 3 Exhibit B - November 15, 2018 Transcript of Record) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Wedell, Kristin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 38 Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Paul Spivak's Complaint filed by Cameron D. Fraker. Related document(s)(67 in 1:19-cv-00087-WHB). (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Wedell, Kristin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 37 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff Intellitronix Corporation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability for Its Claims of Defamation and Deceptive Trade Practices filed by Cameron Daley Fraker. Related document: No 27 in 1:19-cv-00966-WHB. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00966-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00087-WHB(Wedell, Kristin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 36 Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendant's Counterclaims filed by Cameron D. Fraker. Related document(s)(72 in 1:19-cv-00087-WHB). (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Wedell, Kristin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 35 SEALED Document: Notice of Filing Confidential Deposition Testimony of Paul Spivak filed by Cameron D. Fraker. Related document(s) (33 in 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 44 in 1:19-cv-00087-WHB), (33 in 1:19-cv-00966-WHB, 94 in 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 78 in 1:18-cv-00615-WHB). (Wedell, Kristin) Modified on 2/24/2020, filer notified of error with certificate of service page (H,SP). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 34 Deposition of Malcolm Schneider taken on 09/18/2019 filed by Cameron D. Fraker. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Wedell, Kristin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 33 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff Paul Spivak's Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendant Cameron Daley Fraker's Counterclaims, filed by Cameron D. Fraker. Related document(s)(82 in 1:19-cv-00087-WHB). (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Appendix 1 - Excerpts From Malcolm Schneider Deposition) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Wedell, Kristin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 32 Brief in Opposition to Defendant Frakers Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Spivak's Complaint, filed by Intellitronix Corporation, Paul Spivak. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix App. 1 Deposition excerpts, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Rip Off Report, # 3 Exhibit 2A - Chart of Bulbs, # 4 Exhibit 2B - Chart of Bulbs, # 5 Exhibit 2C - Chart of Bulbs, # 6 Exhibit 3 - Email 9.26.17, # 7 Exhibit 4 - Text Message From 10.31.17, # 8 Exhibit 5 - Email 7.7.16, # 9 Exhibit 6 - Text Message 10.1.16, # 10 Exhibit 7 - Email 12.5.17, # 11 Exhibit 8 - Def's Res. to First Set of Discovery) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Minc, Aaron) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 31 Brief in Opposition to Defendant Fraker's Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendant's Counterclaims filed by Paul Spivak. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Deposition Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Def Responses to Second Set of Discovery, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Email 4.13.16, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Email 4.22.16 and Testimony, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Text Message 10.1.16, # 6 Exhibit 5 - USLG Letter, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Chart of Bulb Deliveries, # 8 Exhibit 7A - Affidavit of P. Spivak Part 1, # 9 Exhibit 7B - Affidavit of P. Spivak Part 2, # 10 Exhibit 7C - Affidavit of P. Spivak Part 3, # 11 Exhibit 8 - Affidavit of J. Duncan, # 12 Exhibit 9 - Affidavit of C. Scott, # 13 Exhibit 10 - Affidavit of S. McHune, # 14 Exhibit 11 - Email 7.13.16, # 15 Exhibit 12 - Wire Transfers) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Minc, Aaron) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 30 Motion to strike References to Hearsay Evidence and Declaration of Jason Atkinson filed by Intellitronix Corporation, Paul Spivak. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix - Frakers Deposition excerpts, # 2 Appendix - Spivaks Deposition excerpt, # 3 Exhibit - Order Granting Judgment, # 4 Exhibit - Rip Off Report, # 5 Exhibit - Defendant's Response to Interrogatories and Productions, # 6 Exhibit - Defendant's Response to Second set of Interrogatories and Production, # 7 Exhibit - Hearing transcript from 10/2/2019, # 8 Exhibit - Email dated 8/22/2019, # 9 Exhibit - Email dated 9/27/2019)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Minc, Aaron) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 29 Motion to dismiss Pursuant to Civil Rules 12(B)(2), 12(B)(3), and 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant Cameron D. Fraker. Related document(s)( 86 in 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 69 in 1:18-cv-00615-WHB). (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Cameron Daley Fraker) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB (Wedell, Kristin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order that Xcentric's motion to intervene (ECF # 12 , Case No. 1:19CV 966) is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that USLG's motion to intervene (ECF #22, Case No. 1:18CV615; ECF #34, Case No. 1:19CV87) is granted; and FURTHER ORDERED that USLG's complaint attached to its motion to intervene (ECF #22-2, Case No. 1:18CV615; ECF #34-2, Case No. 1:19CV87) is deemed filed as of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 1/24/20. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(D,Ky) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 27 Motion for partial summary judgment On Liability for its Claims of Defamation and Deceptive Trade Practices Against Defendant Cameron Daley Fraker filed by Plaintiff Intellitronix Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Intellitronix Corp.'s & Plaintiff Paul Spivak's Motion for Summary Judgment For Their Claims of Defamation and Deceptive Trade Practices Against Defendant Cameron Daley Fraker, # 2 Appendix Deposition excerpts, # 3 Appendix Transcript of hearing on Oct. 2, 2019, # 4 Exhibit Ripoff Report and Affidavit of Todd Price, # 5 Exhibit Chart of all Payments, Agreements, Bulb Shipments, and In-Person Meetings, # 6 Exhibit Declaration of Paul Spivak and Exhibits, # 7 Exhibit Ripoff Report subpoena responses, # 8 Exhibit Answers to Plaintiff' Intellitronix's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission Propounded upon Defendant Daley Fraker, # 9 Exhibit Answers to Plaintiff Spivak's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admissions, # 10 Exhibit Defendant Daley Fraker's Answers to Plaintiffs' Combined Second Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admissions, and Requests for Production, # 11 Exhibit Affidavit of James Duncan, # 12 Exhibit Affidavit of Charles Scott, # 13 Exhibit Declaration of Shannon McHone, # 14 Exhibit Affidavit of Jason Atkinson)(Minc, Aaron) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order. Plaintiffs Spivak and Intellitronixs motion to deem improper responses as admissions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 36 (ECF # 55 and # 56 , Case No. 1:18CV615; ECF # 65 and # 66 , Case No. 1:19CV87; ECF # 14 and # 15 , Case No. 1:19CV966) is denied; Plaintiffs Spivak and Intellitronix's motion for leave to exceed page limitations (ECF # 60 , Case No. 1:18CV615; ECF # 71 , Case No. 1:19CV87; ECF # 20 , Case No. 1:19CV966) is denied; Defendant's motion for an emergency hearing (ECF # 63 , Case No. 1:18CV615; ECF # 77 , Case No. 1:19CV87; ECF # 23 , Case No. 1:19CV966) is denied; the Clerk of Court must remove from the record in these consolidated cases motions for summary judgment Plaintiffs Spivak and Intellitronix previously filed that exceed the page limit (ECF # 61 , Case No. 1:18CV615; ECF # 73 , # 74 , and # 75 , Case No. 1:19CV87; ECF # 21 , Case No. 1:19CV966); Plaintiffs Spivak and Intellitronix must file and serve by Friday, January 24, 2020, any motions for summary judgment in compliance with the page limit set forth in the Local Rules, Defendant must file and serve by Monday, February 24, 2020, any opposition to those motions, and Plaintiffs Spivak and Intellitronix must file by Monday, March 9, 2020, any reply briefs in support of their motions for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. on 1/17/2020. (Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB) (S,S) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 25 Opposition to Joint Motion of Plaintiffs Paul Spivak and Intellitronix Corporation for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations, filed by Cameron D. Fraker. Related document(s) 60 in 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 20 in 1:19-cv-00966-WHB, 71 in 1:19-cv-00087-WHB). Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Wedell, Kristin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 24 Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Emergency Hearing to Include Additional Evidence filed by Cameron D. Fraker. Related document(s)(63 in 1:18-cv-00615-WHB). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Text messages from Aaron Minc to Jason Atkinson) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Wedell, Kristin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 23 Motion for emergency hearing filed by Defendant Cameron D. Fraker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Transcription of voicemail from Aaron Minc to Jason Atkinson, # 2 Exhibit B - Text message from Aaron Minc to Jason Atkinson)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Wedell, Kristin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 22 Transcript of Status Conference held on October 2, 2019 before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. To obtain a copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Sue Trischan at 216-357-7087. [34 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 1/21/2020. Redaction Request due 2/4/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/14/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB (T,S) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 21 STRICKEN per 26 . Combined Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s)(71 in 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 60 in 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 20 in 1:19-cv-00966-WHB). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - RipOff Report, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Chart of All Payments, # 3 Exhibit3 - Signed Declaration of P. Spivak, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Depo Transcript of Defendant, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Def Answers to Second Set of Discovery, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Confidentiality Agreement, # 7 Exhibit 7 - USLG Exclusive Agreement 10142015, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Selected Testimony of P. Spivak, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Outgoing FED Message Ref 0124, # 10 Exhibit 10 - PayPal Receipt, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Outgoing FED Message Ref 0211, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Outgoing FED Message Ref 0236, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Invoice 01062016, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Invoice 02022016, # 15 Exhibit 15 - Email 01272016, # 16 Exhibit 16 - Text Message 02032016, # 17 Exhibit 17 - Email 04132016, # 18 Exhibit 18 - Email 04222016, # 19 Exhibit 19 - Email 04282016, # 20 Exhibit 20 - Email 03102017, # 21 Exhibit 21 - USLG Agreement 03142016, # 22 Exhibit 22 - Email 03172016, # 23 Exhibit 23- Outgoing FED Message Ref 0229, # 24 Exhibit 24 - Outgoing FED Message Ref 0139, # 25 Exhibit 25 - Email 05092016, # 26 Exhibit 26 - Email 04292016, # 27 Exhibit 27 - Email 05112016, # 28 Exhibit 28 - Email 05112016 (2), # 29 Exhibit 29 - USLG Letter 05112016, # 30 Exhibit 30 - USLG Letter 05112016 (2), # 31 Exhibit 31 - Email 05182016, # 32 Exhibit 32 - Email 05202016, # 33 Exhibit 33 - Email 05242016, # 34 Exhibit 34 - Email 06012016, # 35 Exhibit 35 - Email 06022016, # 36 Exhibit 36 - Affidavit of S. Slenski, # 37 Exhibit 37 - Email 07072016, # 38 Exhibit 38 - Shipping Label 08032016, # 39 Exhibit 39 - Road Runner Receipt 09082016, # 40 Exhibit 40 - Shiiping Order 09152016, # 41 Exhibit 41 - Email 12272016, # 42 Exhibit 42 - Email 12212016, # 43 Exhibit 43 - Invoice Ref 1440, # 44 Exhibit 44 - Invoice Ref 1439, # 45 Exhibit 45 - Road Runner Receipt 02102017, # 46 Exhibit 46 - Invoice Ref 1456, # 47 Exhibit 47 - Invoice Ref 1455, # 48 Exhibit 48 - Email 03092017, # 49 Exhibit 49A - Email 05082017, # 50 Exhibit 49B - Email 05122017, # 51 Exhibit 49C - Email 05162017, # 52 Exhibit 50A - Invoice Ref 1497, # 53 Exhibit 50B - Invoice Ref 1501, # 54 Exhibit 50C - Invoice Ref 1502, # 55 Exhibit 50D - Invoice Ref 1503, # 56 Exhibit 51 - Shipping Label 06152017, # 57 Exhibit 52 - Shipping Label 08162017, # 58 Exhibit 53 ABC - Emails 09122017, # 59 Exhibit 53 BC - Emails 09262017, # 60 Exhibit 54 - Email 12052017, # 61 Exhibit 55 - Text Message 10312017, # 62 Exhibit 56 -Def Answer to First Set of Discovery, # 63 Exhibit 57 - Declaration of Xcentric, # 64 Exhibit 58 - Email re ROR 01192018, # 65 Exhibit 59 - Email 01152019, # 66 Exhibit 60A - Letter to Judge 08222019, # 67 Exhibit 60B - Letter to Judge 09182019, # 68 Exhibit 60C - Letter to Judge 09272019, # 69 Exhibit 61 - Affidavit of J. Duncan, # 70 Exhibit 62 - Affidavit of C. Scott, # 71 Exhibit 63 - Affidavit of S. McHone)(Minc, Aaron) Modified stricken on 1/21/2020 (D,Ky). Modified on 1/31/2020 (S,SR). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 20 Joint Motion for leave to exceed page limitations, filed by Intellitronix Corporation, Paul Spivak. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Minc, Aaron) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 19 Deposition of Olga Smirnova taken on 09/18/19 filed by Cameron D. Fraker. Related document(s)(16 in 1:19-cv-00966-WHB). Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Wedell, Kristin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 18 Deposition of Cameron Daley Fraker taken on 03/26/19 filed by Cameron D. Fraker. Related document(s)(16 in 1:19-cv-00966-WHB). Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Wedell, Kristin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 17 Deposition of Paul Spivak taken on 03/25/19 filed by Cameron D. Fraker. Related document(s)(16 in 1:19-cv-00966-WHB). Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Wedell, Kristin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 16 Motion for summary judgment with memorandum in support filed by Defendant Cameron Daley Fraker. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Appendix 1 - Excerpts from deposition transcripts of Paul Spivak, Cameron Daley Fraker, and Olga Smirnova, # 3 Exhibit A - Ripoff Report, # 4 Exhibit B - Declaration of Cameron Daley Fraker, # 5 Exhibit C - Declaration of Jason Atkinson, # 6 Exhibit D - Intellitronix Website, # 7 Exhibit E - Ripoff Website Disclaimer) (Wedell, Kristin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 15 Motion to Deem Improper Responses as Admissions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 36 filed by Plaintiff Paul Spivak. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 - RipOff Report, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Defendant's Answers to Plaintiff's Second Set of DIscovery, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Deposition Transcript of Defendant, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Letter to Defendant, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Follow Up Letter to Defendant). Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB (Minc, Aaron) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 14 Motion to Deem Improper Responses as Admissions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 36 filed by Plaintiff Paul Spivak. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Minc, Aaron) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 Reply to Third Party Defendant Xcentric Ventures, LLC's Motion to Intervene filed by Cameron Daley Fraker. (Related document(s) 12 in 1:19-cv-00966-WHB). (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support). Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00966-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00087-WHB (Wedell, Kristin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to intervene as a party filed by Intervenor Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Motion for an Award of Costs and Fees, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Judgment Entry, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Brief in Opposition, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Reply Brief)(Secrest, Jonathan) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 Supplemental Initial Disclosures filed by Cameron D. Fraker. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(Wedell, Kristin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Under Local Civil Rule 3.1(b)(5), I hereby concur with the reassignment of the above-captioned case to my docket. Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 10/3/19. (D,Ky) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr assigned to case, pursuant to consent. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr terminated. Related document(s) 10 . (B,R) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 24, 2019 Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. Related document(s) 10 . (B,R) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order of Reassignment and consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of William H. Baughman, Jr. for further proceedings upon the acceptance of Magistrate Baughman and with the approval of Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Judge Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 6/24/2019. Related Document 9 . (R,Sh) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting Defendant Cameron Daley Fraker's Motion to consolidate cases (Related Doc # 4 ) pending the concurrence of Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. and the approval of Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan, and denying Plaintiff Intellitronix Corporation's 5 Motion to Remand to State Court (Related Doc # 5 ). Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 6/20/2019.(R,Sh) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Minute Order of Telephone Conference held on 6/5/2019. With respect to Defendant's Motion to Consolidate this case with the two related cases before Magistrate Judge Baughman, counsel for Plaintiff stated that Plaintiff would consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction and would not oppose consolidation with the other cases before Magistrate Judge Baughman should the court deny Plaintiffs Motion to Remand. However, Plaintiff does not consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction at this time. The court will proceed to decide the Motion. Time: 1 hour. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 6/11/2019. (R,Sh) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 4, 2019 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document]. The court will hold a brief Telephone Conference with counsel for the parties on 6/5/2019 at 03:30 PM before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. to discuss the pending motions. Call in information will be provided by separate e-mail. (R,Sh) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 Reply To Defendant's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Minc, Aaron) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Cameron Daley Fraker. Related document(s) 5 . (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - April 12, 2019 Correspondence of Aaron Minc, # 3 Exhibit B - April 22, 2019 Correspondence of Aaron Minc, # 4 Exhibit C - January 4, 2019 Email of Aaron Minc, # 5 Exhibit D - Docket in Intellitronix Corp. v. Fraker, Lake County Common Pleas Court Case No. 18CV000718, # 6 Exhibit E - Plaintiff-Intervenor U.S. Lighting Group's Motion to Intervene) (Wedell, Kristin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Intellitronix Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Attorney Aaron M. Minc, # 2 Exhibit 1-A - Complaint for Defamation & Violation of ORC 4165.02(A)(10) Deceptive Trade Practices Act, # 3 Exhibit 1- B - Amended Complaint for Defamation & Violation of ORC 4165.02(A)(10) Deceptive Trade Practices Act, # 4 Exhibit 1 -C - Second Amended Complaint for Defamation & Violation of ORC 4165.02(A)(10) Deceptive Trade Practices Act, # 5 Exhibit 1-D - Third Amended Complaint for Defamation & Violation of ORC 4165.02(A)(10) Deceptive Trade Practices Act, # 6 Exhibit 1- E - Emails between counsels regarding the third amended complaint, # 7 Exhibit 1-F - US District Docket report for case # 1:19-cv-0087-WHB)(Minc, Aaron) Modified exhibit descriptions on 5/22/2019 (W,CM). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to consolidate cases filed by Defendant Cameron Daley Fraker. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support)(Wedell, Kristin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Answer to Third Amended Complaint filed by Cameron Daley Fraker. Related document(s) 1 . (Wedell, Kristin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,R) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
April 30, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
April 30, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (B,R) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Lake County Common Pleas Court, case number 18CV000718 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9284360. Filer has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:18-cv-000615-DAP and 1:19-cv-00087-DAP. Filed by Cameron Daley Fraker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wedell, Kristin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intellitronix Corporation v. Fraker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Daley Fraker
Represented By: Paul J. Schumacher, Jr.
Represented By: Kristin L. Wedell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellitronix Corporation
Represented By: Andrew C. Stebbins
Represented By: Aaron M. Minc
Represented By: Aaron M Minc
Represented By: Andrew C Stebbins
Represented By: Ryan Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Xcentric Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan R. Secrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?