Western Energy Alliance et al v. United States Department of Interior Secretary et al
Petitioner: Western Energy Alliance and Petroleum Association of Wyoming
Respondent: United States Department of the Interior Secretary, Deb Haaland and United States Bureau of Land Management
Intervenor: Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians and Wilderness Workshop
Case Number: 1:2022cv00252
Filed: December 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 30 U.S.C. ยง 181 Environment: Review of Agency Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting #33 Motion to Consolidate Cases for Trial. See Order for details. No further pleadings should be filed in 22-CV-252-S and 23-CV-01-S. (Court Staff, skb) Modified text on 3/10/2023 (Court Staff, skb).
March 6, 2023 Filing 33 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Trial filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sawyer, Michael)
February 14, 2023 Filing 32 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Rose Rushing on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Montana Environmental Information Center, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Western Organization of Resource Councils, WildEarth Guardians (Rushing, Rose)
February 14, 2023 Filing 31 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Melissa A Hornbein on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Montana Environmental Information Center, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Western Organization of Resource Councils, WildEarth Guardians (Hornbein, Melissa)
February 14, 2023 Filing 30 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Kyle James Tisdel on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Montana Environmental Information Center, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Western Organization of Resource Councils, WildEarth Guardians (Tisdel, Kyle)
February 10, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior Secretary of Affirmative Defenses (Sawyer, Michael)
February 10, 2023 Filing 28 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Michael Sawyer on behalf of United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior Secretary (Sawyer, Michael)
February 10, 2023 Filing 27 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Thomas R. Delehanty on behalf of Friends of the Earth, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Workshop (Delehanty, Thomas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 26 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Michael S Freeman on behalf of Friends of the Earth, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Workshop (Freeman, Michael)
February 10, 2023 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR THOMAS R DELEHANTY. RECEIPT 1-108. (Court Staff, sjk)
February 10, 2023 FINANCIAL ENTRY: $100 PHV FEE PAID (RECEIPT #2-1085) ON BEHALF OF MARK S. BARRON (Court Staff, stmo)
February 10, 2023 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR MICHAEL S FREEMAN. RECEIPT 1-108. (Court Staff, sjk)
February 10, 2023 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR MELISSA HORNBEIN. RECEIPT 1-109 (Court Staff, sjk)
February 10, 2023 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR KYLE TISDEL. RECEIPT 1-109. (Court Staff, sjk)
February 10, 2023 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR ROSE E RUSHING. RECEIPT 1-109. (Court Staff, sjk)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #19 Motion to Intervene. (Court Staff, sjdl) (Main Document 25 replaced on 2/9/2023) (Court Staff, sjdl).
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #18 MOTION for Thomas R. Delehanty to appear pro hac vice; filed by Powder River Basin Resource Council, Wilderness Workshop, Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Food & Water Watch, Western Watersheds Project, Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Friends of the Earth, The Wilderness Society, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, WildEarth Guardians, Western Colorado Alliance, Valley Organic Growers Association. (cc: Counsel via email)(Court Staff, stbd)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #17 MOTION for Rose E. Rushing to appear pro hac vice; filed by Powder River Basin Resource Council, Wilderness Workshop, Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Food & Water Watch, Western Watersheds Project, Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Friends of the Earth, The Wilderness Society, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, WildEarth Guardians, Western Colorado Alliance, Valley Organic Growers Association. (cc: Counsel via email)(Court Staff, stbd)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #16 MOTION for Melissa Hornbein to appear pro hac vice filed by Powder River Basin Resource Council, Wilderness Workshop, Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Food & Water Watch, Western Watersheds Project, Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Friends of the Earth, The Wilderness Society, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, WildEarth Guardians, Western Colorado Alliance, Valley Organic Growers Association. (cc: Counsel via email) (Court Staff, stbd)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #15 MOTION for Michael S. Freeman to appear pro hac vice; filed by Powder River Basin Resource Council, Wilderness Workshop, Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Food & Water Watch, Western Watersheds Project, Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Friends of the Earth, The Wilderness Society, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, WildEarth Guardians, Western Colorado Alliance, Valley Organic Growers Association. (cc: Counsel via email)(Court Staff, stbd)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #14 MOTION for Kyle Tisdel to appear pro hac vice; filed by Powder River Basin Resource Council, Wilderness Workshop, Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Food & Water Watch, Western Watersheds Project, Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Friends of the Earth, The Wilderness Society, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, WildEarth Guardians, Western Colorado Alliance, Valley Organic Growers Association. (cc: Counsel via email)(Court Staff, stbd)
February 8, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor Respondents Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Supporting Declarations, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Shannon)
February 7, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Thomas R. Delehanty to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondents Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thomas R. Delehanty, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Shannon)
February 7, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Rose E. Rushing to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondents Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Rose E. Rushing, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Shannon)
February 7, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Melissa Hornbein to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondents Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Melissa Hornbein, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Shannon)
February 7, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Michael S. Freeman to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondents Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael S. Freeman, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Shannon)
February 7, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Kyle Tisdel to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondents Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kyle Tisdel, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Shannon)
February 7, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Anderson on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop (Anderson, Shannon)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #11 MOTION for Mark S. Barron to appear pro hac vice; filed by Petroleum Association of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance. (Court Staff, stbd)
January 26, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Mark S. Barron to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Petitioners Petroleum Association of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark S. Barron, #2 Proposed Order)(Obrecht, Alexander)
January 26, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Western Energy Alliance, Petroleum Association of Wyoming. United States Bureau of Land Management served on 12/12/2022, answer due on 2/10/2023; United States Department of the Interior Secretary served on 12/12/2022, answer due on 2/10/2023. Served through the Deb Haaland & Bureau of Land Management. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Certified Mailings) (Obrecht, Alexander)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #8 MOTION for Michael S. Sawyer to appear pro hac vice; filed by United States Department of the Interior Secretary, United States Bureau of Land Management. (Court Staff, stbd)
January 25, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Michael S. Sawyer to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Sawyer Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Martin, C)
January 25, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C Levi Martin on behalf of United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior Secretary (Martin, C)
January 3, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case by Petitioners Petroleum Association of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wyoming's Amended Petition for Review (12-2-22)) (Obrecht, Alexander) Modified text on 1/13/2023 (Court Staff, skb).
December 9, 2022 Filing 5 Summonses Issued. (Court Staff, skb)
December 9, 2022 Filing 4 Praecipe for Summons filed by Petitioners Petroleum Association of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Obrecht, Alexander)
December 5, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl (presiding) and the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (referral). (Court Staff, sal)
December 5, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Petroleum Association of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance,. (Obrecht, Alexander)
December 5, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW. ( Filing fee $402 receipt #AWYDC-2193915.), filed by Western Energy Alliance, Petroleum Association of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Obrecht, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Energy Alliance et al v. United States Department of Interior Secretary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of the Interior Secretary
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deb Haaland
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Western Energy Alliance
Represented By: Lyle Poe Leggette
Represented By: Mark S Barron
Represented By: Alexander Karl Obrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Petroleum Association of Wyoming
Represented By: Lyle Poe Leggette
Represented By: Mark S Barron
Represented By: Alexander Karl Obrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Represented By: Rose Rushing
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Citizens for a Healthy Community
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Represented By: Rose Rushing
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Rose Rushing
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Food & Water Watch
Represented By: Rose Rushing
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Friends of the Earth
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Montana Environmental Information Center
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Represented By: Rose Rushing
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Parks Conservation Association
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Powder River Basin Resource Council
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Rose Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Sierra Club
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: The Wilderness Society
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Valley Organic Growers Association
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Western Colorado Alliance
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Western Organization of Resource Councils
Represented By: Rose Rushing
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Rose Rushing
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Wilderness Workshop
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?