Gibson v. United States of America
Petitioner: David Isaiah Gibson
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2023cv00107
Filed: June 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2023 Filing 5 Appeal Number 23-8053 received from USCA for #3 Notice of Appeal (Court) filed by David Isaiah Gibson. Notice of appearance and fee or ifp forms due on 08/31/2023 for David Isaiah Gibson. Disclosure statement and notice of appearance due on 08/15/2023 for United States of America. (Court Staff, stbd)
August 1, 2023 Filing 4 Preliminary Record of appeal sent to USCA and counsel re #3 Notice of Appeal (Court) The procedures and appeals forms may be obtained from the U.S. Court of Appeals website: www.ca10.uscourts.gov. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record on Appeal Including Notice of Appeal) (Court Staff, stbd)
July 31, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Order on Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) by Petitioner David Isaiah Gibson. Filing fee $ 505 NOT PAID. (Attachments: #1 Letter from USCA) (Court Staff, stbd)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl dismissing #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). (cc: Pro Se Petitioner via U.S. Mail) (Court Staff, stbd)
June 20, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Petitioner David Isaiah Gibson. (Court Staff, stbd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Isaiah Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole M Romine
Represented By: Timothy J Forwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?