Genesis Alkali LLC v. United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 13214
Plaintiff: Genesis Alkali LLC
Defendant: United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 13214
Case Number: 1:2023cv00131
Filed: July 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2023 Filing 26 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: BY TELEPHONE - All parties shall appear by telephone through the Court's conference call system. Guests call: 307-735-3644 Conference ID: 275 440 149#. Parties should have their calendars on hand for scheduling. Under Local Rule 16.1(a)(2) the parties are reminded to file a written Joint Case Management Plan three business days prior to the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference. The Plan form may be located at www.wyd.uscourts.gov/judges-info under Judge Rankin. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2023 at 09:00 AM before Honorable Kelly H Rankin. (Court Staff, smxb)
September 8, 2023 Filing 25 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Anthony Paul Resnick on behalf of United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 13214 (Resnick, Anthony)
September 6, 2023 Filing 24 ANSWER to #15 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Genesis Alkali LLC. (Addleman, Billie)
August 30, 2023 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR ANTHONY RESNICK. RECEIPT 2-1991. (Court Staff, sjk)
August 30, 2023 Filing 23 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by David Pryzbylski on behalf of Genesis Alkali LLC Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2305919. (Pryzbylski, David)
August 30, 2023 Filing 22 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Anthony Glenn on behalf of Genesis Alkali LLC Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2305917. (Glenn, Anthony)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #20 MOTION for Anthony Resnick to appear pro hac vice filed by United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 13214. Counsel via email. (Court Staff, stbd)
August 30, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Anthony Resnick to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 13214, Counter Claimant United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 13214. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration Anthony Resnick, #2 Proposed Order)(Evans, David)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #18 MOTION for David Pryzbylski and Anthony Glenn to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Genesis Alkali LLC. Counsel notified via email. (Court Staff, semt)
August 29, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for David Pryzbylski and Anthony Glenn to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Genesis Alkali LLC, Counter Defendant Genesis Alkali LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration - David Pryzbylski, #2 Exhibit Declaration - Anthony K. Glenn, #3 Proposed Order)(Addleman, Billie)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas C Payne terminated. (Court Staff, sjgc)
August 25, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Plaintiff Genesis Alkali LLC, Counter Defendant Genesis Alkali LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Payne, Thomas)
August 17, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, , COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Genesis Alkali LLC by United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 13214. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Evans, David)
August 17, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David F Evans on behalf of United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 13214 (Evans, David)
August 3, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Genesis Alkali LLC. United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 13214 served on 7/28/2023, answer due on 8/18/2023 (Addleman, Billie)
July 28, 2023 Filing 12 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Thomas C Payne on behalf of Genesis Alkali LLC Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2289943. (Payne, Thomas)
July 28, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Kenneth J. Yerkes on behalf of Genesis Alkali LLC Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2289935. (Yerkes, Kenneth)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #9 MOTION for Kenneth J. Yerkes and Thomas C. Payne to appear pro hac vice. Counsel notified via email. (Court Staff, semt) Modified text to include email notification on 7/28/2023 (Court Staff, semt).
July 27, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Kenneth J. Yerkes and Thomas C. Payne to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Genesis Alkali LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration - Thomas C. Payne, #2 Exhibit Declaration - Kenneth J. Yerkes, #3 Proposed Order)(Addleman, Billie)
July 26, 2023 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Genesis Alkali LLC, identifying Corporate Parent Genesis Energy LP for Genesis Alkali LLC.. (Addleman, Billie)
July 26, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff Genesis Alkali LLC; this case is non-complex. (Addleman, Billie)
July 26, 2023 Filing 6 COUNSEL TO REFILE - MOTION INCOMPLETE MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Kenneth J. Yerkes and Thomas C. Payne to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Genesis Alkali LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Addleman, Billie) Modified on 7/26/2023 (Court Staff, stbd).
July 25, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tyson Richard Woodford on behalf of Genesis Alkali LLC (Court Staff, stmo)
July 25, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Billie L M Addleman on behalf of Genesis Alkali LLC (Court Staff, stmo)
July 25, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued (Court Staff, stmo)
July 25, 2023 Filing 2 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Genesis Alkali LLC, 1 issued. (Court Staff, stmo)
July 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (1 summons issued) ( Filing fee $402 receipt #2-1845), filed by Genesis Alkali LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Magistrate Consent) (Court Staff, stmo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genesis Alkali LLC v. United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 13214
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genesis Alkali LLC
Represented By: Billie L M Addleman
Represented By: Tyson Richard Woodford
Represented By: Anthony Glenn
Represented By: David Pryzbylski
Represented By: Thomas C Payne
Represented By: Kenneth J. Yerkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 13214
Represented By: David F Evans
Represented By: Anthony Paul Resnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?