Ranches of the West Inc. v. Intuit Inc.
Plaintiff: Ranches of the West Inc
Defendant: Intuit Inc
Case Number: 1:2024cv00135
Filed: July 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Mark L Carman
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2024 Filing 12 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its answer or other responsive pleading on or before 9/19/2024. (Court Staff, swe)
September 3, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kirk Bowersox on behalf of Intuit Inc (Bowersox, Kirk)
September 3, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Pope on behalf of Intuit Inc (Pope, Jeffrey)
September 3, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Mark L Carman. First MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Answer Deadline filed by Defendant Intuit Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Combs, Susan)
September 3, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan Combs on behalf of Intuit Inc (Combs, Susan)
August 12, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Zachary S Westerfield on behalf of Ranches of the West Inc Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2476548. (Westerfield, Zachary) Modified text duplicate payment received on 8/13/2024 (Court Staff, smek).
August 8, 2024 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR ZACHARY WESTERFIELD. RECEIPT 2-3445. (Court Staff, smek)
August 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by the US Magistrate Judge Mark L Carman granting #3 MOTION for Zachary S. Westerfield to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Ranches of the West Inc. E-mail sent to counsel (Court Staff, scat)
August 6, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued (Court Staff, scat)
August 6, 2024 Filing 4 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Ranches of the West Inc (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Armstrong, Michael)
August 6, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Mark L Carman. MOTION for Zachary S. Westerfield to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Ranches of the West Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Michael)
July 10, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl (Presiding) and Mark L. Carman (Referral Judge). (Court Staff, stbd)
July 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Intuit Inc. with Jury Demand. (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number AWYDC-2458764) Attorney Michael Robert Armstrong added to party Ranches of the West, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Ranches of the West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement) (Armstrong, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ranches of the West Inc. v. Intuit Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intuit Inc
Represented By: Susan Combs
Represented By: Kirk Bowersox
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ranches of the West Inc
Represented By: Michael Robert Armstrong
Represented By: Zachary S Westerfield
Represented By: Zachary S Westerfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?