King et al v. Wyoming Highway Patrol et al
Plaintiff: Moeko King and Brennden King
Defendant: Wyoming Highway Patrol Colonel, Wyoming Highway Patrol Trooper Russell, State of Wyoming, Wyoming Highway Patrol Trooper Tipper and Wyoming Highway Patrol
Case Number: 2:2018cv00122
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Office: Cheyenne Office
County: U.S. (County Unknown)
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adrian K Kowalski on behalf of State of Wyoming, Wyoming Highway Patrol, Wyoming Highway Patrol Colonel, Wyoming Highway Patrol Trooper Russell, Wyoming Highway Patrol Trooper Tipper (Kowalski, Adrian)
September 24, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wyoming Highway Patrol. Wyoming Highway Patrol 8/25/2018, answer due 10/24/2018 (Daraie, Justin)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Wyoming. State of Wyoming 8/25/2018, answer due 10/24/2018 (Daraie, Justin)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wyoming Highway Patrol Trooper Tipper. Wyoming Highway Patrol Trooper Tipper 8/25/2018, answer due 10/24/2018 (Daraie, Justin)
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wyoming Highway Patrol Trooper Russell. Wyoming Highway Patrol Trooper Russell 8/25/2018, answer due 10/24/2018 (Daraie, Justin)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wyoming Highway Patrol Colonel. Wyoming Highway Patrol Colonel 8/25/2018, answer due 10/24/2018 (Daraie, Justin)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Ashkhan Daraie on behalf of State of Wyoming, Wyoming Highway Patrol, Wyoming Highway Patrol Colonel, Wyoming Highway Patrol Trooper Russell, Wyoming Highway Patrol Trooper Tipper (Daraie, Justin)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 Summonses Issued and returned to Plaintiff on this date via U.S. mail. (Court Staff, sal)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel, denying #4 MOTION (Application) to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and denying #3 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense filed by Plaintiffs Brennden King, Moeko King. Filing fee must be paid before 8/30/18 or this case will be dismissed without prejudice. Copy of Order mailed to Plaintffs on this date via U.S. mail.(Court Staff, sal)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION (Application) to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Plaintiffs Brennden King, Moeko King. (Court Staff, sjlg)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense filed by Plaintiffs Brennden King, Moeko King. (Court Staff, sjlg)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiffs Brennden King, Moeko King. (Court Staff, sjlg)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Illegal Traffic Stop, Depriving of Due Process, Failure to Establish Probable Cause Request for Trial by Jury (summons(es) not issued) (Filing fee not paid.), filed by Moeko King, Brennden King. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Court Staff, sjlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. Wyoming Highway Patrol et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Highway Patrol Colonel
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Adrian K Kowalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Highway Patrol Trooper Russell
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Adrian K Kowalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Wyoming
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Adrian K Kowalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Highway Patrol Trooper Tipper
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Adrian K Kowalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Highway Patrol
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Adrian K Kowalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moeko King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brennden King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?