Oxford v. Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company
Plaintiff: Tiffany Oxford
Defendant: Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00124
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Office: Cheyenne Office
County: Carbon
Presiding Judge: Mark L Carman
Referring Judge: Alan B Johnson
2 Judge: Kelly H Rankin
3 Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by the Honorable Mark L. Carman granting #10 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting C. Seth Ensign for Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. Mr. Ensign is in good standing with the Utah State Bar. (Court Staff, sea)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by the Honorable Mark L Carman granting #9 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting David C. Castleberry for Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. Mr. Castleberry is in good standing with the Utah State Bar. (Court Staff, sea)
September 20, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $200 received for pro hac vice fees for David C Castleberry and C. Seth Ensign. Receipt CHY029536. (Court Staff, sjk)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Mark L Carman. MOTION for C. Seth Ensign to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Esch, Amanda)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Mark L Carman. MOTION for David C. Castleberry to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Esch, Amanda)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Alan B Johnson recused. Case reassigned to Honorable Scott W Skavdahl for all further proceedingsby the Honorable Alan B Johnson.(Court Staff, ssw)
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tiffany Oxford. Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company 8/9/2018, answer due 10/9/2018 (Kellogg, Sarah)
August 22, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth A Johnson on behalf of Tiffany Oxford (Court Staff, ssw)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda F Esch on behalf of Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company (Esch, Amanda)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RECUSING MAGISTRATE JUDGE by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. Due to a conflict of interest Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin has recused himself from the above-entitled action. All non-dispositive matters will be heard by Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman.(Court Staff, szf)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah A Kellogg on behalf of Tiffany Oxford (Court Staff, ssw)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Aronowitz on behalf of Tiffany Oxford (Court Staff, ssw)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (1 summons issued) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY029279.), filed by Tiffany Oxford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Magistrate Consent) (Court Staff, ssw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oxford v. Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Oxford
Represented By: Sarah A Kellogg
Represented By: Mark Aronowitz
Represented By: Seth A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company
Represented By: David C Castleberry
Represented By: C. Seth Ensign
Represented By: Amanda F Esch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?