Martin-Buck v. Mott
Plaintiff: Becky L Martin-Buck
Defendant: Regina Mott
Case Number: 2:2018cv00126
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Office: Cheyenne Office
County: Laramie
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl re #7 Motion for Reconsideration. (cc: Pro Se Plaintiff via USPS)(Court Staff, stbd)
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration re #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Becky L Martin-Buck. (Court Staff, sth)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Dismissing Complaint without Prejudice(cc: Pro Se Plaintiff via USPS)(Court Staff, stbd)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Becky L Martin-Buck. Regina Mott served on 8/9/2018, answer due on 8/30/2018 (Court Staff, ssw)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Becky L Martin-Buck, 1 issued. (Court Staff, ssw)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Scott W Skavdahl for all further proceedings; Honorable Kelly H Rankin no longer assigned to caseby the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. (Copy of order mailed to plaintiff)(Court Staff, ssw)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Becky L Martin-Buck. (Court Staff, ssw)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights filed by Becky L Martin-Buck. (Court Staff, ssw) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/9/2018) (Court Staff, ssw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin-Buck v. Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky L Martin-Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?